LMS Cooke "G1" Class 0-8-0
LNWR | LNWR (ORIG) | LMS | LMS (1930) | LMS (Dup.) | LMS (Correct) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2570 | 9367 | 49367 | 10/1902 | 10/1921 from F |
02/11/1957 | 02/1946 to G2A |
55.08 | ||||||||||
2525 | 50 | 9008 | 49008 | 09/1893 | 03/1924 from D |
08/12/1962 | 08/1943 to G2A |
69.25 | |||||||||
2526 | 9043 | 49043 | 11/1894 | 02/1928 from D |
09/1949 | 54.83 | |||||||||||
2527 | 9051 | 49051 | 11/1894 | 05/1930 from D |
15/02/1957 | 08/1939 to G2A |
62.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/03/1957 | 62.35 | ||||||
2528 | 9027 | 49027 | 11/1894 | 12/1926 from D |
21/11/1959 | 12/1940 to G2A |
65 | ||||||||||
2529 | 8954 | 48954 | 11/1894 | 01/1925 from C |
16/07/1949 | 12/1940 to G2A |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 54.67 | |||||||||
2530 | 9049 | 49049 | 02/1895 | 03/1930 from D |
01/12/1962 | 09/1946 to G2A |
67.83 | ||||||||||
2532 | 9029 | 49029 | 02/1895 | 02/1926 from D |
13/05/1950 | 12/1939 to G2A |
55.25 | ||||||||||
2536 | 9033 | 49033 | 08/1896 | 01/1928 from D |
10/12/1957 | 02/1940 to G2A |
61.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 03/01/1958 | 61.42 | ||||||
2537 | 9019 | 49019 | 08/1896 | 06/1925 from D |
06/1949 | 05/1940 to G2A |
52.83 | ||||||||||
2538 | 8962 | 48962 | 08/1896 | 06/1927 from C |
12/1948 | 52.33 | |||||||||||
2539 | 9031 | 49031 | 08/1896 | 12/1927 from D |
05/1951 | 03/1943 to G2A |
54.75 | ||||||||||
2540 | 9020 | 49020 | 08/1896 | 02/1928 from D |
07/10/1961 | 08/1938 to G2A |
65.17 | ||||||||||
2541 | 8953 | 48953 | 08/1896 | 12/1926 from C |
07/10/1961 | 12/1939 to G2A |
65.17 | ||||||||||
2544 | 9040 | 49040 | 08/1896 | 06/1937 from D |
04/1949 | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 52.67 | ||||||||||
2547 | 9012 | 49012 | 09/1896 | 02/1928 from D |
11/12/1948 | 52.25 | |||||||||||
2548 | 9004 | 49004 | 09/1896 | 02/1928 from D |
06/1949 | 03/1941 to G2A |
52.75 | ||||||||||
2551 | 9034 | 49034 | 12/1896 | 05/1925 from D |
22/09/1962 | 08/1940 to G2A |
65.75 | ||||||||||
2552 | 9052 | 49052 | 12/1896 | 03/1930 from D |
04/1949 | 52.33 | |||||||||||
1802 | 9016 | 49016 | 10/1897 | 01/1928 from D |
03/1949 | 10/1939 to G2A |
51.42 | ||||||||||
1804 | 9017 | 49017 | 10/1897 | 11/1934 from D |
06/1952 | 54.67 | |||||||||||
1808 | 9047 | 49047 | 10/1897 | 06/1933 from G2A |
04/01/1958 | 60.25 | |||||||||||
1812 | 9014 | 29014 | 9014 | 49014 | 10/1897 | 05/1931 from D |
05/1951 | 09/1938 to G2A |
53.58 | ||||||||
1813 | 9060 | 49060 | 11/1897 | 06/1927 from D |
05/1949 | 51.5 | |||||||||||
1815 | 9044 | 49044 | 11/1897 | 01/1927 from D |
24/10/1959 | 10/1939 to G2A |
61.92 | ||||||||||
1816 | 9045 | 49045 | 11/1897 | 10/1930 from D |
22/12/1962 | 05/1939 to G2A |
65.08 | ||||||||||
1818 | 9013 | 49013 | 12/1897 | 04/1930 from D |
04/1948 | 50.33 | |||||||||||
1819 | 9058 | 49058 | 12/1897 | 02/1928 from D |
03/1950 | 52.25 | |||||||||||
1820 | 9050 | 49050 | 01/1898 | 10/1932 from D |
10/1950 | 52.75 | |||||||||||
1821 | 9064 | 49064 | 04/1898 | 08/1926 from D |
04/06/1960 | 01/1939 to G2A |
62.17 | ||||||||||
1822 | 9005 | 49005 | 04/1898 | 01/1928 from D |
10/08/1957 | 04/1941 to G2A |
59.33 | ||||||||||
1824 | 9035 | 49035 | 04/1898 | 10/1930 from D |
