Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 829 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1869 Week
» 12039 Month
» 289835 Year
» 1174216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N8" Class 0-6-2T


NER LNER (Replace) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
14 06/1886 04/1932 45.83
531 06/1886 06/1937 51
185 07/1886 12/1932 46.42
210 9371 69371 07/1886 03/1952 65.67
212 9372 69372 08/1886 11/1950 64.25
428 08/1886 04/1930 43.67
504 09/1886 06/1937 50.75
528 09/1886 12/1929 43.25
535 9373 69373 10/1886 03/1950 63.42
1165 11/1886 07/1939 52.67
9 9374 69374 01/1888 03/1949 61.17
74 9375 69375 03/1888 03/1949 61
855 856 9376 69376 10/1888 02/1950 61.33
856 10/1888 12/1938 50.17
857 10/1888 08/1935 46.83
858 10/1888 03/1936 47.42
859 9377 69377 10/1888 06/1955 66.67
860 11/1888 06/1937 48.58
861 9378 69378 11/1888 26/09/1955 66.83
862 9379 69379 11/1888 10/1952 63.92
863 9380 69380 11/1888 25/11/1950 62
864 9381 69381 12/1888 06/1955 66.5
219 9382 69382 12/1888 07/1952 63.58
371 12/1888 05/1931 42.42
213 12/1888 01/1936 47.08
284 12/1888 10/1936 47.83
683 12/1888 07/1939 50.58
346 9383 69383 02/1889 08/1949 60.5
348 9384 69384 02/1889 03/1949 60.08
349 02/1889 06/1937 48.33
350 03/1889 12/1936 47.75
351 03/1889 09/1930 41.5
373 04/1889 04/1933 44
1124 04/1889 07/1939 50.25
1145 04/1889 12/1936 47.67
1152 9385 69385 04/1889 27/10/1954 65.5
1127 9386 69386 05/1889 02/1955 65.75
136 9387 69387 05/1889 07/1952 63.17
445 9388 05/1889 12/1945 56.58
523 05/1889 05/1937 48
509 06/1889 01/1937 47.58
1105 9389 69389 06/1889 07/1952 63.08
215 10/1889 01/1937 47.25
216 10/1889 12/1931 42.17
218 11/1889 09/1943 53.83
238 11/1889 07/1929 39.67
345 9390 69390 11/1889 10/1956 66.92
515 9391 69391 11/1889 02/1953 63.25
573 9392 69392 12/1889 04/05/1955 65.42
809 12/1889 03/1937 47.25
1072 9393 69393 12/1889 10/1952 62.83
1168 12/1889 01/1931 41.08
76 9394 69394 02/1890 03/10/1955 65.67
267 9395 69395 02/1890 08/1952 62.5
271 9396 69396 03/1890 08/1949 59.42
287 03/1890 01/1937 46.83
780 9397 69397 03/1890 08/1949 59.42
959 03/1890 05/1934 44.17
961 9398 69398 04/1890 10/1951 61.5
1091 9399 69399 04/1890 04/10/1948 58.5
1104 9400 69400 04/1890 10/1951 61.5
293 9401 69401 05/1890 08/1951 61.25