MLSR/LNER Parker "J10" Class 0-6-0
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
670 | 5670 | 07/1892 | 08/1938 | 46.08 | |||||||||
671 | 5671 | 07/1892 | 09/1933 | 41.17 | |||||||||
672 | 5672 | 07/1892 | 07/1933 | 41 | |||||||||
673 | 5673 | 5127 | 65127 | 08/1892 | 10/1958 | 66.17 | |||||||
674 | 5674 | 08/1892 | 07/1933 | 40.92 | |||||||||
675 | 5675 | 5128 | 65128 | 08/1892 | 09/10/1950 | 58.17 | |||||||
676 | 5676 | 09/1892 | 09/1933 | 41 | |||||||||
677 | 5677 | 09/1892 | 11/1935 | 43.17 | |||||||||
678 | 5678 | 5129 | 09/1892 | 05/1944 | 51.67 | ||||||||
679 | 5679 | 09/1892 | 09/1935 | 43 | |||||||||
680 | 5680 | 5130 | 65130 | 09/1892 | 25/08/1952 | 59.92 | |||||||
681 | 5681 | 10/1892 | 09/1935 | 42.92 | |||||||||
639 | 5639 | 03/1893 | 03/1933 | 40 | |||||||||
640 | 5640 | 04/1893 | 07/1943 | 50.25 | |||||||||
641 | 5641 | 05/1893 | 10/1938 | 45.42 | |||||||||
642 | 5642 | 06/1893 | 08/1933 | 40.17 | |||||||||
643 | 5643 | 5126 | 65126 | 08/1893 | 29/12/1952 | 59.33 | |||||||
644 | 5644 | 12/1893 | 06/1938 | 44.5 | |||||||||
786 | 5786 | 02/1896 | 03/1935 | 39.08 | |||||||||
787 | 5787 | 5131 | 65131 | 03/1896 | 28/03/1959 | 63 | |||||||
788 | 5788 | 5132 | 65132 | 03/1896 | 10/05/1958 | 62.17 | |||||||
789 | 5789 | 5133 | 65133 | 03/1896 | 12/12/1959 | 63.75 | |||||||
790 | 5790 | 03/1896 | 01/1939 | 42.83 | |||||||||
791 | 5791 | 03/1896 | 06/1933 | 37.25 | |||||||||
792 | 5792 | 5134 | 65134 | 04/1896 | 26/12/1959 | 63.67 | |||||||
793 | 5793 | 5135 | 65135 | 04/1896 | 19/04/1958 | 62 | |||||||
794 | 5794 | 5136 | 65136 | 04/1896 | 16/02/1953 | 56.83 | |||||||
795 | 5795 | 5137 | 65137 | 05/1896 | 28/04/1952 | 55.92 | |||||||
796 | 5796 | 05/1896 | 08/1935 | 39.25 | |||||||||
797 | 5797 | 5138 | 65138 | 06/1896 | 08/08/1959 | 63.17 | |||||||
798 | 5798 | 5139 | 65139 | 06/1896 | 29/12/1956 | 60.5 | |||||||
799 | 5799 | 5140 | 65140 | 06/1896 | 05/12/1959 | 63.5 | |||||||
800 | 5800 | 06/1896 | 11/1938 | 42.42 | |||||||||
801 | 5801 | 07/1896 | 12/1937 | 41.42 | |||||||||
802 | 5802 | 5141 | 65141 | 07/1896 | 22/09/1952 | 56.17 | |||||||
803 | 5803 | 5142 | 65142 | 07/1896 | 08/10/1958 | 62.25 | |||||||
804 | 5804 | 07/1896 | 09/1937 | 41.17 | |||||||||
805 | 5805 | 5143 | 65143 | 07/1896 | 22/09/1956 | 60.17 | |||||||
806 | 5806 | 07/1896 | 05/1933 | 36.83 | |||||||||
807 | 5807 | 5144 | 65144 | 07/1896 | 03/1958 | 61.67 | |||||||
808 | 5808 | 5145 | 65145 | 08/1896 | 11/12/1958 | 62.33 | |||||||
809 | 5809 | 5146 | 65146 | 09/1896 | 13/12/1958 | 62.25 | |||||||
