NER/LNER Worsdell "J71" Class 0-6-0T
NER | LNER | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
144 | 11/1886 | 05/1937 | 50.5 | ||||||||
165 | 8230 | 68230 | 11/1886 | 25/01/1960 | 73.17 | ||||||
299 | 8231 | 68231 | 12/1886 | 07/1951 | 64.58 | ||||||
317 | 12/1886 | 05/1936 | 49.42 | ||||||||
261 | 8232 | 68232 | 01/1887 | 04/02/1957 | 70.08 | ||||||
304 | 01/1887 | 02/1936 | 49.08 | ||||||||
399 | 01/1887 | 11/1933 | 46.83 | ||||||||
27 | 02/1887 | 09/1933 | 46.58 | ||||||||
326 | 8233 | 68233 | 02/1887 | 20/02/1961 | 74 | ||||||
533 | 8234 | 68234 | 02/1887 | 21/08/1954 | 67.5 | ||||||
70 | 8235 | 68235 | 04/1887 | 07/11/1960 | 73.58 | ||||||
168 | 8236 | 68236 | 04/1887 | 01/11/1955 | 68.58 | ||||||
263 | 04/1887 | 05/1937 | 50.08 | ||||||||
272 | 8237 | 05/1887 | 07/1947 | 60.17 | |||||||
278 | 05/1887 | 11/1935 | Starbeck | 48.5 | |||||||
347 | 8238 | 68238 | 05/1887 | 10/09/1955 | 68.33 | ||||||
493 | 06/1887 | 07/1939 | 52.08 | ||||||||
494 | 8239 | 68239 | 06/1887 | 23/11/1956 | 69.42 | ||||||
499 | 8240 | 68240 | 06/1887 | 10/09/1956 | 69.25 | ||||||
811 | 06/1887 | 05/1937 | 49.92 | ||||||||
242 | 04/1888 | 10/1936 | 48.5 | ||||||||
268 | 04/1888 | 08/1939 | 51.33 | ||||||||
275 | 8241 | 04/1888 | 07/1947 | 59.25 | |||||||
285 | 05/1888 | 12/1936 | 48.58 | ||||||||
286 | 8242 | 68242 | 05/1888 | 04/08/1958 | 70.25 | ||||||
403 | 8243 | 68243 | 05/1888 | 03/1950 | 61.83 | ||||||
541 | 8244 | 68244 | 06/1888 | 12/04/1958 | 69.83 | ||||||
584 | 06/1888 | 02/1935 | 46.67 | ||||||||
1123 | 8245 | 68245 | 06/1888 | 27/04/1959 | 70.83 | ||||||
1163 | 06/1888 | 10/1933 | 45.33 | ||||||||
1167 | 8246 | 68246 | 07/1889 | 24/11/1958 | 69.33 | ||||||
84 | 07/1889 | 08/1933 | 44.08 | ||||||||
221 | 8247 | 68247 | 07/1889 | 08/1951 | 62.08 | ||||||
224 | 8248 | 68248 | 08/1889 | 03/07/1951 | 61.92 | ||||||
225 | 08/1889 | 05/1937 | 47.75 | ||||||||
453 | 08/1889 | 02/1939 | 49.5 | ||||||||
492 | 8249 | 68249 | 08/1889 | 01/1953 | 63.42 | ||||||
495 | 8250 | 68250 | 09/1889 | 06/04/1959 | 69.58 | ||||||
496 | 09/1889 | 05/1937 | 47.67 | ||||||||
501 | 8251 | 68251 | 09/1889 | 12/01/1959 | 69.33 | ||||||
1083 | 8252 | 68252 | 05/1890 | 15/04/1957 | 66.92 | ||||||
239 | 8253 | 68253 | 05/1890 | 16/09/1957 | 67.33 | ||||||
50 | 8254 | 68254 | 06/1890 | 07/11/1960 | 70.42 | ||||||
241 | 8255 | 68255 | 06/1890 | 18/08/1952 | 62.17 | ||||||
244 | 8256 | 68256 | 06/1890 | 22/07/1954 | 64.08 | ||||||
254 | 8257 | 06/1890 | 05/1947 | 56.92 | |||||||
260 | 8258 | 68258 | 07/1890 | 09/11/1954 | 64.33 | ||||||
296 | 07/1890 | 08/1933 | 43.08 | ||||||||
338 | 8259 | 68259 | 07/1890 | 14/09/1955 | 65.17 | ||||||
400 | 8260 | 68260 | 07/1890 | 07/03/1960 | 69.67 | ||||||
54 | 8261 | 09/1890 | 03/1947 | 56.5 | |||||||
103 | 8262 | 68262 | 09/1890 | 25/01/1960 | 69.33 | ||||||
176 | 8263 | 68263 | 09/1890 | 08/06/1959 | 68.75 | ||||||
177 | 8264 | 68264 | 09/1890 | 25/01/1960 | 69.33 | ||||||
179 | 8265 | 68265 | 09/1890 | 31/08/1959 | 68.92 | ||||||
181 | 8266 | 68266 | 09/1890 | 18/02/1957 | 66.42 | ||||||
248 | 8267 | 68267 | 09/1890 | 14/11/1957 | 67.17 | ||||||
478 | 10/1890 | 09/1933 | 42.92 | ||||||||
482 | 8268 | 68268 | 10/1890 | 26/05/1952 | 61.58 | ||||||
802 | 8269 | 68269 | 10/1890 | 14/10/1960 | 70 | ||||||
