Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 684 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 5282 Week
» 17103 Month
» 185875 Year
» 1070256 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "N1" Class 0-6-2T


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
190 9430 69430 04/1907 12/1956 49.67
1551 4551 9431 69431 12/1907 03/1955 47.25
1552 4552 9432 69432 12/1907 08/11/1954 46.92
1553 4553 9433 69433 12/1907 12/1954 47
1554 4554 9434 69434 12/1907 03/1959 51.25
1555 4555 9435 69435 12/1907 03/1955 47.25
1556 4556 9436 69436 12/1907 07/1955 47.58
1557 4557 9437 69437 12/1907 07/1954 46.58
1558 4558 9438 12/1907 02/1947 39.17
1559 4559 9439 69439 12/1907 11/1955 47.92
1560 4560 9440 69440 02/1908 03/1957 49.08
1561 4561 9441 69441 03/1910 05/1955 45.17
1562 4562 9442 69442 03/1910 09/1953 43.5
1563 4563 9443 69443 03/1910 03/1959 49
1564 4564 9444 69444 03/1910 10/1956 46.58
1565 4565 9445 69445 04/1910 01/1955 44.75
1566 4566 9446 69446 04/1910 06/1953 43.17
1567 4567 9447 69447 04/1910 10/1956 46.5
1568 4568 9448 69448 05/1910 01/1953 42.67
1569 4569 9449 69449 05/1910 04/1955 44.92
1570 4570 9450 69450 05/1910 03/1959 48.83
1571 4571 9451 69451 12/1910 10/1955 44.83
1572 4572 9452 69452 12/1910 03/1959 48.25
1573 4573 9453 69453 12/1910 04/1958 47.33
1574 4574 9454 69454 12/1910 02/1955 44.17
1575 4575 9455 69455 12/1910 16/05/1955 44.42
1576 4576 9456 69456 12/1910 15/11/1954 43.92
1577 4577 9457 69457 01/1911 04/1957 46.25
1578 4578 9458 69458 02/1911 11/1955 44.75
1579 4579 9459 69459 02/1911 03/1955 44.08
1580 4580 9460 69460 03/1911 08/1955 44.42
1581 4581 9461 69461 12/1911 06/1954 42.5
1582 4582 9462 69462 12/1911 04/1959 47.33
1583 4583 9463 69463 12/1911 10/1955 43.83
1584 4584 9464 69464 02/1912 08/1955 43.5
1585 4585 9465 69465 02/1912 12/1955 43.83
1586 4586 9466 69466 02/1912 07/1955 43.42
1587 4587 9467 69467 03/1912 07/1956 44.33
1588 4588 9468 69468 03/1912 03/1954 42
1589 4589 9469 69469 03/1912 04/1957 45.08
1590 4590 9470 69470 04/1912 08/1956 44.33
1591 4591 9471 69471 04/1912 01/1956 43.75
1593 4592 9472 69472 04/1912 08/1958 46.33
1592 4593 9473 69473 04/1912 09/1952 40.42
1594 4594 9474 69474 04/1912 03/1959 46.92
1595 4595 9475 69475 05/1912 04/1955 42.92
1596 4596 9476 69476 05/1912 03/1955 42.83
1597 4597 9477 69477 06/1912 04/1959 46.83
1598 4598 9478 69478 06/1912 12/1956 44.5
1599 4599 9479 69479 06/1912 10/1952 40.33
1600 4600 9480 69480 06/1912 06/1951 39
1601 4601 9481 69481 06/1912 05/1956 43.92
1602 4602 9482 69482 06/1912 08/1954 42.17
1603 4603 9483 69483 06/1912 03/1955 42.75
1604 4604 9484 69484 06/1912 09/1957 45.25
1605 4605 9485 69485 06/1912 01/11/1954 42.42