GNR/LNER Ivatt "J4" Class 0-6-0
GNR | MGNR | GNR (Dup) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1936) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
171 | 12/1873 | 1923 | 49 | |||||||||||||
193 | 3193 | 12/1873 | 02/1927 | 53.17 | ||||||||||||
372 | 3372 | 04/1874 | 04/1926 | 52 | ||||||||||||
373 | 3373 | 05/1874 | 01/1926 | 51.67 | ||||||||||||
354 | 3354 | 07/1874 | 08/1926 | 52.08 | ||||||||||||
198 | 3198 | 08/1874 | 05/1927 | 52.75 | ||||||||||||
196 | 3196 | 12/1874 | 02/1927 | 52.17 | ||||||||||||
173 | 03/1875 | 1923 | 47.75 | |||||||||||||
340 | 03/1875 | 1923 | 47.75 | |||||||||||||
365 | 3365 | 04/1875 | 08/1925 | 50.33 | ||||||||||||
141 | 05/1875 | 1923 | 47.58 | |||||||||||||
163 | 05/1875 | 1923 | 47.58 | |||||||||||||
339 | 3339 | 06/1875 | 06/1928 | 53 | ||||||||||||
187 | 3187 | 08/1875 | 01/1926 | 50.42 | ||||||||||||
328 | 09/1875 | 1923 | 47.25 | |||||||||||||
194 | 09/1875 | 1923 | 47.25 | |||||||||||||
312 | 3312 | 03/1876 | 04/1926 | 50.08 | ||||||||||||
314 | 3314 | 04/1876 | 01/1926 | 49.75 | ||||||||||||
310 | 06/1878 | 1923 | 44.5 | |||||||||||||
393 | 06/1878 | 1923 | 44.5 | |||||||||||||
641 | 3641 | 08/1878 | 04/1926 | 47.67 | ||||||||||||
642 | 3642 | 10/1878 | 10/1927 | 49 | ||||||||||||
643 | 3643 | 12/1878 | 11/1929 | 50.92 | ||||||||||||
644 | 3644 | 02/1879 | 02/1924 | 45 | ||||||||||||
645 | 04/1879 | 1923 | 43.67 | |||||||||||||
160 | 05/1879 | 1923 | 43.58 | |||||||||||||
646 | 3646 | 07/1879 | 03/1928 | 48.67 | ||||||||||||
133 | 08/1879 | 1923 | 43.33 | |||||||||||||
168 | 09/1879 | 1923 | 43.25 | |||||||||||||
154 | 10/1879 | 1923 | 43.17 | |||||||||||||
640 | 640A | 3640 | 06/1880 | 08/1929 | 49.17 | |||||||||||
647 | 09/1880 | 1923 | 42.25 | |||||||||||||
648 | 3648 | 10/1880 | 04/1926 | 45.5 | ||||||||||||
649 | 11/1880 | 1923 | 42.08 | |||||||||||||
650 | 12/1880 | 1923 | 42 | |||||||||||||
651 | 12/1881 | 1923 | 41 | |||||||||||||
102 | 3102 | 12/1881 | 10/1931 | 07/1927 to J3 |
49.83 | |||||||||||
101 | 3101 | 12/1881 | 06/1928 | 46.5 | ||||||||||||
716 | 3716 | 08/1882 | 07/1931 | 02/1925 to J3 |
48.92 | |||||||||||
717 | 3717 | 08/1882 | 11/1939 | 03/1917 to J3 |
57.25 | |||||||||||
718 | 3718 | 08/1882 | 08/1926 | 44 | ||||||||||||
719 | 3719 | 09/1882 | 12/1929 | 47.25 | ||||||||||||
720 | 09/1882 | 1923 | 40.25 | |||||||||||||
721 | 3721 | 09/1882 | 05/1933 | 01/1924 to J3 |
50.67 | |||||||||||
722 | 09/1882 | 1923 | 40.25 | |||||||||||||
