BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT Tank" Class 2-6-4T
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
80000 | 26/09/1952 | Ayr | 31/12/1966 | 14.25 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 04/1967 | 14.56 | |
80001 | 14/10/1952 | Polmadie | 17/07/1966 | 13.75 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 14.01 | |
80002 | 17/10/1952 | Motherwell | 01/03/1967 | 14.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80003 | 24/10/1952 | Motherwell | 06/03/1965 | 12.42 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 06/1965 | 12.65 | |
80004 | 04/11/1952 | Kittybrewster | 01/05/1967 | 14.5 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 08/1967 | 14.79 | |
80005 | 13/11/1952 | Kittybrewster | 09/08/1966 | 13.75 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 10/1966 | 13.93 | |
80006 | 24/11/1952 | Polmadie | 02/09/1966 | 13.83 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 12/1966 | 14.07 | |
80007 | 08/12/1952 | Polmadie | 17/07/1966 | 13.58 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 13.86 | |
80008 | 15/12/1952 | Corkerhill | 13/07/1964 | 11.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 12.25 | |
80009 | 30/12/1952 | Corkerhill | 24/09/1964 | 11.75 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 12.21 | |
80010 | 10/07/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 14/06/1964 | 12.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1965 | 13.69 | |
80011 | 21/07/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 09/07/1967 | 16 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 16.33 | |
80012 | 17/08/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 19/03/1967 | 15.58 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 08/1967 | 16.01 | |
80013 | 28/08/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 19/09/1966 | 15.08 | Cut | R A Kings (Norwich) | 11/1966 | 15.23 | |
80014 | 05/09/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 02/05/1965 | Eastleigh | 13.67 | Cut | Birds (Bynea) | 09/1965 | 14.04 |
80015 | 14/09/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 09/07/1967 | 15.83 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 12/1967 | 16.26 | |
80016 | 20/09/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 09/07/1967 | 15.83 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 16.16 | |
80017 | 08/10/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 13/09/1964 | 12.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1965 | 13.44 | |
80018 | 13/10/1951 | Tunbridge Wells West | 11/04/1965 | 13.5 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 08/1965 | 13.85 | |
80019 | 20/10/1951 | 19/03/1967 | 15.42 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 08/1967 | 15.83 | ||
80020 | 27/10/1951 | 26/06/1965 | 13.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 09/1965 | 13.90 | ||
80021 | 10/11/1951 | 13/07/1964 | 12.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 13.35 | ||
80022 | 20/11/1951 | Kittybrewster | 26/06/1965 | 13.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 09/1965 | 13.83 | |
80023 | 27/11/1951 | 02/10/1965 | 13.92 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 11/1965 | 13.98 | ||
80024 | 07/12/1951 | Corkerhill | 24/08/1966 | 14.67 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 14.87 | |
80025 | 13/12/1951 | Corkerhill | 24/08/1966 | 14.67 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 14.85 | |
80026 | 20/12/1951 | Polmadie | 02/09/1966 | 14.75 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 12/1966 | 15.00 | |
80027 | 04/01/1952 | Kittybrewster | 29/11/1966 | 14.83 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 05/1967 | 15.37 | |
80028 | 11/01/1952 | 26/09/1966 | 14.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1966 | 14.94 | ||
80029 | 22/01/1952 | 16/12/1965 | 13.92 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 02/1966 | 14.08 | ||
80030 | 05/02/1952 | Ayr | 08/06/1964 | 12.33 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 02/1965 | 13.04 | |
80031 | 02/02/1952 | Brighton | 20/09/1964 | 12.58 | Cut | Steel Supply Co. (West Drayton) | 03/1965 | 13.12 | |
80032 | 04/03/1952 | Brighton | 29/01/1967 | 14.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1967 | 15.21 | |
80033 | 18/03/1952 | Brighton | 02/10/1966 | 14.58 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 03/1967 | 15.00 | |
80034 | 01/04/1952 | Crewe North | 02/01/1966 | 13.75 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 04/1966 | 14.05 | |
80035 | 15/05/1952 | Watford | 21/04/1965 | Yeovil Town | 12.92 | Cut | Birds (Bynea) | 07/1965 | 13.18 |