810 | 5810 | 09/1896 | 12/1934 | 38.25 | |||||||||
811 | 5811 | 5147 | 65147 | 09/1896 | 12/03/1958 | 61.5 | |||||||
812 | 5812 | 5148 | 65148 | 10/1896 | 10/12/1956 | 60.17 | |||||||
813 | 5813 | 10/1896 | 09/1934 | 37.92 | |||||||||
814 | 5814 | 10/1896 | 06/1935 | 38.67 | |||||||||
815 | 5815 | 5149 | 65149 | 11/1896 | 16/03/1953 | 56.33 | |||||||
816 | 5816 | 11/1896 | 08/1935 | 38.75 | |||||||||
817 | 5817 | 11/1896 | 09/1938 | 41.83 | |||||||||
818 | 5818 | 5150 | 11/1896 | 10/12/1947 | 51.08 | ||||||||
819 | 5819 | 5151 | 65151 | 11/1896 | 24/03/1952 | 55.33 | |||||||
820 | 5820 | 5152 | 12/1896 | 02/1947 | 50.17 | ||||||||
821 | 5821 | 5153 | 65153 | 12/1896 | 06/12/1956 | 60 | |||||||
822 | 5822 | 12/1896 | 10/1936 | 39.83 | |||||||||
823 | 5823 | 5154 | 65154 | 12/1896 | 13/06/1953 | 56.5 | |||||||
824 | 5824 | 5155 | 65155 | 12/1896 | 09/06/1952 | 55.5 | |||||||
825 | 5825 | 01/1897 | 02/1939 | 42.08 | |||||||||
826 | 5826 | 01/1897 | 08/1933 | 36.58 | |||||||||
827 | 5827 | 5156 | 65156 | 01/1897 | 15/02/1958 | 61.08 | |||||||
828 | 5828 | 5157 | 65157 | 01/1897 | 26/08/1961 | 64.58 | |||||||
829 | 5829 | 01/1897 | 10/1938 | 41.75 | |||||||||
830 | 5830 | 01/1897 | 07/1938 | 41.5 | |||||||||
831 | 5831 | 5158 | 65158 | 02/1897 | 12/12/1959 | 62.83 | |||||||
832 | 5832 | 5159 | 65159 | 02/1897 | 21/12/1957 | 60.83 | |||||||
833 | 5833 | 02/1897 | 01/1935 | 37.92 | |||||||||
834 | 5834 | 02/1897 | 10/1938 | 41.67 | |||||||||
835 | 5835 | 5160 | 65160 | 02/1897 | 07/06/1958 | 61.33 | |||||||
836 | 5836 | 5161 | 65161 | 02/1897 | 27/10/1952 | 55.67 | |||||||
837 | 5837 | 5162 | 65162 | 02/1897 | 13/12/1956 | 59.83 | |||||||
838 | 5838 | 5163 | 65163 | 02/1897 | 22/12/1952 | 55.83 | |||||||
839 | 5839 | 5164 | 65164 | 03/1897 | 16/05/1953 | 56.17 | |||||||
840 | 5840 | 03/1897 | 01/1935 | 37.83 | |||||||||
841 | 5841 | 5165 | 65165 | 03/1897 | 24/03/1956 | 59 | |||||||
842 | 5842 | 03/1897 | 08/1938 | 41.42 | |||||||||
843 | 5843 | 03/1897 | 10/1938 | 41.58 | |||||||||
844 | 5844 | 03/1897 | 02/1935 | 37.92 | |||||||||
845 | 5845 | 04/1897 | 06/1937 | 40.17 | |||||||||
846 | 5846 | 5166 | 65166 | 04/1897 | 12/12/1959 | 62.67 | |||||||
847 | 5847 | 5167 | 65167 | 04/1897 | 06/09/1958 | 61.42 | |||||||
848 | 5848 | 5168 | 65168 | 04/1897 | 15/12/1952 | 55.67 | |||||||
849 | 5849 | 5169 | 65169 | 05/1897 | 13/02/1960 | 62.75 | |||||||
850 | 5850 | 5170 | 65170 | 05/1897 | 28/06/1958 | 61.08 | |||||||
851 | 5851 | 5171 | 65171 | 05/1897 | 06/10/1956 | 59.42 | |||||||
74 | 5074 | 5172 | 65172 | 02/1901 | 16/02/1953 | 52 | |||||||