723 | 10/1882 | 1923 | 40.17 | |||||||||||||
724 | 3724 | 10/1882 | 12/1929 | 05/1925 to J3 |
47.17 | |||||||||||
725 | 3725 | 10/1882 | 12/1928 | 46.17 | ||||||||||||
726 | 3726 | 10/1882 | 08/1928 | 45.83 | ||||||||||||
727 | 3727 | 10/1882 | 08/1926 | 43.83 | ||||||||||||
728 | 11/1882 | 1923 | 40.08 | |||||||||||||
729 | 3729 | 11/1882 | 08/1926 | 43.75 | ||||||||||||
730 | 3730 | 11/1882 | 07/1930 | 12/1923 to J3 |
47.67 | |||||||||||
731 | 3731 | 06/1882 | 05/1934 | 02/1927 to J3 |
51.92 | |||||||||||
732 | 06/1882 | 1923 | 40.5 | |||||||||||||
733 | 06/1882 | 1923 | 40.5 | |||||||||||||
734 | 3734 | 07/1882 | 01/1926 | 43.5 | ||||||||||||
735 | 07/1882 | 1923 | 40.42 | |||||||||||||
736 | 07/1882 | 1923 | 40.42 | |||||||||||||
737 | 07/1882 | 1923 | 40.42 | |||||||||||||
738 | 08/1882 | 1923 | 40.33 | |||||||||||||
739 | 08/1882 | 1923 | 40.33 | |||||||||||||
740 | 08/1882 | 1923 | 40.33 | |||||||||||||
741 | 09/1882 | 1923 | 40.25 | |||||||||||||
742 | 09/1882 | 1923 | 40.25 | |||||||||||||
743 | 09/1882 | 1923 | 40.25 | |||||||||||||
744 | 3744 | 10/1882 | 06/1925 | 42.67 | ||||||||||||
745 | 3745 | 10/1882 | 10/1928 | 46 | ||||||||||||
746 | 3746 | 11/1882 | 01/1926 | 43.17 | ||||||||||||
747 | 11/1882 | 1923 | 40.08 | |||||||||||||
748 | 3748 | 11/1882 | 09/1930 | 05/1924 to J3 |
47.83 | |||||||||||
749 | 11/1882 | 1923 | 40.08 | |||||||||||||
750 | 3750 | 11/1882 | 06/1925 | 42.58 | ||||||||||||
791 | 03/1886 | 1923 | 36.75 | |||||||||||||
792 | 3792 | 04/1886 | 04/1930 | 11/1925 to J3 |
44 | |||||||||||
793 | 3793 | 05/1886 | 07/1933 | 06/1925 to J3 |
47.17 | |||||||||||
794 | 06/1886 | 1923 | 36.5 | |||||||||||||
795 | 06/1886 | 1923 | 36.5 | |||||||||||||
796 | 07/1886 | 1923 | 36.42 | |||||||||||||
797 | 3797 | 08/1886 | 11/1927 | 41.25 | ||||||||||||
798 | 09/1886 | 1923 | 36.25 | |||||||||||||
799 | 3799 | 10/1886 | 09/1930 | 07/1925 to J3 |
43.92 | |||||||||||
800 | 11/1886 | 1923 | 36.08 | |||||||||||||
322 | 02/1887 | 1923 | 35.83 | |||||||||||||
307 | 3307 | 03/1887 | 10/1927 | 40.58 | ||||||||||||
199 | 3199 | 08/1887 | 01/1930 | 42.42 | ||||||||||||
320 | 09/1887 | 1923 | 35.25 | |||||||||||||
176 | 09/1887 | 1923 | 35.25 | |||||||||||||
183 | 10/1887 | 1923 | 35.17 | |||||||||||||
389 | 11/1887 | 1923 | 35.08 | |||||||||||||
147 | 147A | 3147 | 12/1887 | 08/1925 | 37.67 | |||||||||||
178 | 07/1888 | 1923 | 34.42 | |||||||||||||
309 | 07/1888 | 1923 | 34.42 | |||||||||||||
150 | 150A | 3150 | 08/1888 | 05/1929 | 40.75 | |||||||||||