24/01/1957 | 11/1940 to G2A |
58.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/02/1957 | 58.86 | ||||||
1825 | 9053 | 49053 | 04/1898 | 05/1929 from D |
05/1950 | 06/1947 to G2A |
52.08 | ||||||||||
1827 | 9018 | 49018 | 05/1898 | 01/1928 from D |
05/09/1959 | 02/1941 to G2A |
61.33 | ||||||||||
1830 | 9041 | 49041 | 05/1898 | 09/1929 from D |
08/1950 | 12/1944 to G2A |
52.25 | ||||||||||
1831 | 9039 | 49039 | 07/1898 | 12/1934 from D |
14/01/1950 | 03/1940 to G2A |
Bescot | 51.5 | |||||||||
1832 | 9038 | 49038 | 07/1898 | 09/1934 from D |
04/1948 | 49.75 | |||||||||||
1833 | 9009 | 49009 | 07/1898 | 07/1937 from D |
28/11/1959 | 06/1940 to G2A |
61.33 | ||||||||||
1834 | 9028 | 49028 | 07/1898 | 08/1930 from D |
03/03/1956 | 12/1939 to G2A |
57.67 | ||||||||||
1836 | 9061 | 49061 | 07/1898 | 08/1930 from D |
07/10/1961 | 05/1940 to G2A |
63.25 | ||||||||||
1837 | 9055 | 49055 | 07/1898 | 04/1930 from D |
03/1949 | 08/1940 to G2A |
50.67 | ||||||||||
1838 | 9032 | 49032 | 08/1898 | 09/1928 from D |
03/06/1950 | 51.83 | |||||||||||
1839 | 9010 | 49010 | 08/1898 | 11/1931 from D |
06/06/1959 | 11/1939 to G2A |
60.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
1842 | 8966 | 48966 | 10/1898 | 08/1926 from C |
18/02/1950 | 12/1944 to G2A |
51.33 | ||||||||||
1843 | 9048 | 49048 | 10/1898 | 09/1933 from D |
14/11/1959 | 12/1939 to G2A |
61.08 | ||||||||||
1845 | 9003 | 49003 | 10/1898 | 10/1932 from D |
03/1949 | 02/1940 to G2A |
50.42 | ||||||||||
1846 | 9059 | 49059 | 10/1898 | 01/1928 from D |
11/02/1950 | 51.33 | |||||||||||
1848 | 9022 | 49022 | 10/1898 | 07/1926 from D |
05/1951 | 06/1939 to G2A |
52.58 | ||||||||||
1853 | 9036 | 49036 | 02/1899 | 02/1928 from D |
12/1949 | 06/1940 to G2A |
50.83 | ||||||||||
1854 | 9023 | 49023 | 02/1899 | 02/1928 from D |
07/10/1961 | 02/1942 to G2A |
62.67 | ||||||||||
1855 | 8964 | 48964 | 02/1899 | 06/1926 from C |
21/04/1962 | 07/1940 to G2A |
63.17 | ||||||||||
1856 | 9026 | 49026 | 02/1899 | 04/1925 from D |
09/1949 | 09/1938 to G2A |
50.58 | ||||||||||
1857 | 9042 | 49042 | 02/1899 | 05/1929 from D |
04/1949 | 04/1940 to G2A |
50.17 | ||||||||||
1863 | 9006 | 49006 | 05/1899 | 11/1927 from D |
26/05/1951 | 05/1944 to G2A |
52 | ||||||||||
1864 | 9063 | 49063 | 05/1899 | 03/1930 from D |
29/08/1959 | 09/1946 to G2A |
60.25 | ||||||||||
1865 | 9062 | 49062 | 05/1899 | 10/1934 from D |
26/05/1951 | 08/1942 to G2A |
52 | ||||||||||
1866 | 9002 | 49002 | 05/1899 | 12/1932 from D |
15/09/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
63.33 | ||||||||||
1868 | 9056 | 49056 | 05/1899 | 12/1933 from D |
08/1948 | 49.25 | |||||||||||
1870 | 9057 | 49057 | 05/1899 | 07/1923 from D |
18/05/1957 | 05/1940 to G2A |
58 | ||||||||||
1871 | 9030 | 49030 | 04/1900 | 06/1926 from D |
23/06/1951 | 51.17 | |||||||||||
1872 | 9015 | 49015 | 05/1900 | 08/1930 from D |
05/1949 | 49 | |||||||||||
1873 | 9007 | 49007 | 05/1900 | 03/1926 from D |
07/10/1961 | 02/1940 to G2A |
61.42 | ||||||||||
1874 | 9054 | 49054 | 05/1900 | 02/1928 from D |
04/1949 | 48.92 | |||||||||||
1876 | 9021 | 49021 | 05/1900 | 11/1927 from D |
07/10/1961 | 07/1939 to G2A |
61.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
1877 | 9046 | 49046 | 05/1900 | 12/1927 from D |
