NBR/LNER "Y9" Class 0-4-0ST
NBR | NBR (2nd) | NBR (3rd) | LNER (1924 2nd) | LNER (1924 1st) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
546 | 901 | 1101 | 10101 | 9941 | 8092 | 68092 | 1882 | 27/02/1953 | 71.17 | ||||||
547 | 902 | 1102 | 10102 | 9942 | 8093 | 68093 | 1882 | 08/01/1958 | 76.08 | ||||||
32 | 892 | 1092 | 10092 | 9933 | 8094 | 68094 | 1887 | 12/04/1955 | 68.33 | ||||||
42 | 894 | 1094 | 10094 | 9935 | 8095 | 68095 | 1887 | 29/12/1962 | 76 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
144 | 897 | 1097 | 10097 | 9938 | 8096 | 68096 | 1887 | 07/05/1954 | 67.42 | ||||||
146 | 898 | 1098 | 10098 | 9939 | 8097 | 68097 | 1887 | 14/10/1958 | 71.83 | ||||||
308 | 899 | 1099 | 1887 | 11/1921 | 34.92 | ||||||||||
310 | 900 | 1100 | 10100 | 9940 | 8098 | 68098 | 1887 | 30/12/1954 | 68 | ||||||
341 | 883 | 1083 | 10083 | 9835 | 8099 | 68099 | 1889 | 13/11/1956 | 67.92 | ||||||
342 | 884 | 1084 | 10084 | 9927 | 8100 | 68100 | 1889 | 06/1960 | 71.5 | ||||||
343 | 885 | 1085 | 1889 | 07/1922 | 33.58 | ||||||||||
344 | 886 | 1086 | 1889 | 11/1921 | 32.92 | ||||||||||
345 | 887 | 1087 | 10087 | 9928 | 1889 | 08/1938 | 49.67 | ||||||||
346 | 888 | 1088 | 10088 | 9929 | 8101 | 68101 | 1889 | 08/10/1962 | 73.83 | ||||||
9 | 9009 | 8104 | 68104 | 11/1890 | 08/10/1962 | 71.92 | |||||||||
10 | 9010 | 8105 | 68105 | 11/1890 | 25/04/1955 | 64.42 | |||||||||
11 | 9011 | 8106 | 68106 | 11/1890 | 26/08/1957 | 66.75 | |||||||||
14 | 9014 | 8107 | 68107 | 12/1890 | 01/12/1953 | 63 | |||||||||
17 | 9017 | 8108 | 68108 | 12/1890 | 05/11/1959 | 68.92 | |||||||||
40 | 893 | 1093 | 10093 | 9934 | 8103 | 68103 | 12/1890 | 21/08/1954 | 63.67 | ||||||
50 | 895 | 1095 | 10095 | 9936 | 8111 | 68111 | 01/1891 | 04/03/1953 | 62.17 | ||||||
63 | 896 | 1096 | 10096 | 9937 | 8112 | 68112 | 01/1891 | 12/01/1955 | 64 | ||||||
227 | 889 | 1089 | 10089 | 9930 | 8102 | 68102 | 01/1891 | 23/12/1958 | 67.92 | ||||||
231 | 890 | 1090 | 10090 | 9931 | 8109 | 68109 | 06/1891 | 22/04/1954 | 62.83 | ||||||
232 | 891 | 1091 | 10091 | 9932 | 8110 | 68110 | 06/1891 | 31/08/1961 | 70.17 | ||||||
610 | 903 | 1103 | 10103 | 06/1891 | 12/1923 | 32.5 | |||||||||
32 | 9032 | 8113 | 68113 | 11/1897 | 12/04/1958 | 60.42 | |||||||||
40 | 9040 | 8114 | 68114 | 11/1897 | 10/1960 | 62.92 | |||||||||
42 | 9042 | 8115 | 68115 | 11/1897 | 04/07/1957 | 59.67 | |||||||||
50 | 9050 | 8116 | 68116 | 11/1897 | 12/04/1958 | 60.42 | |||||||||
63 | 9063 | 8117 | 68117 | 12/1897 | 16/07/1962 | 64.58 | |||||||||
144 | 9144 | 8118 | 68118 | 12/1897 | 24/10/1958 | 60.83 | |||||||||
146 | 9146 | 8119 | 68119 | 06/1899 | 02/10/1961 | 62.33 | |||||||||
308 | 9308 | 8120 | 68120 | 07/1899 | 10/08/1955 | 56.08 | |||||||||
310 | 9310 | 8121 | 68121 | 07/1899 | 01/07/1955 | 56 | |||||||||
546 | 9546 | 8122 | 68122 | 08/1899 | 01/08/1955 | 56 | |||||||||
547 | 9547 | 8123 | 68123 | 08/1899 | 09/08/1960 | 61 | |||||||||
610 | 9610 | 8124 | 68124 | 09/1899 | 29/09/1959 | 60 |