324 | 08/1888 | 1923 | 34.33 | |||||||||||||
181 | 3181 | 08/1888 | 08/1926 | 38 | ||||||||||||
321 | 08/1888 | 1923 | 34.33 | |||||||||||||
323 | 3323 | 12/1888 | 01/1930 | 41.08 | ||||||||||||
382 | 12/1888 | 1923 | 34 | |||||||||||||
300 | 04/1889 | 1923 | 33.67 | |||||||||||||
301 | 04/1889 | 1923 | 33.67 | |||||||||||||
330 | 06/1889 | 1923 | 33.5 | |||||||||||||
135 | 135A | 3135 | 06/1889 | 04/1926 | 36.83 | |||||||||||
191 | 3191 | 08/1889 | 08/1925 | 36 | ||||||||||||
195 | 3195 | 09/1889 | 05/1927 | 37.67 | ||||||||||||
170 | 170A | 3170 | 10/1889 | 09/1925 | 35.92 | |||||||||||
383 | 3383 | 12/1889 | 08/1925 | 35.67 | ||||||||||||
342 | 3342 | 02/1890 | 03/1929 | 10/1918 to J3 |
39.08 | |||||||||||
347 | 02/1890 | 1923 | 32.83 | |||||||||||||
175 | 175A | 3175 | 02/1890 | 04/1926 | 36.17 | |||||||||||
391 | 03/1890 | 1923 | 32.75 | |||||||||||||
378 | 3378 | 08/1890 | 09/1933 | 04/1925 to J3 |
43.08 | |||||||||||
370 | 08/1890 | 1923 | 32.33 | |||||||||||||
831 | 3831 | 12/1890 | 02/1927 | 36.17 | ||||||||||||
832 | 3832 | 02/1891 | 08/1926 | 35.5 | ||||||||||||
833 | 3833 | 04/1891 | 06/1928 | 37.17 | ||||||||||||
834 | 3834 | 04/1891 | 04/1926 | 35 | ||||||||||||
835 | 05/1891 | 1923 | 31.58 | |||||||||||||
385 | 3385 | 06/1891 | 01/1929 | 37.58 | ||||||||||||
836 | 06/1891 | 1923 | 31.5 | |||||||||||||
379 | 3379 | 07/1891 | 05/1932 | 02/1919 to J3 |
40.83 | |||||||||||
837 | 3837 | 08/1891 | 12/1929 | 09/1924 to J3 |
38.33 | |||||||||||
839 | 3839 | 08/1891 | 12/1929 | 38.33 | ||||||||||||
838 | 3838 | 09/1891 | 11/1928 | 37.17 | ||||||||||||
840 | 3840 | 10/1891 | 06/1925 | 33.67 | ||||||||||||
841 | 10/1891 | 1923 | 31.17 | |||||||||||||
845 | 3845 | 11/1891 | 12/1928 | 37.08 | ||||||||||||
842 | 11/1891 | 1923 | 31.08 | |||||||||||||
846 | 3846 | 12/1891 | 03/1930 | 38.25 | ||||||||||||
843 | 3843 | 12/1891 | 07/1930 | 38.58 | ||||||||||||
847 | 02/1892 | 1923 | 30.83 | |||||||||||||
844 | 3844 | 02/1892 | 10/1928 | 36.67 | ||||||||||||
848 | 3848 | 02/1892 | 12/1928 | 36.83 | ||||||||||||
849 | 3849 | 03/1892 | 12/1931 | 39.75 | ||||||||||||
850 | 3850 | 04/1892 | 01/1940 | 09/1929 to J3 |
47.75 | |||||||||||
317 | 3317 | 04/1892 | 07/1928 | 36.25 | ||||||||||||
341 | 04/1892 | 1923 | 30.67 | |||||||||||||
143 | 08/1892 | 1923 | 30.33 | |||||||||||||
346 | 08/1892 | 1923 | 30.33 | |||||||||||||
313 | 3313 | 4105 | 64105 | 12/1892 | 21/01/1952 | 10/1925 to J3 |
59.08 | |||||||||