08/03/1957 | 06/1940 to G2A |
56.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 22/03/1957 | 56.89 | ||||||
1878 | 9024 | 49024 | 05/1900 | 02/1928 from D |
23/02/1957 | 03/1941 to G2A |
56.75 | ||||||||||
1879 | 9025 | 49025 | 05/1900 | 05/1928 from D |
15/09/1962 | 11/1942 to G2A |
62.33 | ||||||||||
1880 | 9037 | 49037 | 05/1900 | 01/1928 from D |
29/12/1962 | 07/1940 to G2A |
62.58 | ||||||||||
1882 | 9344 | 49344 | 09/1901 | 02/1920 from B |
01/12/1962 | 10/1939 to G2A |
61.25 | ||||||||||
1883 | 9319 | 49319 | 09/1901 | 09/1918 from E |
10/1950 | 03/1942 to G2A |
49.08 | ||||||||||
1884 | 9266 | 49266 | 09/1901 | 08/1917 from E |
14/11/1959 | 08/1941 to G2A |
58.17 | ||||||||||
1885 | 9267 | 49267 | 09/1901 | 08/1917 from E |
01/12/1962 | 11/1946 to G2A |
61.25 | ||||||||||
1886 | 9390 | 49390 | 09/1901 | 01/1923 from E |
21/12/1957 | 02/1940 to G2A |
56.25 | ||||||||||
1887 | 9148 | 49148 | 09/1901 | 01/1936 from G |
31/07/1957 | 06/1941 to G2A |
55.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 25/07/1957 | 55.90 | ||||||
1888 | 9600 | 8892 | 48892 | 09/1901 | 01/1924 from E |
01/1949 | 47.33 | ||||||||||
1889 | 9345 | 49345 | 09/1901 | 06/1920 from E |
31/01/1958 | 03/1942 to G2A |
56.33 | ||||||||||
1890 | 8901 | 48901 | 09/1901 | 03/1924 from B |
17/05/1952 | 01/1947 to G2A |
50.67 | ||||||||||
1891 | 9348 | 49348 | 12/1901 | 12/1920 from G |
14/11/1959 | 06/1940 to G2A |
57.92 | ||||||||||
1892 | 8902 | 48902 | 12/1901 | 05/1925 from B |
21/02/1953 | 51.17 | |||||||||||
1893 | 9085 | 49085 | 12/1901 | 10/1927 from G |
12/08/1950 | 09/1928 to G2A |
48.67 | ||||||||||
1894 | 9391 | 49391 | 12/1901 | 01/1923 from B |
20/01/1962 | 11/1945 to G2A |
60.08 | ||||||||||
1895 | 9066 | 49066 | 12/1901 | 01/1924 from G |
02/11/1957 | 10/1938 to G2A |
55.92 | ||||||||||
1896 | 9380 | 12/1901 | 05/1922 from B |
11/1947 | 45.92 | ||||||||||||
1897 | 9370 | 49370 | 12/1901 | 12/1921 from B |
30/06/1951 | 49.5 | |||||||||||
1898 | 9385 | 49385 | 12/1901 | 10/1922 from B |
21/12/1957 | 09/1947 to G2A |
56 | ||||||||||
1899 | 9382 | 49382 | 12/1901 | 06/1922 from B |
22/09/1962 | 11/1940 to G2A |
60.75 | ||||||||||
1900 | 9065 | 49065 | 12/1901 | 06/1924 from G |
03/1950 | 08/1939 to G2A |
48.25 | ||||||||||
813 | 8903 | 48903 | 03/1902 | 02/1923 from B |
09/1949 | 11/1938 to G2A |
47.5 | ||||||||||
815 | 9375 | 49375 | 04/1902 | 02/1922 from B |
08/12/1962 | 10/1940 to G2A |
60.67 | ||||||||||
823 | 8904 | 48904 | 04/1902 | 05/1923 from B |
10/1949 | 47.5 | |||||||||||
826 | 8905 | 48905 | 04/1902 | 01/1927 from B |
06/06/1959 | 12/1938 to G2A |
57.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
843 | 8906 | 48906 | 04/1902 | 10/1923 from B |
03/1949 | 46.92 | |||||||||||
859 | 9336 | 04/1902 | 05/1919 from B |
07/1947 | 02/1941 to G2A |
45.25 | |||||||||||
898 | 9146 | 49146 | 04/1902 | 03/1932 from G |
28/02/1958 | 05/1941 to G2A |
55.83 | ||||||||||
899 | 9610 | 8896 | 48896 | 04/1902 | 06/1923 from F |
01/1950 | 06/1940 to G2A |
47.75 | |||||||||
904 | 9337 | 49337 | 04/1902 | 05/1919 from B |
16/07/1949 | 01/1948 to G2A |
Warwick | 47.25 | |||||||||
405 | 8907 | 48907 | 05/1902 | 02/1926 from B |
28/09/1957 | 07/1946 to G2A |
55.33 | ||||||||||
