Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 155 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7615 Week
» 5128 Month
» 233012 Year
» 1454577 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N10" Class 0-6-2T


NER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1321 9090 69090 10/1902 19/11/1956 54.08 54.29
1667 9091 69091 10/1902 26/11/1956 54.08 54.21
1683 9092 69092 11/1902 06/04/1959 56.42 56.45
1697 9093 69093 11/1902 23/12/1957 55.08 55.21
1774 9094 69094 11/1902 01/07/1957 54.67 54.79
89 9095 69095 12/1902 25/10/1955 52.83 52.95
429 9096 69096 12/1902 27/12/1957 55 55.12
1109 9097 69097 12/1902 09/04/1962 Gateshead 59.33 59.71
1112 9098 69098 10/1902 24/09/1957 54.92 55.04
1132 9099 69099 12/1902 10/02/1958 55.17 55.21
1138 9100 69100 10/1902 25/11/1957 55.08 55.29
1148 9101 69101 12/1902 09/04/1962 Gateshead 59.33 60.29
1317 9102 69102 12/1902 09/02/1959 56.17 56.21
1706 9103 69103 12/1902 11/1948 45.92 45.95
1710 9104 69104 12/1902 17/03/1958 55.25 55.37
1699 9105 69105 03/1903 16/06/1961 58.25 58.38
1707 9106 69106 03/1903 17/03/1958 Tyne Dock 55 55.12
1711 9107 69107 03/1903 27/12/1957 54.75 54.88
1785 9108 69108 04/1903 30/07/1957 54.25 54.37
1716 9109 69109 04/1903 09/04/1962 Gateshead 59 59.46