182 | 3182 | 12/1892 | 03/1928 | 35.25 | ||||||||||||
319 | 10/1893 | 1923 | 29.17 | |||||||||||||
327 | 11/1893 | 1923 | 29.08 | |||||||||||||
1011 | 4011 | 01/1894 | 01/1940 | 04/1927 to J3 |
46 | |||||||||||
1012 | 4012 | 02/1894 | 06/1930 | 05/1927 to J3 |
36.33 | |||||||||||
1031 | 4031 | 06/1896 | 10/1931 | 07/1926 to J3 |
35.33 | |||||||||||
1032 | 4032 | 06/1896 | 01/1926 | 02/1928 to J3 |
29.58 | |||||||||||
1033 | 4033 | 06/1896 | 07/1938 | 03/1928 to J3 |
42.08 | |||||||||||
1034 | 4034 | 06/1896 | 07/1932 | 36.08 | ||||||||||||
1035 | 4035 | 4106 | 64106 | 06/1896 | 05/1949 | 08/1927 to J3 |
52.92 | |||||||||
1036 | 4036 | 4107 | 64107 | 06/1896 | 16/10/1948 | 01/1924 to J3 |
52.33 | |||||||||
1037 | 4037 | 06/1896 | 02/1939 | 02/1924 to J3 |
42.67 | |||||||||||
1038 | 07/1896 | 1923 | 26.42 | |||||||||||||
1039 | 4039 | 4108 | 07/1896 | 08/1947 | 05/1925 to J3 |
51.08 | ||||||||||
1040 | 4040 | 4109 | 64109 | 07/1896 | 10/1949 | 53.25 | ||||||||||
1041 | 4041 | 4110 | 64110 | 07/1896 | 05/1949 | 52.83 | ||||||||||
1042 | 07/1896 | 1923 | 26.42 | |||||||||||||
1043 | 4043 | 07/1896 | 04/1932 | 35.75 | ||||||||||||
1044 | 4044 | 07/1896 | 06/1932 | 35.92 | ||||||||||||
1045 | 4045 | 07/1896 | 10/1935 | 01/1919 to J3 |
39.25 | |||||||||||
1081 | 4081 | 09/1896 | 02/1939 | 12/1923 to J3 |
42.42 | |||||||||||
1082 | 4082 | 10/1896 | 04/1935 | 07/1913 to J3 |
38.5 | |||||||||||
1083 | 4083 | 10/1896 | 01/1938 | 41.25 | ||||||||||||
1084 | 4084 | 10/1896 | 03/1933 | 36.42 | ||||||||||||
1085 | 4085 | 10/1896 | 01/1930 | 33.25 | ||||||||||||
1086 | 4086 | 11/1896 | 08/1935 | 04/1924 to J3 |
38.75 | |||||||||||
1087 | 4087 | 11/1896 | 10/1931 | 02/1928 to J3 |
34.92 | |||||||||||
1088 | 4088 | 4111 | 11/1896 | 08/1947 | 08/1929 to J3 |
50.75 | ||||||||||
1089 | 12/1896 | 12/1920 | 24 | |||||||||||||
1090 | 4090 | 4112 | 64112 | 12/1896 | 10/12/1951 | 55 | ||||||||||
1091 | 4091 | 12/1897 | 11/1932 | 01/1918 to J3 |
34.92 | |||||||||||
1092 | 4092 | 4113 | 12/1897 | 08/1947 | 09/1923 to J3 |
49.67 | ||||||||||
1093 | 4093 | 4114 | 64114 | 12/1897 | 10/1952 | 07/1925 to J3 |
54.83 | |||||||||
1094 | 4094 | 4115 | 64115 | 12/1897 | 03/1951 | 12/1917 to J3 |
53.25 | |||||||||
1095 | 4095 | 01/1898 | 04/1934 | 02/1924 to J3 |
36.25 | |||||||||||
1096 | 4096 | 02/1898 | 11/1938 | 11/1914 to J3 |
40.75 | |||||||||||
1097 | 4097 | 4116 | 64116 | 02/1898 | 02/06/1952 | 12/1923 to J3 |
54.33 | |||||||||
1098 | 4098 | 02/1898 | 05/1933 | 06/1926 to J3 |
