Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3410 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16816 Week
» 69832 Month
» 189359 Year
» 3216212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "Y7" Class 0-4-0T
LNER |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
985
|
8088
|
68088
|
18/09/1923 |
|
03/10/1952 |
|
29.08 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
986
|
8089
|
68089
|
03/10/1923 |
|
25/01/1952 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|