GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1944) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 8000 | 7978 | 9600 | 69600 | 01/1915 | 03/02/1959 | 44.08 | ||||||
1001 | 8001 | 7979 | 9601 | 69601 | 02/1915 | 05/05/1958 | 43.25 | ||||||
1002 | 8002 | 7980 | 9602 | 69602 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | 38 | ||||||
1003 | 8003 | 7981 | 9603 | 69603 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | 38 | ||||||
1004 | 8004 | 7982 | 9604 | 69604 | 09/1921 | 10/08/1959 | 37.92 | ||||||
1005 | 8005 | 7983 | 9605 | 69605 | 09/1921 | 06/10/1958 | 37.08 | ||||||
1006 | 8006 | 7984 | 9606 | 69606 | 09/1921 | 11/08/1958 | 36.92 | ||||||
1007 | 8007 | 7985 | 9607 | 69607 | 10/1921 | 22/07/1958 | 36.75 | ||||||
1008 | 8008 | 7986 | 9608 | 69608 | 10/1921 | 11/08/1958 | 36.83 | ||||||
1009 | 8009 | 7987 | 9609 | 69609 | 10/1921 | 28/04/1958 | 36.5 | ||||||
1010 | 8010 | 7988 | 9610 | 69610 | 11/1921 | 01/01/1959 | 37.17 | ||||||
1011 | 8011 | 7989 | 9611 | 69611 | 11/1921 | 24/11/1960 | 39 | ||||||
990E | 7990 | 9612 | 69612 | 12/1923 | 03/08/1959 | 35.67 | |||||||
991E | 7991 | 9613 | 69613 | 12/1923 | 09/11/1959 | 35.92 | |||||||
992E | 7992 | 9614 | 69614 | 12/1923 | 04/12/1960 | 37 | |||||||
993E | 7993 | 9615 | 69615 | 01/1924 | 12/09/1960 | 36.67 | |||||||
994E | 7994 | 9616 | 69616 | 01/1924 | 01/01/1959 | 35 | |||||||
995E | 7995 | 9617 | 69617 | 01/1924 | 04/07/1960 | 36.5 | |||||||
996E | 7996 | 9618 | 69618 | 01/1924 | 10/09/1961 | 37.67 | |||||||
997E | 7997 | 9619 | 69619 | 02/1924 | 16/02/1959 | 35 | |||||||
998E | 7998 | 9620 | 69620 | 02/1924 | 24/11/1960 | 36.75 | |||||||
999E | 7999 | 9621 | 69621 | 03/1924 | 11/09/1962 | 38.5 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
409 | 9622 | 69622 | 08/1925 | 24/11/1959 | 34.25 | ||||||||
421 | 9623 | 69623 | 09/1925 | 12/02/1959 | 33.42 | ||||||||
426 | 9624 | 69624 | 10/1925 | 01/12/1958 | 33.17 | ||||||||
456 | 9625 | 69625 | 10/1925 | 17/04/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
457 | 9626 | 69626 | 10/1925 | 08/06/1959 | 33.67 | ||||||||
460 | 9627 | 69627 | 11/1925 | 23/03/1959 | 33.33 | ||||||||
464 | 9628 | 69628 | 11/1925 | 01/12/1958 | 33.08 | ||||||||
471 | 9629 | 69629 | 11/1925 | 29/08/1960 | 34.75 | ||||||||
473 | 9630 | 69630 | 11/1925 | 24/11/1960 | 35 | ||||||||
475 | 9631 | 69631 | 12/1925 | 23/01/1961 | 35.08 | ||||||||
826 | 9632 | 69632 | 01/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.67 | ||||||||
827 | 9633 | 69633 | 02/1926 | 10/08/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
828 | 9634 | 69634 | 02/1926 | 13/01/1959 | 32.92 | ||||||||
829 | 9635 | 69635 | 02/1926 | 09/03/1959 | 33.08 | ||||||||
830 | 9636 | 69636 | 03/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.67 | ||||||||
832 | 9637 | 69637 | 04/1926 | 31/03/1959 | 32.92 | ||||||||
833 | 9638 | 69638 | 04/1926 | 19/05/1959 | 33.08 | ||||||||
834 | 9639 | 69639 | 05/1926 | 05/01/1959 | 32.67 | ||||||||
837 | 9640 | 69640 | 06/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.25 | ||||||||
838 | 9641 | 69641 | 06/1926 | 01/12/1958 | 32.5 | ||||||||
850 | 9642 | 69642 | 07/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.33 | ||||||||
851 | 9643 | 69643 | 07/1926 | 19/05/1958 | 31.83 | ||||||||
