GCR/LNER Robinson "D9" Class 4-4-0
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 6013 | 2300 | 62300 | 10/1901 | 11/1949 | Trafford Park (LNER) | 48.08 | 48.12 | ||||
1014 | 6014 | 2301 | 62301 | 10/1901 | 04/1950 | 48.5 | 48.70 | |||||
1015 | 6015 | 2302 | 62302 | 10/1901 | 20/03/1950 | 48.42 | 49.03 | |||||
1016 | 6016 | 2303 | 62303 | 10/1901 | 15/08/1949 | 47.83 | 48.03 | |||||
1017 | 6017 | 2304 | 62304 | 10/1901 | 16/01/1950 | 48.25 | 48.37 | |||||
1018 | 6018 | 2305 | 62305 | 02/1902 | 24/07/1950 | 48.42 | 48.70 | |||||
1019 | 6019 | 2306 | 62306 | 02/1902 | 01/1949 | 46.92 | 46.95 | |||||
1020 | 6020 | 02/1902 | 02/1943 | 41 | ||||||||
1021 | 6021 | 2307 | 62307 | 02/1902 | 12/06/1950 | Stockport Edgeley | 48.33 | 48.28 | ||||
1022 | 6022 | 02/1902 | 08/1942 | 40.5 | ||||||||
1023 | 6023 | 2308 | 62308 | 02/1902 | 15/08/1949 | 47.5 | 47.78 | |||||
1024 | 6024 | 2309 | 62309 | 02/1902 | 21/11/1949 | Brunswick | 47.75 | 47.78 | ||||
1025 | 6025 | 2310 | 03/1902 | 11/1945 | 43.67 | |||||||
1026 | 6026 | 2311 | 62311 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | To London Midland Region | 47.33 | 47.54 | ||||
1027 | 6027 | 2312 | 62312 | 03/1902 | 04/1950 | 48.08 | 48.28 | |||||
1028 | 6028 | 03/1902 | 05/1939 | 37.17 | ||||||||
1029 | 6029 | 2313 | 62313 | 03/1902 | 12/10/1949 | 47.58 | 47.79 | |||||
1030 | 6030 | 2314 | 62314 | 03/1902 | 09/05/1949 | 47.17 | 47.79 | |||||
1031 | 6031 | 2315 | 62315 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | To London Midland Region | 47.33 | 47.62 | ||||
1032 | 6032 | 2316 | 03/1902 | 03/1945 | 43 | |||||||
1033 | 6033 | 2317 | 62317 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | To London Midland Region | 47.33 | 47.54 | ||||
1034 | 6034 | 2318 | 62318 | 03/1902 | 21/11/1949 | Brunswick | 47.67 | 47.70 | ||||
1035 | 6035 | 2319 | 62319 | 04/1902 | 18/07/1949 | To London Midland Region | 47.25 | 46.95 | ||||
1036 | 6036 | 2320 | 04/1902 | 01/1946 | 43.75 | |||||||
1037 | 6037 | 2321 | 62321 | 05/1902 | 12/10/1949 | 47.42 | 47.62 | |||||
1038 | 6038 | 2322 | 62322 | 03/1903 | 01/1949 | 45.83 | 45.87 | |||||
1039 | 6039 | 2323 | 03/1903 | 01/1946 | 42.83 | |||||||
1040 | 6040 | 2324 | 62324 | 03/1903 | 07/11/1949 | Brunswick | 46.67 | 46.70 | ||||
1041 | 6041 | 2325 | 62325 | 03/1903 | 06/02/1950 | 46.92 | 47.03 | |||||
1042 | 6042 | 03/1903 | 07/1939 | 36.33 | ||||||||
104 | 5104 | 2326 | 03/1904 | 09/1944 | 40.5 | |||||||
105 | 5105 | 2327 | 03/1904 | 06/1945 | 41.25 | |||||||
106 | 5106 | 2328 | 04/1904 | 03/1947 | 42.92 | |||||||
107 | 5107 | 2329 | 62329 | 04/1904 | 02/1949 | 44.83 | 44.87 | |||||
108 | 5108 | 2330 | 62330 | 04/1904 | 15/08/1949 | 45.33 | 45.36 | |||||
109 | 5109 | 2331 | 04/1904 | 09/1946 | 42.42 | |||||||
110 | 5110 | 05/1904 | 03/1942 | 37.83 | ||||||||
111 | 5111 | 2332 | 62332 | 05/1904 | 09/1949 | 45.33 | 45.37 | |||||
112 | 5112 | 2333 | 62333 | 05/1904 | 12/12/1949 | Brunswick | 45.58 | 45.70 | ||||
113 | 5113 | 06/1904 | 06/1939 | 35 |