Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 684 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 5282 Week
» 17103 Month
» 185875 Year
» 1070256 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MLSR/LNER Parker "N5" Class 0-6-2T


MSLR MSLR (Renum) WLR WMCQR LYR GCR GCR (Renum) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
7 515 5515 9250 69250 09/1891 08/1956 64.92
47 516 5516 9251 69251 08/1892 07/1949 To London Midland Region 56.92
171 517 5517 9252 69252 11/1892 08/1951 58.75
518 5518 9253 69253 08/1893 11/1955 62.25
519 5519 9254 69254 09/1893 26/05/1956 62.67
520 5520 9255 69255 09/1893 06/1956 62.75
521 5521 09/1893 11/1936 43.17
522 5522 9256 69256 09/1893 11/1955 62.17
523 5523 9257 69257 10/1893 12/1959 66.17
524 5524 9258 69258 10/1893 09/1960 66.92
525 5525 9259 69259 10/1893 11/1958 65.08
526 5526 9260 69260 10/1893 07/1956 62.75
527 5527 9261 69261 10/1893 08/01/1958 64.25
528 5528 9262 69262 10/1893 12/1959 66.17
529 5529 9263 69263 11/1893 17/11/1960 67
530 5530 9264 69264 11/1893 02/1955 61.25
531 5531 11/1893 12/1938 45.08
532 5532 9265 69265 11/1893 12/1959 66.08
533 5533 9266 69266 12/1893 25/11/1960 66.92
534 5534 9267 69267 12/1893 01/1960 66.08
535 5535 9268 69268 01/1894 01/1960 66
537 5537 9271 69271 01/1894 03/08/1958 64.58
538 127 5127 9269 69269 01/1894 10/1958 64.75
539 5539 9272 69272 02/1894 26/05/1956 62.25
540 5540 9273 69273 02/1894 06/1955 61.33
541 5541 9274 69274 02/1894 26/11/1960 66.75
542 5542 9275 69275 02/1894 11/1955 61.75
543 5543 9276 69276 03/1894 12/1959 65.75
544 5544 9277 69277 03/1894 11/1956 62.67
545 5545 9278 69278 03/1894 11/1955 61.67
546 5546 9279 69279 03/1894 06/1955 61.25
547 5547 9280 69280 03/1894 11/1955 61.67
548 5548 9281 69281 03/1894 08/1958 64.42
744 5744 9282 69282 08/1894 07/1955 60.92
745 5745 9283 69283 08/1894 06/1958 63.83
746 5746 9284 69284 08/1894 03/08/1958 64
747 5747 9285 69285 09/1894 11/1955 61.17
748 5748 9286 69286 09/1894 26/11/1960 66.17
749 5749 9287 69287 09/1894 07/1955 60.83
750 5750 9288 69288 10/1894 04/1955 60.5
751 5751 9289 69289 10/1894 20/02/1954 59.33
752 5752 9290 69290 10/1894 10/1959 65
753 5753 9291 69291 11/1894 11/1955 61
754 8 1368 11/1894 01/1914 19.17
755 9 1369 12/1894 01/1914 19.08
536 5536 9293 69293 05/1895 11/1960 65.5
200A 200 5200 9292 69292 09/1895 01/1960 64.33
756 23 756 5756 12/1895 10/1938 42.83
757 5757 9297 69297 02/1896 08/1958 62.5
758 5758 03/1896 11/1937 41.67
759 5759 9298 69298 04/1896 12/1959 63.67
760 5760 9299 69299 05/1896 01/1960 63.67
761 5761 9300 69300 05/1896 03/08/1958 62.25
762 5762 9301 69301 06/1896 12/1955 59.5
201A 54 5054 9296 69296 09/1896 12/1960 64.25
202A 21 5021 9294 69294 10/1896 10/1959 63
203A 25 5025 9295 69295 12/1896 12/04/1958 61.33
754 19 754 5754 01/1896 12/1938 42.92
755 20 755 5755 9302 69302 01/1896 08/01/1958 62
17 409 5409 9270 69270 02/1896 10/1956 60.67
18 410 5410 02/1896 02/1936 40