852 | 9644 | 69644 | 09/1926 | 27/01/1959 | 32.33 | ||||||||
853 | 9645 | 69645 | 09/1926 | 01/11/1960 | 34.17 | ||||||||
865 | 9646 | 69646 | 10/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 35.92 | ||||||||
866 | 9647 | 69647 | 10/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.08 | ||||||||
867 | 9648 | 69648 | 11/1926 | 29/08/1960 | 33.75 | ||||||||
868 | 9649 | 69649 | 12/1926 | 27/07/1959 | 32.58 | ||||||||
870 | 9650 | 69650 | 12/1926 | 19/05/1959 | 32.42 | ||||||||
873 | 9651 | 69651 | 02/1927 | 13/01/1961 | 33.92 | ||||||||
907 | 9652 | 69652 | 10/1925 | 04/12/1960 | 35.17 | ||||||||
912 | 9653 | 69653 | 10/1925 | 03/05/1962 | 36.58 | ||||||||
913 | 9654 | 69654 | 10/1925 | 04/12/1960 | 35.17 | ||||||||
916 | 9655 | 69655 | 10/1925 | 10/08/1959 | 33.83 | ||||||||
918 | 9656 | 69656 | 10/1925 | 10/04/1961 | 35.5 | ||||||||
919 | 9657 | 69657 | 10/1925 | 08/06/1959 | 33.67 | ||||||||
935 | 9658 | 69658 | 10/1925 | 07/04/1961 | 35.5 | ||||||||
940 | 9659 | 69659 | 11/1925 | 19/01/1959 | 33.17 | ||||||||
941 | 9660 | 69660 | 11/1925 | 18/05/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
947 | 9661 | 69661 | 11/1925 | 19/10/1959 | 33.92 | ||||||||
950 | 9662 | 69662 | 11/1925 | 04/05/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
952 | 9663 | 69663 | 12/1925 | 01/11/1960 | 34.92 | ||||||||
964 | 9664 | 69664 | 12/1925 | 30/11/1960 | 34.92 | ||||||||
966 | 9665 | 69665 | 12/1925 | 29/02/1960 | 34.17 | ||||||||
967 | 9666 | 69666 | 12/1925 | 09/03/1959 | 33.25 | ||||||||
968 | 9667 | 69667 | 12/1925 | 03/02/1959 | 33.17 | ||||||||
970 | 9668 | 69668 | 12/1925 | 10/09/1961 | 35.75 | ||||||||
971 | 9669 | 69669 | 12/1925 | 06/04/1959 | 33.33 | ||||||||
987 | 9670 | 69670 | 01/1926 | 10/09/1961 | 35.67 | ||||||||
988 | 9671 | 69671 | 01/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.67 | ||||||||
2632 | 9672 | 69672 | 11/1927 | 05/10/1959 | 31.92 | ||||||||
2633 | 9673 | 69673 | 11/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 33.83 | ||||||||
2634 | 9674 | 69674 | 11/1927 | 12/06/1961 | 33.58 | ||||||||
2635 | 9675 | 69675 | 11/1927 | 26/06/1961 | 33.58 | ||||||||
2636 | 9676 | 69676 | 12/1927 | 16/02/1959 | 31.17 | ||||||||
2637 | 9677 | 69677 | 12/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2638 | 9678 | 69678 | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2639 | 9679 | 69679 | 01/1928 | 17/01/1961 | 33 | ||||||||
2640 | 9680 | 69680 | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2641 | 9681 | 69681 | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2642 | 9682 | 69682 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2643 | 9683 | 69683 | 07/1927 | 15/02/1960 | 32.58 | ||||||||
2644 | 9684 | 69684 | 07/1927 | 29/08/1960 | 33.08 | ||||||||
2645 | 9685 | 69685 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2646 | 9686 | 69686 | 07/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34.17 | ||||||||
2647 | 9687 | 69687 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2648 | 9688 | 69688 | 07/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.33 | ||||||||
2649 | 9689 | 69689 | 08/1927 | 25/03/1957 | 29.58 | ||||||||
2650 | 9690 | 69690 | 08/1927 | 13/01/1961 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2651 | 9691 | 69691 | 08/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.33 | ||||||||