75 | 5075 | 5173 | 65173 | 02/1901 | 14/12/1956 | 55.83 | |||||||
76 | 5076 | 5174 | 03/1901 | 08/1947 | 46.42 | ||||||||
77 | 5077 | 5175 | 65175 | 03/1901 | 03/1958 | 57 | |||||||
79 | 5079 | 04/1901 | 01/1939 | 37.75 | |||||||||
80 | 5080 | 5176 | 65176 | 04/1901 | 07/12/1956 | 55.67 | |||||||
81 | 5081 | 5177 | 65177 | 05/1901 | 26/09/1959 | 58.33 | |||||||
82 | 5082 | 5178 | 65178 | 05/1901 | 11/10/1958 | 57.42 | |||||||
83 | 5083 | 5179 | 65179 | 06/1901 | 24/11/1952 | 51.42 | |||||||
84 | 5084 | 06/1901 | 04/1937 | 35.83 | |||||||||
90 | 5090 | 5180 | 65180 | 06/1901 | 22/12/1956 | 55.5 | |||||||
94 | 5094 | 5181 | 65181 | 06/1901 | 06/12/1956 | 55.5 | |||||||
95 | 5095 | 5182 | 65182 | 07/1901 | 24/11/1956 | 55.33 | |||||||
96 | 5096 | 5183 | 65183 | 08/1901 | 12/05/1952 | 50.75 | |||||||
97 | 5097 | 5184 | 65184 | 08/1901 | 03/10/1959 | 58.17 | |||||||
98 | 5098 | 5185 | 65185 | 08/1901 | 03/12/1956 | 55.33 | |||||||
99 | 5099 | 5186 | 65186 | 09/1901 | 10/08/1957 | 55.92 | |||||||
100 | 5100 | 5187 | 65187 | 10/1901 | 28/02/1959 | 57.33 | |||||||
101 | 5101 | 5188 | 65188 | 10/1901 | 25/08/1952 | 50.83 | |||||||
103 | 5103 | 5189 | 65189 | 11/1901 | 22/09/1952 | 50.83 | |||||||
116 | 5116 | 5190 | 65190 | 12/1901 | 30/03/1953 | 51.25 | |||||||
117 | 5117 | 5191 | 65191 | 12/1901 | 11/01/1958 | 56.08 | |||||||
118 | 5118 | 5192 | 65192 | 01/1902 | 14/05/1960 | 58.33 | |||||||
119 | 5119 | 5193 | 65193 | 01/1902 | 04/08/1952 | 50.58 | |||||||
120 | 5120 | 5194 | 65194 | 02/1902 | 12/12/1959 | 57.83 | |||||||
121 | 5121 | 5195 | 65195 | 04/1902 | 03/02/1948 | 45.83 | |||||||
122 | 5122 | 5196 | 65196 | 02/1902 | 02/06/1958 | 56.33 | |||||||
123 | 5123 | 5197 | 65197 | 08/1902 | 12/05/1956 | 53.75 | |||||||
124 | 5124 | 5198 | 65198 | 04/1902 | 26/08/1961 | 59.33 | |||||||
125 | 5125 | 5199 | 65199 | 08/1902 | 13/12/1958 | 56.33 | |||||||
126 | 5126 | 5200 | 65200 | 09/1902 | 26/04/1958 | 55.58 | |||||||
130 | 5130 | 5201 | 65201 | 03/1902 | 30/03/1953 | 51 | |||||||
131 | 5131 | 5202 | 65202 | 03/1902 | 22/03/1958 | 56 | |||||||
132 | 5132 | 5203 | 65203 | 05/1902 | 17/12/1956 | 54.58 | |||||||
134 | 5134 | 5204 | 65204 | 05/1902 | 17/11/1952 | 50.5 | |||||||
141 | 5141 | 5205 | 65205 | 06/1902 | 07/07/1956 | 54.08 | |||||||
172 | 5172 | 5206 | 06/1902 | 28/11/1947 | 45.42 | ||||||||
174 | 5174 | 5207 | 10/1902 | 04/11/1947 | 45.08 | ||||||||
175 | 5175 | 5208 | 65208 | 06/1902 | 12/1958 | 56.5 | |||||||
176 | 5176 | 5209 | 65209 | 07/1902 | 08/11/1958 | 56.33 |