35.25 | |||||||||||
1099 | 4099 | 02/1898 | 11/1937 | 02/1914 to J3 |
39.75 | |||||||||||
1100 | 4100 | 4117 | 64117 | 03/1898 | 06/1952 | 11/1918 to J3 |
54.25 | |||||||||
1101 | 4101 | 12/1898 | 04/1933 | 08/1925 to J3 |
34.33 | |||||||||||
1102 | 4102 | 12/1898 | 11/1932 | 05/1923 to J3 |
33.92 | |||||||||||
1103 | 4103 | 4118 | 64118 | 01/1899 | 02/06/1952 | 07/1916 to J3 |
53.42 | |||||||||
1104 | 4104 | 01/1899 | 10/1935 | 08/1919 to J3 |
36.75 | |||||||||||
1105 | 4105 | 4119 | 64119 | 01/1899 | 07/1951 | 11/1917 to J3 |
52.5 | |||||||||
1106 | 4106 | 4120 | 64120 | 02/1899 | 11/1950 | 51.75 | ||||||||||
1107 | 4107 | 4121 | 64121 | 02/1899 | 25/11/1950 | 51.75 | ||||||||||
1108 | 4108 | 02/1899 | 09/1935 | 09/1918 to J3 |
36.58 | |||||||||||
1109 | 4109 | 4122 | 64122 | 02/1899 | 04/1953 | 05/1919 to J3 |
54.17 | |||||||||
1110 | 4110 | 02/1899 | 08/1938 | 09/1923 to J3 |
39.5 | |||||||||||
1111 | 4111 | 03/1899 | 06/1937 | 06/1925 to J3 |
38.25 | |||||||||||
1112 | 4112 | 03/1899 | 07/1932 | 05/1923 to J3 |
33.33 | |||||||||||
1113 | 4113 | 4123 | 64123 | 03/1899 | 21/05/1951 | 02/1916 to J3 |
52.17 | |||||||||
1114 | 4114 | 4124 | 64124 | 03/1899 | 10/1951 | 09/1916 to J3 |
52.58 | |||||||||
1115 | 4115 | 03/1899 | 01/1933 | 02/1915 to J3 |
33.83 | |||||||||||
1116 | 4116 | 04/1899 | 01/1936 | 06/1923 to J3 |
36.75 | |||||||||||
1117 | 4117 | 04/1899 | 04/1933 | 11/1925 to J3 |
34 | |||||||||||
1118 | 4118 | 04/1899 | 03/1934 | 05/1925 to J3 |
34.92 | |||||||||||
1119 | 4119 | 04/1899 | 07/1932 | 07/1916 to J3 |
33.25 | |||||||||||
1120 | 4120 | 04/1899 | 11/1932 | 12/1914 to J3 |
33.58 | |||||||||||
1121 | 4121 | 04/1899 | 02/1935 | 03/1924 to J3 |
35.83 | |||||||||||
1122 | 4122 | 04/1899 | 09/1933 | 12/1922 to J3 |
34.42 | |||||||||||
1123 | 4123 | 04/1899 | 03/1934 | 03/1915 to J3 |
34.92 | |||||||||||
1124 | 4124 | 04/1899 | 04/1936 | 02/1922 to J3 |
37 | |||||||||||
1125 | 4125 | 64125 | 05/1899 | 31/12/1953 | 03/1924 to J3 |
54.58 | ||||||||||
1126 | 4126 | 05/1899 | 02/1946 | 09/1913 to J3 |
46.75 | |||||||||||
1127 | 4127 | 05/1899 | 03/1936 | 09/1916 to J3 |
36.83 | |||||||||||
1128 | 4128 | 05/1899 | 02/1936 | 06/1919 to J3 |
36.75 | |||||||||||
1129 | 4129 | 4127 | 64127 | 05/1899 | 04/1949 | 10/1923 to J3 |
49.92 | |||||||||
1130 | 4130 | 05/1899 | 07/1932 | 03/1918 to J3 |
33.17 | |||||||||||
1131 | 4131 | 4128 | 64128 | 05/1899 | 25/11/1950 | 12/1924 to J3 |
51.5 | |||||||||
