GER/LNER Holden "E4" Class 2-4-0
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
417 | 7417 | 02/1891 | 01/1930 | 38.92 | |||||||||
418 | 7418 | 03/1891 | 09/1934 | 43.5 | |||||||||
419 | 7419 | 03/1891 | 05/1926 | 35.17 | |||||||||
420 | 7420 | 04/1891 | 03/1927 | 35.92 | |||||||||
421 | 7421 | 04/1891 | 11/1938 | 47.58 | |||||||||
422 | 7422 | 04/1891 | 09/1929 | 38.42 | |||||||||
423 | 7423 | 03/1891 | 07/1926 | 35.33 | |||||||||
424 | 7424 | 03/1891 | 01/1929 | 37.83 | |||||||||
425 | 7425 | 03/1891 | 02/1927 | 35.92 | |||||||||
426 | 7426 | 03/1891 | 10/1926 | 35.58 | |||||||||
427 | 7427 | 7797 | 2780 | 62780 | 04/1891 | 26/09/1955 | 64.42 | ||||||
428 | 7428 | 04/1891 | 05/1929 | 38.08 | |||||||||
429 | 7429 | 04/1891 | 10/1929 | 38.5 | |||||||||
430 | 7430 | 04/1891 | 04/1926 | 35 | |||||||||
431 | 7431 | 04/1891 | 06/1926 | 35.17 | |||||||||
432 | 7432 | 04/1891 | 07/1929 | 38.25 | |||||||||
433 | 7433 | 05/1891 | 04/1927 | 35.92 | |||||||||
434 | 7434 | 04/1891 | 12/1933 | 42.67 | |||||||||
435 | 7435 | 04/1891 | 03/1928 | 36.92 | |||||||||
436 | 7436 | 05/1891 | 06/1929 | 38.08 | |||||||||
437 | 7437 | 05/1891 | 02/1927 | 35.75 | |||||||||
438 | 7438 | 05/1891 | 05/1926 | 35 | |||||||||
439 | 7439 | 06/1891 | 08/1927 | 36.17 | |||||||||
440 | 7440 | 05/1891 | 06/1929 | 38.08 | |||||||||
441 | 7441 | 05/1891 | 06/1937 | 46.08 | |||||||||
442 | 7442 | 06/1891 | 12/1927 | 36.5 | |||||||||
443 | 7443 | 06/1891 | 10/1931 | 40.33 | |||||||||
444 | 7444 | 06/1891 | 06/1934 | 43 | |||||||||
445 | 7445 | 06/1891 | 01/1927 | 35.58 | |||||||||
446 | 7446 | 06/1891 | 04/1926 | 34.83 | |||||||||
447 | 7447 | 09/1892 | 09/1926 | 34 | |||||||||
448 | 7448 | 09/1892 | 01/1930 | 37.33 | |||||||||
449 | 7449 | 09/1892 | 02/1930 | 37.42 | |||||||||
450 | 7450 | 09/1892 | 05/1927 | 34.67 | |||||||||
451 | 7451 | 09/1892 | 02/1929 | 36.42 | |||||||||
452 | 7452 | 10/1892 | 09/1929 | 36.92 | |||||||||
453 | 7453 | 10/1892 | 03/1935 | 42.42 | |||||||||
454 | 7454 | 10/1892 | 06/1928 | 35.67 | |||||||||
455 | 7455 | 10/1892 | 03/1934 | 41.42 | |||||||||
456 | 7456 | 11/1892 | 12/1928 | 36.08 | |||||||||
457 | 7457 | 11/1892 | 06/1931 | 38.58 | |||||||||
458 | 7458 | 11/1892 | 08/1937 | 44.75 | |||||||||
459 | 7459 | 11/1892 | 03/1935 | 42.33 | |||||||||
460 | 7460 | 11/1892 | 04/1929 | 36.42 | |||||||||
461 | 7461 | 11/1892 | 09/1931 | 38.83 | |||||||||
462 | 7462 | 11/1892 | 05/1937 | 44.5 | |||||||||
463 | 7463 | 7798 | 2781 | 62781 | 11/1892 | 02/01/1956 | 63.17 | ||||||
464 | 7464 | 11/1892 | 12/1933 | 41.08 | |||||||||
465 | 7465 | 12/1892 | 07/1928 | 35.58 | |||||||||
466 | 7466 | 7799 | 2782 | 62782 | 12/1892 | 29/11/1954 | 61.92 | ||||||
467 | 7467 | 12/1892 | 04/1937 | 44.33 | |||||||||
468 | 7468 | 12/1892 | 08/1929 | 36.67 | |||||||||
469 | 7469 | 12/1892 | 06/1929 | 36.5 | |||||||||