2074 | 8908 | 48908 | 05/1902 | 08/1923 from B |
09/09/1950 | 48.33 | |||||||||||
2114 | 9386 | 49386 | 05/1902 | 10/1922 from F |
28/11/1959 | 05/1939 to G2A |
57.5 | ||||||||||
2342 | 8909 | 48909 | 05/1902 | 03/1923 from B |
02/1949 | 01/1940 to G2A |
46.75 | ||||||||||
2369 | 8910 | 48910 | 05/1902 | 05/1923 from B |
01/1948 | 45.67 | |||||||||||
2496 | 8911 | 48911 | 05/1902 | 04/1923 from B |
31/12/1949 | Aston | 47.58 | ||||||||||
842 | 9338 | 49338 | 05/1902 | 06/1919 from B |
04/1949 | 46.92 | |||||||||||
906 | 9612 | 8897 | 48897 | 05/1902 | 05/1923 from F |
10/1949 | 08/1944 to G2A |
47.42 | |||||||||
2556 | 8912 | 48912 | 07/1902 | 05/1923 from B |
08/1948 | 46.08 | |||||||||||
2557 | 8913 | 48913 | 08/1902 | 07/1924 from B |
28/08/1948 | 46 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 04/09/1948 | 46.09 | |||||||
2559 | 8914 | 48914 | 08/1902 | 01/1924 from B |
13/07/1957 | 10/1939 to G2A |
54.92 | ||||||||||
2560 | 8915 | 48915 | 08/1902 | 04/1923 from B |
07/10/1961 | 05/1946 to G2A |
59.17 | ||||||||||
2562 | 9152 | 49152 | 08/1902 | 03/1930 from G |
09/1948 | 46.08 | |||||||||||
2563 | 9604 | 8893 | 48893 | 08/1902 | 11/1924 from E |
31/10/1954 | 12/1941 to G2A |
52.17 | |||||||||
2564 | 8917 | 48917 | 08/1902 | 04/1924 from B |
09/11/1957 | 03/1946 to G2A |
55.25 | ||||||||||
2251 | 9067 | 49067 | 09/1902 | 11/1927 from G |
12/1949 | 47.25 | |||||||||||
1035 | 9133 | 49133 | 09/1902 | 09/1923 from G |
02/1950 | 47.42 | |||||||||||
1036 | 9365 | 49365 | 09/1902 | 10/1921 from F |
16/07/1949 | Speke Junction | 46.83 | ||||||||||
1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 01/1921 from F |
12/1949 | 47.25 | |||||||||||
1039 | 8918 | 48918 | 09/1902 | 10/1925 from B |
03/1949 | 46.5 | |||||||||||
1040 | 8920 | 48920 | 09/1902 | 03/1923 from B |
05/05/1951 | 10/1938 to G2A |
48.67 | ||||||||||
1041 | 9355 | 49355 | 10/1902 | 03/1921 from B |
14/11/1959 | 11/1939 to G2A |
57.08 | ||||||||||
1043 | 9304 | 49304 | 10/1902 | 06/1918 from B |
12/12/1959 | 09/1938 to G2A |
57.17 | ||||||||||
2566 | 9153 | 49153 | 10/1902 | 03/1925 from G |
14/11/1959 | 11/1940 to G2A |
57.08 | ||||||||||
2567 | 8921 | 48921 | 10/1902 | 05/1924 from B |
30/04/1958 | 03/1940 to G2A |
55.5 | ||||||||||
2568 | 9342 | 49342 | 10/1902 | 12/1919 from B |
14/10/1961 | 10/1935 to G2A |
59 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
2569 | 9072 | 49072 | 10/1902 | 03/1932 from G |
26/02/1949 | 46.33 | |||||||||||
1044 | 9376 | 49376 | 11/1902 | 02/1922 from B |
31/03/1958 | 05/1940 to G2A |
55.33 | ||||||||||
1047 | 9387 | 49387 | 11/1902 | 12/1922 from B |
14/11/1959 | 01/1940 to G2A |
57 | ||||||||||
1051 | 8922 | 48922 | 11/1902 | 09/1926 from B |
09/05/1959 | 09/1945 to G2A |
56.5 | ||||||||||
1055 | 9377 | 49377 | 11/1902 | 03/1922 from B |
27/10/1962 | 06/1940 to G2A |
59.92 | ||||||||||
1064 | 9607 | 8894 | 48894 | 11/1902 | 02/1923 from E |
01/1949 | 46.17 | ||||||||||
1065 | 9340 | 49340 | 11/1902 | 09/1919 from E |
01/08/1959 | 01/1947 to G2A |
56.75 | ||||||||||
1066 | 9272 | 49272 | 12/1902 | 12/1917 from B |
02/1948 | 45.17 | |||||||||||
1070 | 9120 | 49120 | 12/1902 | 09/1933 from G |
05/09/1959 | 09/1938 to G2A |
56.75 | ||||||||||
1088 | 8924 | 48924 | 12/1902 | 02/1923 from B |