1132 | 4132 | 05/1899 | 08/1935 | 06/1916 to J3 |
36.25 | |||||||||||
1133 | 4133 | 4129 | 64129 | 05/1899 | 01/09/1952 | 08/1916 to J3 |
53.33 | |||||||||
1134 | 4134 | 4130 | 05/1899 | 08/1947 | 10/1914 to J3 |
48.25 | ||||||||||
1135 | 4135 | 05/1899 | 02/1932 | 08/1925 to J3 |
32.75 | |||||||||||
315 | 3315 | 08/1898 | 11/1932 | 07/1923 to J3 |
34.25 | |||||||||||
316 | 3316 | 08/1898 | 10/1931 | 04/1919 to J3 |
33.17 | |||||||||||
318 | 3318 | 08/1898 | 07/1932 | 10/1925 to J3 |
33.92 | |||||||||||
329 | 3329 | 4131 | 64131 | 08/1898 | 13/12/1954 | 01/1924 to J3 |
56.33 | |||||||||
331 | 3331 | 4132 | 64132 | 09/1898 | 14/06/1954 | 02/1926 to J3 |
55.75 | |||||||||
332 | 3332 | 4133 | 64133 | 08/1898 | 19/01/1953 | 08/1925 to J3 |
54.42 | |||||||||
334 | 3334 | 08/1898 | 05/1929 | 07/1927 to J3 |
30.75 | |||||||||||
336 | 3336 | 4134 | 09/1898 | 08/1947 | 11/1925 to J3 |
48.92 | ||||||||||
337 | 3337 | 09/1898 | 12/1935 | 08/1928 to J3 |
New England | 37.25 | ||||||||||
338 | 3338 | 10/1898 | 05/1933 | 08/1924 to J3 |
34.58 | |||||||||||
343 | 3343 | 07/1899 | 04/1933 | 06/1916 to J3 |
33.75 | |||||||||||
344 | 3344 | 07/1899 | 04/1933 | 05/1916 to J3 |
33.75 | |||||||||||
345 | 3345 | 4135 | 64135 | 07/1899 | 01/1951 | 09/1924 to J3 |
51.5 | |||||||||
348 | 3348 | 06/1899 | 12/1932 | 33.5 | ||||||||||||
349 | 3349 | 06/1899 | 07/1934 | 02/1926 to J3 |
35.08 | |||||||||||
350 | 3350 | 4136 | 64136 | 07/1899 | 25/03/1948 | 03/1914 to J3 |
48.67 | |||||||||
351 | 3351 | 07/1899 | 02/1932 | 04/1916 to J3 |
32.58 | |||||||||||
352 | 3352 | 07/1899 | 09/1934 | 07/1924 to J3 |
35.17 | |||||||||||
353 | 3353 | 06/1899 | 07/1932 | 12/1922 to J3 |
33.08 | |||||||||||
359 | 3359 | 07/1899 | 02/1932 | 01/1925 to J3 |
32.58 | |||||||||||
360 | 08/1899 | 1923 | 23.33 | |||||||||||||
361 | 3361 | 08/1899 | 05/1932 | 11/1924 to J3 |
32.75 | |||||||||||
362 | 3362 | 08/1899 | 07/1932 | 06/1919 to J3 |
32.92 | |||||||||||
363 | 08/1899 | 1923 | 23.33 | |||||||||||||
364 | 09/1899 | 1923 | 23.25 | |||||||||||||
367 | 09/1899 | 1923 | 23.25 | |||||||||||||
368 | 3368 | 09/1899 | 11/1932 | 06/1924 to J3 |
33.17 | |||||||||||
371 | 3371 | 08/1899 | 10/1935 | 12/1925 to J3 |
36.17 | |||||||||||
375 | 3375 | 4137 | 64137 | 09/1899 | 26/02/1951 | 02/1916 to J3 |
51.42 | |||||||||
381 | 3381 | 09/1899 | 10/1932 | 12/1915 to J3 |
33.08 | |||||||||||
165 | 3165 | 04/1900 | 08/1933 | 03/1926 to J3 |
33.33 | |||||||||||
177 | 3177 | 05/1900 | 04/1936 | 12/1918 to J3 |
