Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3228 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29262 Week
» 127907 Month
» 330571 Year
» 3357424 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1017 |
15/03/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
15/03/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/1973 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
984,000 miles |
Cut Up |
on 12/03/1975 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
15/03/1963 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
03/02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
07/03/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Notes
Notes |
This locomotive was one of a group of 4 (D1017-D1020) that were identified as not to be fitted with Dual AWS and Dual Brakes in order to save costs. This lead to their untimely demise in the summer of 1973. |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1017, name: WESTERN WARRIOR Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/02/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/08/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1017 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
12/03/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|