11/12/1948 | 46 | |||||||||||
1094 | 9324 | 49324 | 12/1902 | 10/1918 from B |
04/03/1950 | 47.25 | |||||||||||
1190 | 9076 | 49076 | 12/1902 | 01/1925 from G |
05/1950 | 47.42 | |||||||||||
1223 | 9368 | 49368 | 12/1902 | 11/1921 from E |
07/03/1959 | 09/1938 to G2A |
56.25 | ||||||||||
1224 | 9350 | 49350 | 01/1903 | 01/1921 from B |
08/12/1962 | 03/1946 to G2A |
59.92 | ||||||||||
1225 | 8926 | 48926 | 01/1903 | 02/1926 from B |
29/08/1959 | 09/1945 to G2A |
56.58 | ||||||||||
1226 | 8927 | 48927 | 01/1903 | 03/1926 from B |
11/11/1961 | 09/1947 to G2A |
58.83 | ||||||||||
1227 | 9363 | 49363 | 01/1903 | 08/1921 from E |
03/1949 | 05/1940 to G2A |
46.17 | ||||||||||
1228 | 9142 | 49142 | 01/1903 | 06/1923 from G |
22/12/1962 | 09/1945 to G2A |
59.92 | ||||||||||
1229 | 9070 | 49070 | 01/1903 | 12/1937 from G |
17/11/1962 | 12/1940 to G2A |
59.83 | ||||||||||
1230 | 9378 | 49378 | 01/1903 | 03/1922 from B |
14/11/1959 | 09/1938 to G2A |
56.83 | ||||||||||
1231 | 9147 | 49147 | 01/1903 | 03/1936 from G |
22/09/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
59.67 | ||||||||||
1236 | 9351 | 49351 | 01/1903 | 02/1921 from E |
12/11/1949 | 11/1942 to G2A |
46.83 | ||||||||||
1237 | 8929 | 48929 | 03/1903 | 08/1923 from B |
29/07/1950 | 47.33 | |||||||||||
1240 | 9358 | 49358 | 04/1903 | 05/1921 from B |
31/03/1958 | 02/1940 to G2A |
54.92 | ||||||||||
1241 | 9346 | 49346 | 04/1903 | 09/1920 from B |
10/05/1952 | 49.08 | |||||||||||
1242 | 9388 | 49388 | 04/1903 | 12/1922 from B |
03/1951 | 02/1940 to G2A |
47.92 | ||||||||||
1243 | 9150 | 49150 | 04/1903 | 08/1934 from G |
14/11/1959 | 06/1939 to G2A |
56.58 | ||||||||||
1245 | 9073 | 49073 | 04/1903 | 03/1927 from G |
11/01/1958 | 12/1939 to G2A |
54.75 | ||||||||||
1247 | 9613 | 8898 | 48898 | 04/1903 | 05/1923 from F |
30/06/1962 | 03/1942 to G2A |
59.17 | |||||||||
1248 | 8930 | 48930 | 04/1903 | 03/1932 from B |
08/12/1962 | 03/1943 to G2A |
59.67 | ||||||||||
1249 | 8931 | 48931 | 04/1903 | 10/1925 from B |
06/1949 | 46.17 | |||||||||||
1271 | 9145 | 49145 | 04/1903 | 12/1931 from G |
04/01/1958 | 04/1944 to G2A |
54.75 | ||||||||||
1272 | 8932 | 48932 | 05/1903 | 03/1924 from B |
07/10/1961 | 11/1940 to G2A |
58.42 | ||||||||||
1404 | 8933 | 48933 | 05/1903 | 11/1923 from B |
12/1950 | 04/1940 to G2A |
47.58 | ||||||||||
2024 | 8934 | 48934 | 05/1903 | 08/1923 from B |
03/1950 | 12/1945 to G2A |
46.83 | ||||||||||
1274 | 9071 | 49071 | 05/1903 | 12/1927 from G |
13/01/1951 | 47.67 | |||||||||||
2571 | 8935 | 48935 | 05/1903 | 04/1925 from B |
02/1949 | 45.75 | |||||||||||
2572 | 8936 | 48936 | 05/1903 | 03/1924 from B |
05/1951 | 01/1940 to G2A |
48 | ||||||||||
2573 | 9373 | 49373 | 05/1903 | 01/1922 from F |
08/12/1962 | 02/1944 to G2A |
59.58 | ||||||||||
2574 | 9343 | 49343 | 05/1903 | 01/1920 from E |
14/10/1961 | 06/1941 to G2A |
58.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
2575 | 9394 | 49394 | 05/1903 | 01/1923 from B |
27/10/1962 | 04/1940 to G2A |
59.42 | ||||||||||
41 | 9362 | 49362 | 06/1903 | 08/1921 from B |
08/1948 | 45.17 | |||||||||||
2080 | 8940 | 48940 | 06/1903 | 02/1924 from B |
11/05/1957 | 01/1940 to G2A |
53.92 | ||||||||||
1276 | 9389 | 49389 | 06/1903 | 01/1923 from B |
28/08/1954 | 02/1941 to G2A |