35.92 | |||||||||||
179 | 3179 | 4138 | 06/1900 | 08/1947 | 02/1927 to J3 |
47.17 | ||||||||||
180 | 3180 | 05/1900 | 02/1933 | 09/1929 to J3 |
32.75 | |||||||||||
192 | 3192 | 05/1900 | 10/1933 | 02/1926 to J3 |
33.42 | |||||||||||
302 | 3302 | 4139 | 05/1900 | 08/1947 | 06/1928 to J3 |
47.25 | ||||||||||
303 | 3303 | 05/1900 | 04/1936 | 10/1916 to J3 |
35.92 | |||||||||||
304 | 3304 | 06/1900 | 10/1935 | 35.33 | ||||||||||||
306 | 3306 | 4140 | 64140 | 06/1900 | 22/12/1954 | 10/1914 to J3 |
54.5 | |||||||||
308 | 3308 | 07/1900 | 09/1932 | 12/1917 to J3 |
32.17 | |||||||||||
384 | 3384 | 08/1900 | 01/1936 | 12/1917 to J3 |
35.42 | |||||||||||
386 | 3386 | 07/1900 | 05/1932 | 12/1918 to J3 |
31.83 | |||||||||||
387 | 3387 | 4141 | 64141 | 07/1900 | 28/09/1953 | 04/1919 to J3 |
53.17 | |||||||||
388 | 3388 | 4142 | 64142 | 08/1900 | 30/07/1951 | 10/1917 to J3 |
50.92 | |||||||||
390 | 3390 | 07/1900 | 07/1936 | 02/1916 to J3 |
36 | |||||||||||
392 | 3392 | 08/1900 | 02/1932 | 31.5 | ||||||||||||
394 | 3394 | 07/1900 | 02/1932 | 31.58 | ||||||||||||
396 | 3396 | 06/1900 | 05/1933 | 01/1926 to J3 |
32.92 | |||||||||||
398 | 3398 | 4143 | 07/1900 | 09/1947 | 07/1925 to J3 |
47.17 | ||||||||||
399 | 3399 | 4144 | 08/1900 | 08/1947 | 01/1914 to J3 |
47 | ||||||||||
1136 | 4136 | 04/1900 | 09/1936 | 09/1916 to J3 |
36.42 | |||||||||||
1137 | 4137 | 4145 | 64145 | 04/1900 | 02/03/1948 | 08/1916 to J3 |
47.92 | |||||||||
1138 | 4138 | 05/1900 | 06/1939 | 12/1927 to J3 |
39.08 | |||||||||||
1139 | 4139 | 4146 | 05/1900 | 06/11/1947 | 05/1914 to J3 |
47.5 | ||||||||||
1140 | 4140 | 05/1900 | 05/1928 | 12/1923 to J3 |
28 | |||||||||||
1141 | 4141 | 05/1900 | 08/1936 | 06/1916 to J3 |
36.25 | |||||||||||
1142 | 4142 | 05/1900 | 09/1940 | 02/1918 to J3 |
40.33 | |||||||||||
1143 | 4143 | 4147 | 05/1900 | 26/10/1946 | 02/1924 to J3 |
46.42 | ||||||||||
1144 | 4144 | 05/1900 | 05/1937 | 01/1923 to J3 |
37 | |||||||||||
1145 | 4145 | 05/1900 | 08/1938 | 38.25 | ||||||||||||
1146 | 4146 | 4148 | 64148 | 06/1900 | 30/04/1951 | 10/1918 to J3 |
50.83 | |||||||||
1147 | 4147 | 06/1900 | 10/1936 | 08/1915 to J3 |
36.33 | |||||||||||
1148 | 06/1900 | 1923 | 22.5 | |||||||||||||
1149 | 4149 | 06/1900 | 02/1939 | 03/1927 to J3 |
38.67 | |||||||||||
1150 | 4150 | 06/1900 | 03/1933 | 01/1928 to J3 |
32.75 | |||||||||||
1151 | 4151 | 4149 | 06/1900 | 28/11/1947 | 01/1916 to J3 |
47.42 | ||||||||||
1152 | 4152 | 06/1900 | 11/1936 | 10/1917 to J3 |
