LNWR/LMS Cooke "6F" Class 0-8-2T
LNWR | LNWR (Prelim) | LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1185 | 7870 | 12/1911 | 12/1945 | 34 | |||||||||
1665 | 7872 | 12/1911 | 10/1936 | 24.83 | |||||||||
1548 | 1790 | 7871 | 12/1911 | 05/1935 | 23.42 | ||||||||
289 | 7873 | 01/1912 | 01/1935 | 23 | |||||||||
1163 | 7874 | 01/1912 | 06/1935 | 23.42 | |||||||||
7875 | 47875 | 01/1912 | 28/08/1948 | 36.58 | |||||||||
1592 | 7876 | 01/1912 | 07/1947 | 35.5 | |||||||||
7877 | 47877 | 01/1912 | 21/02/1953 | 41.08 | 701,005 | 41.19 | |||||||
1663 | 7878 | 01/1912 | 06/1947 | 35.42 | |||||||||
2013 | 7879 | 02/1912 | 12/1936 | 24.83 | |||||||||
58 | 7882 | 08/1915 | 10/1934 | 19.17 | |||||||||
482 | 7880 | 08/1915 | 03/1937 | 21.58 | |||||||||
7881 | 47881 | 08/1915 | 21/07/1951 | 35.92 | 692,706 | ||||||||
736 | 7883 | 08/1915 | 03/1935 | 19.58 | |||||||||
7884 | 47884 | 09/1915 | 09/06/1951 | 35.75 | 732,425 | ||||||||
7885 | 47885 | 09/1915 | 03/1950 | 34.5 | 553,433 | 34.61 | |||||||
1414 | 7886 | 47886 | 09/1915 | 09/1948 | 33 | ||||||||
7887 | 47887 | 09/1915 | 28/08/1948 | 32.92 | |||||||||
7888 | 47888 | 09/1915 | 04/12/1948 | 33.25 | |||||||||
2277 | 7889 | 09/1915 | 10/1934 | 19.08 | |||||||||
24 | 7890 | 12/1916 | 06/1939 | 22.5 | |||||||||
92 | 7891 | 12/1916 | 06/1946 | 29.5 | |||||||||
7892 | 47892 | 01/1917 | 14/02/1948 | 31.08 | 31.44 | ||||||||
1291 | 7893 | 01/1917 | 10/1934 | 17.75 | |||||||||
1331 | 7894 | 01/1917 | 09/1939 | 22.67 | |||||||||
2105 | 7895 | 01/1917 | 10/1934 | 17.75 | |||||||||
7896 | 47896 | 01/1917 | 04/11/1950 | 33.83 | 715,830 | 33.85 | |||||||
2341 | 7897 | 02/1917 | 06/1946 | 29.33 | |||||||||
2348 | 7898 | 02/1917 | 01/1946 | 28.92 | |||||||||
2391 | 7899 | 02/1917 | 08/1935 | 18.5 |