51.17 | ||||||||||
1277 | 9149 | 49149 | 06/1903 | 11/1927 from G |
14/11/1959 | 12/1939 to G2A |
56.42 | ||||||||||
1278 | 9381 | 49381 | 06/1903 | 06/1922 from B |
01/12/1962 | 09/1938 to G2A |
59.5 | ||||||||||
1279 | 9352 | 49352 | 07/1903 | 02/1921 from B |
15/09/1962 | 03/1940 to G2A |
59.17 | ||||||||||
1280 | 9100 | 49100 | 07/1903 | 05/1924 from G |
05/1950 | 46.83 | |||||||||||
1283 | 8939 | 48939 | 07/1903 | 03/1924 from B |
20/11/1948 | 45.33 | |||||||||||
2118 | 9292 | 49292 | 09/1903 | 04/1918 from B |
03/1951 | 06/1941 to G2A |
47.5 | ||||||||||
1284 | 8941 | 48941 | 09/1903 | 10/1923 from B |
06/05/1950 | 11/1939 to G2A |
46.67 | ||||||||||
1285 | 9339 | 49339 | 09/1903 | 08/1919 from B |
25/12/1954 | 05/1941 to G2A |
51.25 | ||||||||||
1286 | 9347 | 49347 | 09/1903 | 10/1920 from G |
01/1951 | 12/1940 to G2A |
47.33 | ||||||||||
1287 | 8942 | 48942 | 09/1903 | 09/1925 from B |
07/10/1961 | 06/1940 to G2A |
58.08 | ||||||||||
1288 | 8943 | 48943 | 09/1903 | 04/1923 from B |
05/09/1959 | 12/1939 to G2A |
56 | ||||||||||
1289 | 9361 | 49361 | 09/1903 | 06/1921 from B |
26/12/1964 | 09/1938 to G2A |
61.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
1308 | 8944 | 48944 | 09/1903 | 02/1924 from B |
28/09/1957 | 07/1940 to G2A |
54 | ||||||||||
1310 | 8945 | 48945 | 10/1903 | 11/1924 from B |
06/03/1959 | 07/1940 to G2A |
55.42 | ||||||||||
1318 | 9366 | 49366 | 10/1903 | 10/1921 from B |
17/10/1959 | 12/1935 to G2A |
56 | ||||||||||
500 | 9265 | 49265 | 10/1903 | 06/1917 from B |
04/1952 | 10/1938 to G2A |
48.5 | ||||||||||
916 | 9354 | 49354 | 10/1903 | 03/1921 from B |
03/03/1956 | 08/1946 to G2A |
52.42 | ||||||||||
2272 | 9360 | 49360 | 10/1903 | 05/1921 from B |
05/1949 | 04/1940 to G2A |
45.58 | ||||||||||
1299 | 9074 | 49074 | 10/1903 | 03/1925 from G |
16/12/1950 | 01/1939 to G2A |
47.17 | ||||||||||
1401 | 9075 | 49075 | 10/1903 | 12/1927 from G |
28/01/1950 | 46.25 | |||||||||||
1448 | 9273 | 49273 | 11/1903 | 12/1917 from B |
02/1948 | 12/1939 to G2A |
44.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 14/08/1948 | 44.78 | ||||||
2038 | 9356 | 49356 | 11/1903 | 04/1921 from B |
04/1950 | 03/1940 to G2A |
46.42 | ||||||||||
2208 | 9364 | 49364 | 11/1903 | 08/1921 from B |
12/1950 | 47.08 | |||||||||||
640 | 9383 | 49383 | 01/1904 | 07/1922 from B |
05/1948 | 44.33 | |||||||||||
1300 | 9379 | 49379 | 01/1904 | 03/1922 from B |
08/10/1949 | 08/1940 to G2A |
45.75 | ||||||||||
1449 | 9122 | 49122 | 01/1904 | 11/1927 from G |
01/12/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
58.92 | ||||||||||
1586 | 9353 | 49353 | 01/1904 | 02/1921 from E |
12/1949 | 45.92 | |||||||||||
508 | 9090 | 49090 | 02/1904 | 03/1936 from G |
16/12/1950 | 11/1939 to G2A |
46.83 | ||||||||||
641 | 9151 | 49151 | 02/1904 | 03/1927 from G |
09/08/1952 | 48.5 | |||||||||||
918 | 8948 | 48948 | 02/1904 | 05/1927 from B |
16/07/1949 | 04/1940 to G2A |
Abergavenny | 45.42 | |||||||||
2036 | 9341 | 49341 | 02/1904 | 12/1919 from B |
23/03/1957 | 09/1941 to G2A |
53.08 | ||||||||||
410 | 9331 | 49331 | 04/1904 | 11/1918 from B |
28/10/1950 | 09/1942 to G2A |
46.5 | ||||||||||
509 | 9069 | 49069 | 05/1904 | 11/1933 from G |
17/06/1950 | 08/1939 to G2A |
Willesden | 46.08 | |||||||||
