NER/LNER Worsdell "D20" Class 4-4-0
NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2011 | 2340 | 62340 | 08/1899 | 27/02/1951 | 51.5 | 51.61 | |||||
2012 | 2341 | 62341 | 09/1899 | 07/03/1951 | 51.5 | 51.53 | |||||
2013 | 2342 | 62342 | 09/1899 | 13/03/1951 | 51.5 | 51.61 | |||||
2014 | 2343 | 62343 | 10/1899 | 08/10/1956 | 57 | 57.12 | |||||
2015 | 2344 | 62344 | 11/1899 | 28/03/1951 | 51.33 | 51.45 | |||||
2016 | 2345 | 62345 | 11/1899 | 11/10/1956 | 56.92 | 57.21 | |||||
2017 | 2346 | 11/1899 | 12/1944 | 45.08 | |||||||
2018 | 2347 | 62347 | 12/1899 | 15/11/1954 | 54.92 | 55.12 | |||||
2019 | 2348 | 62348 | 12/1899 | 27/02/1951 | 51.17 | 51.28 | |||||
2020 | 2349 | 62349 | 12/1899 | 02/02/1956 | 56.17 | 56.45 | |||||
2021 | 2350 | 08/1900 | 12/1947 | 47.33 | |||||||
2022 | 2351 | 62351 | 08/1900 | 23/11/1954 | 54.25 | 54.45 | |||||
2023 | 2352 | 62352 | 09/1900 | 29/06/1954 | 53.75 | 53.87 | |||||
2024 | 2353 | 62353 | 09/1900 | 11/04/1951 | 50.58 | 50.61 | |||||
2025 | 2354 | 62354 | 09/1900 | 02/04/1951 | 50.58 | 50.61 | |||||
2026 | 2355 | 62355 | 10/1900 | 14/11/1955 | 55.08 | 55.20 | |||||
2027 | 2356 | 10/1900 | 11/1946 | 46.08 | |||||||
2028 | 2357 | 62357 | 11/1900 | 08/01/1951 | 50.17 | 50.28 | |||||
2029 | 2358 | 62358 | 12/1900 | 19/10/1954 | 53.83 | 53.95 | |||||
2030 | 2359 | 62359 | 12/1900 | 26/10/1955 | 54.83 | 54.95 | |||||
2101 | 2360 | 62360 | 12/1900 | 23/10/1956 | 55.83 | 55.96 | |||||
2102 | 2361 | 62361 | 12/1900 | 02/1951 | 50.17 | 50.28 | |||||
2103 | 2362 | 62362 | 12/1900 | 11/04/1951 | 50.33 | 50.45 | |||||
2104 | 2363 | 62363 | 02/1900 | 20/03/1951 | 51.08 | 51.19 | |||||
2105 | 2364 | 03/1901 | 10/1947 | 46.58 | |||||||
2106 | 2365 | 62365 | 03/1901 | 04/04/1951 | 50.08 | 50.12 | |||||
2107 | 2366 | 62366 | 03/1901 | 13/03/1951 | 50 | 50.12 | |||||
2108 | 2367 | 62367 | 04/1901 | 17/01/1948 | 46.75 | 46.87 | |||||
2109 | 2368 | 04/1901 | 06/1944 | 43.17 | |||||||
2110 | 2369 | 62369 | 05/1901 | 06/03/1951 | 49.83 | 49.95 | |||||
476 | 2370 | 62370 | 09/1906 | 04/1951 | 44.58 | 44.69 | |||||
592 | 2371 | 62371 | 09/1906 | 19/10/1954 | 48.08 | 48.20 | |||||
707 | 2372 | 62372 | 10/1906 | 05/11/1956 | 50.08 | 50.29 | |||||
708 | 2373 | 62373 | 10/1906 | 23/02/1953 | 46.33 | 46.45 | |||||
711 | 2374 | 62374 | 10/1906 | 14/10/1954 | 48 | 48.12 | |||||
712 | 2375 | 62375 | 11/1906 | 07/05/1957 | 50.5 | 51.12 | |||||
713 | 2376 | 62376 | 11/1906 | 02/1951 | 44.25 | 44.36 | |||||
723 | 2377 | 62377 | 11/1906 | 05/1949 | 42.5 | 42.61 | |||||
724 | 2378 | 62378 | 12/1906 | 05/11/1956 | 49.92 | 50.04 | |||||
725 | 2379 | 62379 | 12/1906 | 10/04/1951 | 44.33 | 44.44 | |||||
1026 | 2380 | 62380 | 02/1907 | 23/09/1954 | 47.58 | 47.70 | |||||
1042 | 2381 | 62381 | 03/1907 | 19/11/1957 | 50.67 | 50.79 | |||||
1051 | 2382 | 62382 | 06/1907 | 02/1951 | 43.67 | 43.78 | |||||
1078 | 2383 | 62383 | 06/1907 | 13/05/1957 | 49.92 | 49.95 | |||||
1147 | 03/1907 | 01/1943 | 35.83 | ||||||||
1184 | 2384 | 62384 | 06/1907 | 15/08/1955 | 48.17 | 48.28 | |||||
1206 | 2385 | 04/1907 | 01/1945 | 37.75 | |||||||
1207 | 2386 | 62386 | 08/1907 | 19/10/1956 | 49.17 | 47.20 | |||||
1209 | 2387 | 62387 | 04/1907 | 02/09/1957 | 50.42 | 50.70 | |||||
1210 | 2388 | 62388 | 08/1907 | 26/04/1954 | 46.67 | 46.78 | |||||
1217 | 2389 | 62389 | 05/1907 | 06/09/1954 | 47.33 | 47.45 | |||||
1223 | 2390 | 62390 | 09/1907 | 29/11/1948 | 41.17 | 41.36 | |||||
1232 | 2391 | 62391 | 05/1907 | 07/06/1951 | 44.08 | 44.28 | |||||
1234 | 05/1907 | 05/1943 | 36 | ||||||||
1235 | 2392 | 62392 | 09/1907 | 31/05/1954 | 46.67 | 47.70 | |||||
1236 | 2393 | 06/1907 | 12/1947 | 40.5 | |||||||
1258 | 2394 | 09/1907 | 05/1946 | 38.67 | |||||||
1260 | 2395 | 62395 | 06/1907 | 20/11/1957 | 50.42 | 50.71 | |||||
1665 | 2396 | 62396 | 09/1907 | 12/1957 | 50.25 | 50.28 | |||||
1672 | 2397 | 62397 | 09/1907 | 04/02/1957 | 49.42 | 49.45 |