763 5763 9303 69303 03/1898 11/1955 57.67
764 5764 9304 69304 03/1898 03/1955 57
765 5765 9305 69305 05/1898 03/08/1958 60.25
766 5766 9306 69306 05/1898 11/1955 57.5
767 5767 9307 69307 05/1898 12/1960 62.58
768 5768 9308 69308 05/1898 02/1960 61.75
769 5769 9309 69309 07/1898 23/11/1960 62.33
770 5770 9310 69310 07/1898 11/1955 57.33
771 5771 9311 69311 07/1898 02/1952 53.58
772 5772 9312 69312 07/1898 10/1957 59.25
773 5773 9313 69313 08/1898 03/1955 56.58
774 5774 08/1898 01/1939 40.42
775 5775 9314 69314 08/1898 01/1960 61.42
204A 51 5189 9317 69317 02/1898 02/1956 58
205A 173 5251 02/1898 03/1943 45.08
206A 189 5051 9315 69315 04/1898 06/1958 60.17
207A 251 5173 9316 69316 05/1898 03/1957 58.83
894 5894 9318 69318 03/1899 11/1956 57.67
895 5895 9319 69319 03/1899 12/1959 60.75
896 5896 9320 69320 04/1899 10/1959 60.5
897 5897 9321 69321 05/1899 10/1956 57.42
898 5898 9322 69322 06/1899 06/1959 60
899 5899 9323 69323 06/1899 11/1956 57.42
900 5900 9324 69324 07/1899 08/11/1954 55.33
901 5901 9325 69325 08/1899 09/1956 57.08
902 5902 9326 69326 09/1899 14/12/1957 58.25
903 5903 9327 69327 09/1899 09/1959 60
904 5904 9328 69328 10/1899 01/1957 57.25
905 5905 9329 69329 11/1899 09/1957 57.83
906 5906 9330 69330 11/1899 02/1955 55.25
907 5907 9331 69331 11/1899 01/1957 57.17
908 5908 9332 69332 12/1899 02/1959 59.17
909 5909 9333 69333 12/1899 01/1956 56.08
910 5910 9334 69334 01/1900 07/1956 56.5
911 5911 9335 69335 02/1900 09/1957 57.58
912 5912 9336 69336 03/1900 11/12/1954 54.75
913 5913 9337 69337 03/1900 08/1956 56.42
914 5914 9338 69338 04/1900 03/1955 54.92
915 5915 9339 69339 05/1900 03/1956 55.83
916 5916 9340 69340 06/1900 05/1956 55.92
917 5917 9341 69341 06/1900 12/1959 59.5
918 5918 9342 69342 07/1900 08/1959 59.08
919 5919 9343 69343 09/1900 11/01/1960 Mexborough 59.33
920 5920 9344 69344 10/1900 12/1959 59.17
921 5921 9345 69345 11/1900 10/1956 55.92
922 5922 9346 69346 12/1900 09/1957 56.75
923 5923 9347 69347 12/1900 14/12/1957 57
924 5924 9348 69348 12/1900 01/1957 56.08
925 5925 9349 69349 04/1900 08/1958 58.33
926 5926 9350 69350 04/1900 01/1957 56.75
927 5927 9351 69351 04/1900 10/1956 56.5
928 5928 9352 69352 05/1900 06/1955 55.08
929 5929 9353 69353 05/1900 11/1955 55.5
930 5930 9354 69354 05/1900 02/1960 59.75
931 5931 9355 69355 05/1900 04/1958 57.92
932 5932 9356 69356 05/1900 02/1957 56.75
933 5933 9357 69357 05/1900 11/1955 55.5
934 5934 9358 69358 05/1900 11/1956 56.5
935 5935 9359 69359 05/1900 04/1956 55.92
936 5936 9360 69360 06/1900 03/1960 59.75
937 5937 9361 69361 06/1900 06/1959 59
938 5938 9362 69362 06/1900 08/1958 58.17
939 5939 9363 69363 07/1900 07/1956 56
940 5940 9364 69364 07/1900 08/1955 55.08
941 5941 9365 69365 02/1901 02/1957 56
942 5942 9366 69366 02/1901 08/1956 55.5
943 5943 9367 69367 02/1901 11/1955 54.75
944 5944 9368 69368 02/1901 02/05/1955 54.25
945 5945 9369 69369 03/1901 02/1957 55.92
946 5946 9370 69370 03/1901 09/1960 59.5