647 | 9615 | 8899 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 02/1925 from F |
03/03/1956 | 05/1941 to G2A |
51.83 | |||||||||
1110 | 9369 | 49369 | 05/1904 | 12/1921 from B |
04/1950 | 10/1946 to G2A |
45.92 | ||||||||||
1122 | 9099 | 49099 | 05/1904 | 10/1927 from G |
21/07/1962 | 02/1941 to G2A |
58.17 | ||||||||||
503 | 9068 | 49068 | 05/1904 | 02/1935 from G |
19/01/1957 | 02/1943 to G2A |
52.67 | ||||||||||
818 | 9132 | 49132 | 05/1904 | 01/1924 from G |
18/04/1959 | 02/1940 to G2A |
54.92 | ||||||||||
1585 | 9609 | 8895 | 48895 | 05/1904 | 04/1923 from E |
05/12/1964 | 04/1944 to G2A |
60.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||
2056 | 9359 | 49359 | 05/1904 | 05/1921 from E |
02/02/1952 | 47.75 | |||||||||||
2387 | 9357 | 49357 | 05/1904 | 04/1921 from B |
14/10/1961 | 09/1942 to G2A |
57.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
437 | 9374 | 07/1904 | 02/1922 from E |
12/1947 | 43.42 | ||||||||||||
644 | 8950 | 48950 | 07/1904 | 01/1924 from B |
30/12/1961 | 09/1941 to G2A |
57.42 | ||||||||||
1353 | 9335 | 49335 | 07/1904 | 12/1918 from B |
29/09/1962 | 01/1943 to G2A |
58.17 | ||||||||||
1369 | 9372 | 49372 | 07/1904 | 01/1922 from F |
04/1949 | 10/1938 to G2A |
44.75 | ||||||||||
1432 | 9384 | 49384 | 07/1904 | 07/1922 from B |
12/1948 | 44.42 | |||||||||||
1436 | 8951 | 48951 | 08/1904 | 10/1923 from B |
31/08/1957 | 02/1939 to G2A |
53 | ||||||||||
1543 | 8952 | 48952 | 08/1904 | 02/1924 from B |
18/05/1957 | 09/1938 to G2A |
52.75 | ||||||||||
2057 | 9371 | 49371 | 08/1904 | 12/1921 from B |
19/01/1952 | 47.42 | |||||||||||
2060 | 9392 | 49392 | 08/1904 | 01/1923 from B |
14/10/1961 | 12/1938 to G2A |
57.17 | ||||||||||
2169 | 9393 | 49393 | 08/1904 | 01/1923 from E |
22/06/1957 | 01/1944 to G2A |
52.83 | ||||||||||
2653 | 9154 | 49154 | 01/1910 | 01/1912 from G |
01/12/1962 | 06/1940 to G2A |
52.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
2654 | 9077 | 49077 | 01/1910 | 12/1931 from G |
07/10/1961 | 06/1939 to G2A |
51.75 | ||||||||||
2655 | 9078 | 49078 | 01/1910 | 12/1932 from G |
15/12/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
52.92 | ||||||||||
2656 | 9079 | 49079 | 02/1910 | 02/1926 from G |
01/12/1962 | 11/1939 to G2A |
52.83 | ||||||||||
2657 | 9080 | 49080 | 02/1910 | 04/1934 from G |
02/1950 | 03/1946 to G2A |
40 | ||||||||||
2658 | 9081 | 49081 | 02/1910 | 06/1930 from G |
01/12/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
52.83 | ||||||||||
2659 | 9086 | 49086 | 02/1910 | 07/1930 from G |
04/1949 | 09/1938 to G2A |
39.17 | ||||||||||
2660 | 9087 | 49087 | 02/1910 | 12/1927 from G |
22/09/1962 | 10/1938 to G2A |
52.58 | ||||||||||
2661 | 9088 | 49088 | 02/1910 | 08/1933 from G |
16/11/1957 | 07/1940 to G2A |
47.75 | ||||||||||
2662 | 9089 | 49089 | 02/1910 | 12/1929 from G |
14/01/1950 | 07/1939 to G2A |
39.92 | ||||||||||
1354 | 9082 | 49082 | 03/1910 | 08/1925 from G |
15/10/1960 | 07/1939 to G2A |
50.58 | ||||||||||
1380 | 9083 | 49083 | 03/1910 | 05/1928 from G |
01/1950 | 09/1938 to G2A |
Bescot | 39.83 | |||||||||
1411 | 9084 | 49084 | 03/1910 | 03/1928 from G |
09/1949 | 39.5 | |||||||||||
1456 | 9092 | 49092 | 03/1910 | 07/1929 from G |
27/09/1952 | 42.5 | |||||||||||