2652 | 9692 | 69692 | 08/1927 | 16/09/1962 | 35.08 | ||||||||
2653 | 9693 | 69693 | 08/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34.08 | ||||||||
2654 | 9694 | 69694 | 08/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.25 | ||||||||
2655 | 9695 | 69695 | 08/1927 | 01/12/1958 | 31.33 | ||||||||
2656 | 9696 | 69696 | 08/1927 | 27/04/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2657 | 9697 | 69697 | 09/1927 | 16/09/1962 | 35 | ||||||||
2658 | 9698 | 69698 | 09/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34 | ||||||||
2659 | 9699 | 69699 | 09/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.17 | ||||||||
2660 | 9700 | 69700 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.25 | ||||||||
2661 | 9701 | 69701 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.25 | ||||||||
2600 | 9702 | 69702 | 11/1927 | 17/03/1961 | 33.33 | ||||||||
2601 | 9703 | 69703 | 11/1927 | 01/01/1959 | 31.17 | ||||||||
2602 | 9704 | 69704 | 11/1927 | 18/10/1960 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2603 | 9705 | 69705 | 11/1927 | 22/06/1959 | 31.58 | ||||||||
2604 | 9706 | 69706 | 11/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.08 | ||||||||
2605 | 9707 | 69707 | 11/1927 | 27/04/1961 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2606 | 9708 | 69708 | 12/1927 | 13/01/1961 | 33.08 | ||||||||
2607 | 9709 | 69709 | 12/1927 | 01/11/1960 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2608 | 9710 | 69710 | 12/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 33.75 | ||||||||
2609 | 9711 | 69711 | 12/1927 | 23/11/1959 | 31.92 | ||||||||
2610 | 9712 | 69712 | 12/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33 | ||||||||
2611 | 9713 | 69713 | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2612 | 9714 | 69714 | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2613 | 9715 | 69715 | 01/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2614 | 9716 | 69716 | 02/1928 | 12/02/1959 | 31 | ||||||||
2615 | 9717 | 69717 | 02/1928 | 01/01/1959 | 30.92 | ||||||||
2616 | 9718 | 69718 | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2617 | 9719 | 69719 | 03/1928 | 24/11/1960 | 32.67 | ||||||||
2618 | 9720 | 69720 | 04/1928 | 01/11/1960 | 32.58 | ||||||||
2619 | 9721 | 69721 | 06/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.5 | ||||||||
2620 | 9722 | 69722 | 06/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.5 | ||||||||
2621 | 9723 | 69723 | 07/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.17 | ||||||||
2622 | 9724 | 69724 | 07/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.17 | ||||||||
2623 | 9725 | 69725 | 07/1928 | 16/09/1962 | 34.17 | ||||||||
2624 | 9726 | 69726 | 09/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.25 | ||||||||
2625 | 9727 | 69727 | 09/1928 | 24/11/1960 | 32.17 | ||||||||
2626 | 9728 | 69728 | 10/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2627 | 9729 | 69729 | 10/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.17 | ||||||||
2628 | 9730 | 69730 | 11/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2629 | 9731 | 69731 | 11/1928 | 03/02/1959 | 30.25 | ||||||||
2630 | 9732 | 69732 | 12/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 32.75 | ||||||||
2631 | 9733 | 69733 | 12/1928 | 17/10/1960 | 31.83 |