80036 | 23/05/1952 | Watford | 06/11/1964 | 12.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1965 | 12.82 | |
80037 | 24/05/1952 | Watford | 07/03/1966 | 13.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1966 | 14.07 | |
80038 | 07/06/1952 | Watford | 07/09/1964 | 12.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 12.86 | |
80039 | 18/06/1952 | Bletchley | 21/01/1966 | 13.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1966 | 13.75 | |
80040 | 27/06/1952 | Bletchley | 06/05/1964 | 11.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 07/1964 | 12.06 | |
80041 | 05/07/1952 | Bletchley | 07/03/1966 | 13.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1966 | 13.95 | |
80042 | 15/07/1952 | Bletchley | 06/02/1965 | 12.58 | Cut | Hayes (Bridgend) | 05/1965 | 12.84 | |
80043 | 24/07/1952 | Bletchley | 07/03/1966 | 13.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1966 | 13.98 | |
80044 | 21/08/1952 | Derby | 14/11/1964 | 12.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 01/1965 | 12.41 | |
80045 | 04/09/1952 | Bedford | 01/05/1967 | 14.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 08/1967 | 14.95 | |
80046 | 17/09/1952 | Bedford | 01/05/1967 | 14.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 08/1967 | 14.92 | |
80047 | 30/09/1952 | Bedford | 24/08/1966 | 13.92 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 14.05 | |
80048 | 13/10/1952 | Kentish Town | 17/07/1965 | 12.75 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 13.01 | |
80049 | 24/10/1952 | Newton Heath | 08/06/1964 | 11.67 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 02/1965 | 12.32 | |
80050 | 06/11/1952 | Newton Heath | 21/11/1964 | 12 | Cut | Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) | 07/1965 | 12.70 | |
80051 | 21/11/1952 | Newton Heath | 17/08/1966 | 13.75 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 13.91 | |
80052 | 05/12/1952 | Newton Heath | 07/07/1964 | 11.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 12.28 | |
80053 | 22/12/1952 | Newton Heath | 07/07/1964 | 11.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 12.24 | |
80054 | 04/12/1954 | 29/06/1966 | 11.5 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 08/1965 | 10.70 | ||
80055 | 23/12/1954 | Polmadie | 02/09/1966 | 11.75 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 11.82 | |
80056 | 30/12/1954 | Polmadie | 10/10/1964 | 9.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 11/1964 | 9.88 | |
80057 | 31/12/1954 | Polmadie | 31/12/1966 | 12 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 04/1967 | 12.30 | |
80058 | 08/01/1955 | Polmadie | 17/07/1966 | 11.5 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 11.78 | |
80059 | 03/03/1953 | Kentish Town | 18/11/1965 | 12.67 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 01/1966 | 12.88 | |
80060 | 19/03/1953 | Bedford | 07/02/1966 | 12.92 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 05/1966 | 13.16 | |
80061 | 08/04/1953 | Bedford | 31/12/1966 | 13.67 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 04/1967 | 14.03 | |
80062 | 29/04/1953 | Kentish Town | 12/10/1964 | 11.5 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.81 | |
80063 | 19/05/1953 | Saltley | 24/08/1966 | 13.25 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 11/1966 | 13.50 | |
80064 | 09/06/1953 | Watford | 25/08/1965 | 12.17 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80065 | 25/06/1953 | Watford | 04/09/1966 | 13.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1967 | 13.57 | |
80066 | 15/07/1953 | Watford | 13/06/1965 | 11.92 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 12.26 | |
80067 | 04/08/1953 | Watford | 03/06/1965 | 11.83 | Cut | Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) | 09/1965 | 12.12 | |
80068 | 21/08/1953 | Watford | 02/10/1966 | 13.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1967 | 13.57 | |
80069 | 30/09/1953 | Plaistow | 23/01/1966 | 12.33 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 04/1966 | 12.55 | |
80070 | 09/10/1953 | Plaistow | 20/06/1965 | 11.67 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 10/1965 | 12.02 | |
80071 | 21/10/1953 | Plaistow | 30/07/1964 | 10.75 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.33 | |
80072 | 03/11/1953 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 11.67 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80073 | 13/11/1953 | Plaistow | 30/07/1964 | 10.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.27 | |
80074 | 27/11/1953 | Plaistow | 30/07/1964 | 10.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.23 | |
80075 | 10/12/1953 | Plaistow | 30/07/1964 | 10.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.19 | |