470 | 7470 | 12/1892 | 05/1934 | 41.42 | |||||||||
471 | 7471 | 12/1892 | 09/1929 | 36.75 | |||||||||
472 | 7472 | 12/1892 | 05/1938 | 45.42 | |||||||||
473 | 7473 | 01/1893 | 12/1935 | Ipswich | 42.92 | ||||||||
474 | 7474 | 01/1893 | 04/1929 | 36.25 | |||||||||
475 | 7475 | 01/1893 | 05/1931 | 38.33 | |||||||||
476 | 7476 | 01/1893 | 03/1937 | 44.17 | |||||||||
477 | 7477 | 7800 | 2783 | 62783 | 10/1894 | 13/12/1954 | 60.17 | 60.38 | |||||
478 | 7478 | 7801 | 2784 | 62784 | 10/1894 | 30/05/1955 | 60.58 | 60.87 | |||||
479 | 7479 | 10/1894 | 03/1938 | 43.42 | |||||||||
480 | 7480 | 10/1894 | 01/1935 | 40.25 | |||||||||
481 | 7481 | 10/1894 | 06/1935 | 40.67 | |||||||||
482 | 7482 | 11/1894 | 09/1929 | 34.83 | |||||||||
483 | 7483 | 11/1894 | 06/1929 | 34.58 | |||||||||
484 | 7484 | 11/1894 | 03/1936 | 41.33 | |||||||||
485 | 7485 | 11/1894 | 01/1940 | 45.17 | |||||||||
486 | 7486 | 11/1894 | 06/1931 | 36.58 | |||||||||
487 | 7487 | 12/1894 | 12/1929 | 35 | |||||||||
488 | 7488 | 12/1894 | 12/1928 | 34 | |||||||||
489 | 7489 | 12/1894 | 03/1936 | 41.25 | |||||||||
490 | 7490 | 7802 | 2785 | 62785 | 01/1895 | 07/12/1959 | 64.92 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
491 | 7491 | 01/1895 | 01/1935 | 40 | |||||||||
492 | 7492 | 7803 | 2786 | 62786 | 01/1895 | 30/07/1956 | 61.5 | ||||||
493 | 7493 | 01/1895 | 07/1929 | 34.5 | |||||||||
494 | 7494 | 7804 | 2787 | 62787 | 01/1895 | 20/11/1956 | 61.83 | ||||||
495 | 7495 | 01/1895 | 05/1928 | 33.33 | |||||||||
496 | 7496 | 7805 | 2788 | 62788 | 01/1895 | 04/03/1958 | 63.17 | 63.96 | |||||
497 | 7497 | 7806 | 2789 | 62789 | 07/1896 | 02/12/1957 | 61.42 | 61.54 | |||||
498 | 7498 | 08/1896 | 01/1935 | 38.42 | |||||||||
499 | 7499 | 08/1896 | 03/1935 | 38.58 | |||||||||
500 | 7500 | 08/1896 | 06/1936 | 39.83 | |||||||||
501 | 7501 | 09/1896 | 10/1938 | 42.08 | |||||||||
502 | 7502 | 09/1896 | 01/1939 | 42.33 | |||||||||
503 | 7503 | 7807 | 2790 | 62790 | 09/1896 | 02/01/1956 | 59.33 | ||||||
504 | 7504 | 10/1896 | 11/1938 | 42.08 | |||||||||
505 | 7505 | 10/1896 | 02/1931 | 34.33 | |||||||||
506 | 7506 | 7808 | 2791 | 62791 | 10/1896 | 04/04/1955 | 58.5 | 58.87 | |||||
1250 | 7407 | 7791 | 2792 | 62792 | 06/1902 | 18/06/1956 | 54 | ||||||
1251 | 7408 | 7792 | 2793 | 62793 | 06/1902 | 28/02/1955 | 52.67 | 53.20 | |||||
1252 | 7409 | 7793 | 2794 | 62794 | 06/1902 | 22/08/1955 | 53.17 | ||||||
1253 | 7410 | 06/1902 | 01/1935 | 32.58 | |||||||||
1254 | 7411 | 7794 | 2796 | 62795 | 06/1902 | 07/03/1955 | 52.75 | 52.95 | |||||
1255 | 7412 | 07/1902 | 08/1935 | 33.08 | |||||||||
1256 | 7413 | 07/1902 | 10/1931 | 29.25 | |||||||||
1257 | 7414 | 7795 | 2796 | 62796 | 07/1902 | 13/05/1957 | 54.83 | ||||||
1258 | 7415 | 08/1902 | 06/1937 | 34.83 | |||||||||
1259 | 7416 | 7796 | 2797 | 62797 | 08/1902 | 17/03/1958 | 55.58 | 56.04 |