30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. |
SLS/194712 |
02/07/1961 |
Stafford Road Works (Weigh House ) |
Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. |
SLS/196108 |
04/03/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. |
SLS/196204 |
20/12/1964 |
Swindon MPD (Stored) |
D9516/7 and 23 other Diesels with 48479 the only steam loco. Stored: 1011, 1658/64, 4903/32, 6122, 6430, 73012. |
SLS/196502 |
14/02/1965 |
Swindon Shed (Stored) |
Ex Works: D820, D3039, D3745. Waiting works: D3749. Derelict: 73012. Stored: 1011, 1658/64, 6430. |
SLS/196503 |