80076 | 23/12/1953 | Plaistow | 30/07/1964 | 10.58 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 11.16 | |
80077 | 12/01/1954 | Plaistow | 12/10/1964 | 10.75 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 03/1965 | 11.18 | |
80078 | 02/02/1954 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 11.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80079 | 05/03/1954 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 11.33 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80080 | 18/03/1954 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 11.33 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80081 | 31/03/1954 | Bletchley | 08/06/1965 | 11.25 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 11.55 | |
80082 | 15/04/1954 | Bletchley | 04/09/1966 | 12.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1967 | 12.76 | |
80083 | 03/05/1954 | Bletchley | 07/08/1966 | 12.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1967 | 12.71 | |
80084 | 14/05/1954 | Bletchley | 13/06/1965 | 11.08 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 11.43 | |
80085 | 28/05/1954 | Bletchley | 09/07/1967 | 13.17 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 13.48 | |
80086 | 14/06/1954 | Bury | 01/05/1967 | 12.92 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 28/02/1968 | 13.72 | |
80087 | 29/06/1954 | Bury | 14/06/1964 | 10 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 10.64 | |
80088 | 14/07/1954 | Bury | 13/06/1965 | 10.92 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 11.26 | |
80089 | 03/08/1954 | Bury | 02/10/1966 | 12.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1967 | 12.62 | |
80090 | 12/08/1954 | Bury | 27/03/1965 | 10.58 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 05/1965 | 10.76 | |
80091 | 10/09/1954 | Kentish Town | 29/11/1966 | 12.17 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1967 | 12.44 | |
80092 | 24/09/1954 | Kentish Town | 26/09/1966 | 12 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1966 | 12.23 | |
80093 | 11/10/1954 | Bedford | 26/09/1966 | 11.92 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1966 | 12.19 | |
80094 | 25/10/1954 | Kentish Town | 31/07/1966 | 11.75 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 02/1967 | 12.32 | |
80095 | 13/11/1954 | St Albans | 02/10/1966 | 11.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1967 | 12.34 | |
80096 | 23/11/1954 | Plaistow | 26/12/1965 | 11.08 | Cut | Cohens (Ringwood Goods yard) | 03/1966 | 11.32 | |
80097 | 09/12/1954 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 10.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80098 | 22/12/1954 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 10.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80099 | 17/01/1955 | Plaistow | 08/05/1965 | 10.33 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 07/1965 | 10.50 | |
80100 | 31/01/1955 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 10.5 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80101 | 07/02/1955 | Plaistow | 17/07/1965 | 10.42 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 10.69 | |
80102 | 01/03/1955 | Plaistow | 05/12/1965 | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Ringwood Goods yard) | 03/1966 | 11.05 | |
80103 | 16/03/1955 | Plaistow | 29/08/1962 | 7.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Stratford) | 09/1962 | 7.51 | |
80104 | 31/03/1955 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 10.33 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80105 | 19/04/1955 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 10.25 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80106 | 22/10/1954 | Kittybrewster | 12/10/1964 | 10 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 10.33 | |
80107 | 29/10/1954 | Kittybrewster | 14/09/1964 | 9.92 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 10.31 | |
80108 | 05/11/1954 | Kittybrewster | 08/05/1965 | 10.5 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 07/1965 | 10.70 | |
80109 | 18/11/1954 | Kittybrewster | 13/11/1965 | 11 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1966 | 11.25 | |
80110 | 18/11/1954 | Kittybrewster | 08/05/1965 | 10.5 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 07/1965 | 10.66 | |
80111 | 26/11/1954 | Polmadie | 29/11/1966 | 12 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1967 | 12.23 | |
80112 | 03/12/1954 | Polmadie | 24/08/1966 | 11.67 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 10/1966 | 11.87 | |
80113 | 14/12/1954 | Polmadie | 02/09/1966 | 11.75 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 12/1966 | 12.01 | |
