|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 21/10/1959 | n/a | 21/10/1959 | 06/11/1959 | Light Casual | 17 days | £2,434.00 | 6,566 | ||||
Derby Works | 13/11/1959 | 7 days | 13/11/1959 | 25/11/1959 | Light Casual | 13 days | £2,530.00 | 7,611 | ||||
Crewe Works | 01/10/1960 | 311 days | 10/10/1960 | 26/10/1960 | Non Classified | 17 days | £226.00 | 40,112 | ||||
Crewe Works | 09/10/1961 | 348 days | 10/10/1961 | 05/01/1962 | Heavy Casual | 88 days | £2,377.00 | 81,285 | Fire damage | |||
Crewe Works | 08/01/1962 | 3 days | 08/01/1962 | 12/02/1962 | Non Classified | 36 days | £61.00 | 81,285 | Remedial work | |||
Derby Works | 01/03/1962 | 17 days | 13/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | Light Casual | 38 days | £1,007.00 | 85,011 | ||||
Derby Works | 03/05/1962 | 14 days | 12/05/1962 | 26/05/1962 | Light Casual | 15 days | £277.00 | 85,718 | ||||
Derby Works | 23/07/1963 | 423 days | 26/07/1963 | 03/08/1963 | Non Classified | 9 days | 121,686 | |||||
Derby Works | 03/12/1963 | 122 days | 03/12/1963 | 10/02/1964 | Intermediate | 70 days | 131,672 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1959 | 12,379 | 12,379 | 11,085g | 1.12 | 24 | 24 | 44 | £1,075 | 13 | 81 | ||||
1960 | 32,825 | 45,204 | 37,635g | 0.87 | 3 | 18 | 21 | 83 | £1,651 | 48 | 152 | |||
1961 | 36,919 | 82,123 | ||||||||||||
1962 | 20,610 | 102,733 | ||||||||||||
1963 | 29,939 | 132,672 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/08/1959 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D1, name: SCAFELL PIKE Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
||
15/08/1959 | Allocation | Loaned to Derby (17A) | ||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959. Stopped on 21/10/1959 |
||
13/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. Stopped on 13/11/1959 |
||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
21/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
10/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960. Stopped on 01/10/1960 |
||
10/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1961. Dep: 05/01/1962. Stopped on 09/10/1961 |
||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 12/02/1962. Stopped on 08/01/1962 |
||
03/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
13/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. Stopped on 01/03/1962 |
||
12/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. Stopped on 03/05/1962 |
||
17/06/1962 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
17/06/1962 | Modification | Modification: Engine hours recorder fitted | ||
17/06/1962 | Modification | Modification: Fitting Anti-Flood plates & Drain Pipes | ||
17/06/1962 | Modification | Modification: SLM Exhausters | ||
26/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 26/07/1963. Dep: 03/08/1963. Stopped on 23/07/1963 |
||
03/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1963. Dep: 10/02/1964. Stopped on 03/12/1963 |
||
16/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) | ||
11/1971 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front | ||
27/02/1974 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44001 | ||
30/10/1976 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44001 from Toton (TO) | ||
02/1977 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |