HBR/LNER Stirling "N13" Class 0-6-2T
HBR | NER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3013 | 2405 | 9110 | 69110 | 11/1913 | 26/06/1948 | Hull Springhead | 34.58 | |||||
15 | 3015 | 2407 | 9111 | 69111 | 12/1913 | 21/08/1952 | Hull Springhead | 38.67 | |||||
18 | 3018 | 2410 | 9112 | 69112 | 12/1913 | 24/11/1952 | Hull Springhead | 38.92 | |||||
23 | 3023 | 2415 | 9113 | 69113 | 12/1913 | 04/05/1953 | Neville Hill | 39.42 | |||||
27 | 3027 | 2419 | 9114 | 69114 | 01/1914 | 22/10/1956 | Neville Hill | 42.75 | |||||
152 | 3152 | 2533 | 9115 | 69115 | 01/1914 | 18/05/1955 | Neville Hill | 41.33 | |||||
153 | 3153 | 2534 | 9116 | 69116 | 02/1914 | 20/12/1954 | Neville Hill | 40.83 | |||||
154 | 3154 | 2535 | 9117 | 69117 | 02/1914 | 05/07/1955 | Neville Hill | 41.42 | |||||
155 | 3155 | 2536 | 9118 | 69118 | 03/1914 | 26/05/1952 | Neville Hill | 38.17 | |||||
156 | 3156 | 2537 | 9119 | 69119 | 03/1914 | 05/07/1955 | Neville Hill | 41.33 |