80114 | 29/12/1954 | Polmadie | 31/12/1966 | 12 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 04/1967 | 12.30 | |
80115 | 31/12/1954 | Polmadie | 12/10/1964 | 9.83 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1965 | 10.13 | |
80116 | 04/05/1955 | York (North) | 01/05/1967 | 12 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 08/1967 | 12.29 | |
80117 | 19/05/1954 | Whitby | 03/03/1966 | 11.83 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 05/1966 | 12.00 | |
80118 | 15/06/1955 | Whitby | 29/11/1966 | 11.42 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 02/1967 | 11.68 | |
80119 | 21/06/1955 | Whitby | 29/05/1965 | 9.92 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 08/1965 | 10.16 | |
80120 | 06/07/1955 | Whitby | 01/05/1967 | 11.83 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 05/1967 | 11.87 | |
80121 | 22/07/1955 | Kittybrewster | 02/06/1966 | 10.92 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 08/1966 | 11.07 | |
80122 | 08/08/1955 | Kittybrewster | 31/12/1966 | 11.33 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 04/1967 | 11.69 | |
80123 | 09/09/1955 | Dundee Tay Bridge | 17/08/1966 | 10.92 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 11/1966 | 11.19 | |
80124 | 22/09/1955 | Dundee Tay Bridge | 09/12/1966 | 11.25 | Cut | Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) | 03/1967 | 11.48 | |
80125 | 06/10/1955 | Stirling | 10/10/1964 | 9 | Cut | Maden and McKee (Stanley) | 05/1965 | 9.61 | |
80126 | 20/10/1955 | Perth South | 19/11/1966 | 11.08 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1967 | 11.25 | |
80127 | 07/11/1955 | Corkerhill | 30/07/1964 | 8.67 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 10/1964 | 8.95 | |
80128 | 23/11/1955 | Corkerhill | 04/04/1967 | 11.42 | Cut | P.W. McLellan (Langloan) | 08/1967 | 11.73 | |
80129 | 09/12/1955 | Polmadie | 10/10/1964 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 11/1964 | 8.94 | |
80130 | 22/12/1955 | Polmadie | 17/08/1966 | 10.67 | Cut | Metal Industries (Faslane) | 11/1966 | 10.91 | |
80131 | 02/03/1956 | Plaistow | 08/05/1965 | 9.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 07/1965 | 9.38 | |
80132 | 15/03/1956 | Plaistow | 09/01/1966 | 9.83 | Cut | Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot) | 04/1966 | 10.09 | |
80133 | 28/03/1956 | Plaistow | 09/07/1967 | 11.33 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 11.64 | |
80134 | 20/04/1956 | Plaistow | 09/07/1967 | 11.25 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 10/1967 | 11.49 | |
80135 | 30/04/1956 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 9.25 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80136 | 11/05/1956 | Plaistow | 24/07/1965 | 9.17 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80137 | 28/05/1956 | Neasden | 31/10/1965 | 9.42 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 01/1966 | 9.64 | |
80138 | 12/06/1956 | Neasden | 02/10/1966 | 10.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1967 | 10.68 | |
80139 | 26/06/1956 | Neasden | 09/07/1967 | 11.08 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 11.39 | |
80140 | 10/07/1956 | Neasden | 09/07/1967 | 11 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 11.36 | |
80141 | 25/07/1956 | Neasden | 09/01/1966 | 9.5 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 03/1966 | 9.64 | |
80142 | 09/08/1956 | Neasden | 03/03/1966 | 9.58 | Cut | Birds (Bridgend) | 06/1966 | 9.85 | |
80143 | 10/09/1956 | Neasden | 09/07/1967 | 10.83 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 11.19 | |
80144 | 25/09/1956 | Neasden | 15/05/1966 | 9.67 | Cut | Birds (Bridgend) | 09/1966 | 9.98 | |
80145 | 16/10/1956 | Brighton | 25/06/1967 | 10.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1967 | 11.09 | |
80146 | 30/10/1956 | Brighton | 09/07/1967 | 10.75 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 11.05 | |
80147 | 15/11/1956 | Brighton | 13/06/1965 | 8.58 | Cut | Birds (Morriston) | 01/1966 | 9.17 | |
80148 | 29/11/1956 | Brighton | 14/06/1964 | 7.58 | Cut | Steel Supply Co. (West Drayton) | 03/1965 | 8.30 | |
80149 | 13/12/1956 | Brighton | 07/03/1965 | 8.25 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 06/1965 | 8.51 | |
80150 | 28/12/1956 | Brighton | 17/10/1965 | 8.83 | |||||
80151 | 18/01/1957 | Brighton | 07/05/1967 | 10.33 | Prs | Preserved | |||
80152 | 06/02/1957 | Brighton | 09/07/1967 | 10.42 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | 11/1967 | 10.78 | |
80153 | 25/02/1957 | Brighton | 07/03/1965 | 8.08 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 06/1965 | 8.31 | |
80154 | 26/03/1957 | Brighton | 02/04/1967 | 10.08 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 08/1967 | 10.39 |