36.42 | |||||||||||
1153 | 4153 | 4150 | 64150 | 06/1900 | 06/1951 | 11/1925 to J3 |
51 | |||||||||
1154 | 4154 | 06/1900 | 11/1942 | 08/1925 to J3 |
42.42 | |||||||||||
1155 | 4155 | 06/1900 | 06/1938 | 01/1924 to J3 |
38 | |||||||||||
1156 | 4156 | 07/1900 | 03/1933 | 08/1916 to J3 |
32.67 | |||||||||||
1157 | 4157 | 07/1900 | 07/1937 | 01/1916 to J3 |
37 | |||||||||||
1158 | 4158 | 07/1900 | 11/1933 | 10/1924 to J3 |
33.33 | |||||||||||
1159 | 4159 | 07/1900 | 01/1936 | 03/1915 to J3 |
35.5 | |||||||||||
1160 | 4160 | 4151 | 64151 | 07/1900 | 03/1951 | 06/1925 to J3 |
50.67 | |||||||||
81 | 081 | 4156 | 10/1900 | 09/1947 | 06/1927 to J3 |
46.92 | ||||||||||
82 | 082 | 4157 | 10/1900 | 08/1947 | 08/1921 to J3 |
46.83 | ||||||||||
83 | 083 | 4158 | 64158 | 10/1900 | 07/1951 | 01/1921 to J3 |
50.75 | |||||||||
84 | 084 | 4159 | 10/1900 | 08/1947 | 12/1924 to J3 |
46.83 | ||||||||||
85 | 085 | 4160 | 64160 | 10/1900 | 03/12/1951 | 04/1926 to J3 |
51.17 | |||||||||
86 | 086 | 4161 | 10/1900 | 09/1947 | 10/1927 to J3 |
46.92 | ||||||||||
87 | 087 | 4162 | 64162 | 10/1900 | 12/1950 | 05/1925 to J3 |
50.17 | |||||||||
88 | 088 | 4163 | 64163 | 10/1900 | 01/1949 | 11/1920 to J3 |
48.25 | |||||||||
89 | 089 | 4164 | 10/1900 | 08/1947 | 02/1926 to J3 |
46.83 | ||||||||||
90 | 090 | 4165 | 11/1900 | 07/1946 | 12/1926 to J3 |
45.67 | ||||||||||
91 | 091 | 4166 | 10/1900 | 01/1946 | 01/1927 to J3 |
45.25 | ||||||||||
92 | 092 | 4167 | 64167 | 11/1900 | 02/07/1948 | 10/1921 to J3 |
47.67 | |||||||||
1161 | 4161 | 07/1901 | 08/1933 | 02/1917 to J3 |
32.08 | |||||||||||
1162 | 4162 | 4152 | 64152 | 07/1901 | 12/04/1948 | 12/1913 to J3 |
46.75 | |||||||||
1163 | 4163 | 07/1901 | 06/1938 | 05/1912 to J3 |
36.92 | |||||||||||
1164 | 4164 | 07/1901 | 07/1934 | 03/1920 to J3 |
33 | |||||||||||
1165 | 4165 | 07/1901 | 09/1933 | 03/1917 to J3 |
32.17 | |||||||||||
1166 | 4166 | 4153 | 64153 | 08/1901 | 19/05/1952 | 10/1924 to J3 |
50.75 | |||||||||
1167 | 4167 | 08/1901 | 07/1932 | 04/1917 to J3 |
30.92 | |||||||||||
1168 | 4168 | 08/1901 | 02/1935 | 02/1916 to J3 |
33.5 | |||||||||||
1169 | 4169 | 08/1901 | 08/1936 | 08/1919 to J3 |
35 | |||||||||||
1170 | 4170 | 08/1901 | 08/1933 | 09/1917 to J3 |
32 | |||||||||||
1171 | 4171 | 4154 | 08/1901 | 02/11/1946 | 03/1925 to J3 |
45.25 | ||||||||||
1172 | 4172 | 08/1901 | 03/1936 | 08/1925 to J3 |
34.58 | |||||||||||
1173 | 4173 | 4155 | 08/1901 | 06/1947 | 11/1916 to J3 |
45.83 |