77 | 8270 | 68270 | 11/1891 | 21/11/1955 | 64 | ||||||
161 | 8271 | 68271 | 11/1891 | 10/05/1954 | 62.5 | ||||||
252 | 8272 | 68272 | 11/1891 | 06/02/1961 | 69.25 | ||||||
280 | 8273 | 68273 | 11/1891 | 14/11/1957 | 66 | ||||||
447 | 11/1891 | 05/1937 | 45.5 | ||||||||
448 | 11/1891 | 05/1937 | 45.5 | ||||||||
301 | 8274 | 01/1892 | 06/1947 | 55.42 | |||||||
401 | 01/1892 | 09/1936 | 44.67 | ||||||||
449 | 8275 | 68275 | 01/1892 | 08/02/1961 | 69.08 | ||||||
450 | 8276 | 68276 | 01/1892 | 19/11/1956 | 64.83 | ||||||
451 | 01/1892 | 05/1937 | 45.33 | ||||||||
452 | 8277 | 68277 | 01/1892 | 25/11/1950 | 58.83 | ||||||
572 | 8278 | 68278 | 02/1892 | 06/02/1961 | 69 | ||||||
577 | 8279 | 68279 | 02/1892 | 18/06/1957 | 65.33 | ||||||
1085 | 8280 | 68280 | 02/1892 | 02/05/1957 | 65.25 | ||||||
1103 | 8281 | 68281 | 02/1892 | 23/11/1953 | 61.75 | ||||||
1140 | 8282 | 68282 | 03/1892 | 26/10/1953 | 61.58 | ||||||
1142 | 8283 | 68283 | 03/1892 | 30/07/1959 | 67.33 | ||||||
1153 | 8284 | 68284 | 03/1892 | 10/10/1955 | 63.58 | ||||||
1157 | 8285 | 68285 | 03/1892 | 04/10/1948 | 56.58 | ||||||
237 | 8286 | 68286 | 07/1892 | 16/06/1952 | 59.92 | ||||||
240 | 8287 | 68287 | 07/1892 | 26/11/1956 | 64.33 | ||||||
402 | 07/1892 | 09/1933 | 41.17 | ||||||||
1084 | 8288 | 68288 | 07/1892 | 25/11/1950 | 58.33 | ||||||
1095 | 8289 | 68289 | 07/1892 | 20/06/1955 | 62.92 | ||||||
1143 | 8290 | 68290 | 07/1892 | 12/01/1959 | 66.5 | ||||||
1144 | 07/1892 | 05/1937 | 44.83 | ||||||||
1151 | 8291 | 68291 | 08/1892 | 26/05/1956 | 63.75 | ||||||
1155 | 8292 | 68292 | 08/1892 | 16/10/1954 | 62.17 | ||||||
1314 | 08/1892 | 05/1937 | 44.75 | ||||||||
1196 | 8293 | 68293 | 11/1892 | 10/09/1956 | 63.83 | ||||||
1197 | 8294 | 68294 | 11/1892 | 10/11/1956 | 64 | ||||||
1198 | 8295 | 68295 | 11/1892 | 23/02/1959 | 66.25 | ||||||
1199 | 8296 | 68296 | 11/1892 | 19/07/1958 | 65.67 | ||||||
969 | 01/1893 | 09/1933 | 40.67 | ||||||||
972 | 8297 | 68297 | 01/1893 | 26/05/1956 | 63.33 | ||||||
137 | 8298 | 68298 | 01/1893 | 27/03/1957 | 64.17 | ||||||
977 | 8299 | 68299 | 01/1893 | 01/12/1952 | 59.92 | ||||||
978 | 8300 | 68300 | 01/1893 | 07/03/1955 | 62.17 | ||||||
980 | 8301 | 68301 | 01/1893 | 26/11/1956 | 63.83 | ||||||
1666 | 11/1894 | 08/1933 | 38.75 | ||||||||
1735 | 8302 | 68302 | 11/1894 | 30/08/1951 | 56.75 | ||||||
1796 | 8303 | 68303 | 11/1894 | 13/06/1955 | 60.58 | ||||||
1797 | 8304 | 68304 | 12/1894 | 09/11/1954 | 59.92 | ||||||
1831 | 8305 | 68305 | 12/1894 | 24/11/1958 | 63.92 | ||||||
1832 | 8306 | 68306 | 12/1894 | 19/07/1958 | 63.58 | ||||||
1833 | 8307 | 68307 | 12/1894 | 20/06/1955 | 60.5 | ||||||
1834 | 8308 | 68308 | 12/1894 | 19/05/1958 | 63.42 | ||||||
1835 | 12/1894 | 05/1937 | 42.42 | ||||||||
1836 | 8309 | 68309 | 12/1894 | 14/04/1960 | 65.33 | ||||||
1134 | 8310 | 68310 | 08/1895 | 12/1950 | 55.33 | ||||||
1758 | 09/1895 | 09/1933 | 38 | ||||||||
1789 | 8311 | 68311 | 09/1895 | 08/1951 | 55.92 | ||||||
1688 | 8312 | 68312 | 10/1895 | 02/02/1959 | 63.33 | ||||||
1689 | 8313 | 68313 | 10/1895 | 03/09/1956 | 60.92 | ||||||
1690 | 8314 | 68314 | 10/1895 | 14/04/1960 | 64.5 | ||||||
1861 | 8315 | 10/1895 | 04/1946 | 50.5 | |||||||
1862 | 10/1895 | 05/1937 | 41.58 | ||||||||
1863 | 11/1895 | 05/1937 | 41.5 | ||||||||
1864 | 8316 | 68316 | 11/1895 | 14/10/1960 | 64.92 |