1497 | 9093 | 49093 | 03/1910 | 11/1927 from G |
01/12/1962 | 09/1939 to G2A |
52.75 | ||||||||||
1556 | 9094 | 49094 | 03/1910 | 01/1928 from G |
01/12/1962 | 07/1939 to G2A |
52.75 | ||||||||||
1582 | 9095 | 49095 | 03/1910 | 12/1929 from G |
06/1948 | 38.25 | |||||||||||
1591 | 9096 | 49096 | 03/1910 | 11/1931 from G |
05/04/1952 | 08/1940 to G2A |
42.08 | ||||||||||
1619 | 9097 | 49097 | 03/1910 | 06/1933 from G |
03/1950 | 08/1939 to G2A |
40 | ||||||||||
1629 | 9098 | 49098 | 03/1910 | 01/1934 from G |
12/05/1951 | 41.17 | |||||||||||
1322 | 9091 | 49091 | 04/1910 | 05/1928 from G |
09/1949 | 08/1938 to G2A |
39.42 | ||||||||||
1464 | 9101 | 49101 | 04/1910 | 04/1927 from G |
30/09/1950 | 40.42 | |||||||||||
1511 | 9102 | 49102 | 04/1910 | 01/1934 from G |
06/1949 | Preston | 39.17 | ||||||||||
1570 | 9103 | 49103 | 04/1910 | 04/1927 from G |
16/07/1949 | 05/1940 to G2A |
39.25 | ||||||||||
1578 | 9104 | 49104 | 04/1910 | 05/1924 from G |
01/12/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
52.67 | ||||||||||
1600 | 9105 | 49105 | 05/1910 | 10/1935 from G |
14/11/1959 | 05/1942 to G2A |
49.5 | ||||||||||
1647 | 9106 | 49106 | 05/1910 | 01/1930 from G |
15/12/1962 | 52.58 | |||||||||||
1664 | 9107 | 49107 | 05/1910 | 11/1929 from G |
29/04/1950 | 11/1947 to G2A |
39.92 | ||||||||||
1687 | 9108 | 49108 | 05/1910 | 11/1934 from G |
23/11/1957 | 12/1939 to G2A |
47.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
1699 | 9109 | 49109 | 05/1910 | 12/1929 from G |
07/03/1959 | 11/1939 to G2A |
48.83 | ||||||||||
1503 | 9110 | 49110 | 05/1910 | 09/1932 from G |
03/1949 | 11/1939 to G2A |
38.83 | ||||||||||
1540 | 9111 | 49111 | 05/1910 | 01/1928 from G |
03/1949 | 10/1942 to G2A |
38.83 | ||||||||||
1609 | 9112 | 49112 | 06/1910 | 01/1928 from G |
14/11/1959 | 10/1939 to G2A |
49.42 | ||||||||||
1634 | 9113 | 49113 | 06/1910 | 04/1933 from G |
19/01/1959 | 12/1938 to G2A |
48.58 | ||||||||||
1637 | 9114 | 49114 | 06/1910 | 09/1928 from G |
01/12/1962 | 01/1939 to G2A |
52.5 | ||||||||||
1639 | 9115 | 49115 | 06/1910 | 11/1924 from G |
14/11/1959 | 12/1938 to G2A |
49.42 | ||||||||||
1660 | 9116 | 49116 | 06/1910 | 12/1927 from G |
14/11/1959 | 03/1943 to G2A |
49.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||||||
1789 | 9117 | 49117 | 06/1910 | 12/1932 from G |
06/03/1959 | 48.75 | |||||||||||
2030 | 9118 | 49118 | 06/1910 | 12/1934 from G |
12/1947 | 12/1940 to G2A |
37.5 | ||||||||||
2032 | 9119 | 49119 | 06/1910 | 11/1932 from G |
07/10/1961 | 11/1939 to G2A |
51.33 | ||||||||||
1385 | 9121 | 49121 | 07/1910 | 07/1925 from G |
30/09/1958 | 01/1940 to G2A |
48.17 | ||||||||||
1492 | 9123 | 49123 | 07/1910 | 12/1930 from G |
06/1949 | 09/1938 to G2A |
38.92 | ||||||||||
1507 | 9124 | 49124 | 07/1910 | 12/1927 from G |
01/1950 | 08/1944 to G2A |
39.5 | ||||||||||
1539 | 9125 | 49125 | 08/1910 | 06/1927 from G |
15/09/1962 | 08/1939 to G2A |
52.08 | ||||||||||
1577 | 9126 | 49126 | 08/1910 | 12/1929 from G |
15/09/1962 | 07/1941 to G2A |
52.08 | ||||||||||
1606 | 9127 | 49127 | 08/1910 | 09/1936 from G |
03/1950 | 39.58 | |||||||||||
1648 | 9128 | 49128 | 08/1910 | 03/1931 from G |
11/1948 | 06/1947 to G2A |
38.25 | ||||||||||
1690 | 9129 | 49129 | 08/1910 | 12/1935 from G |
01/12/1962 | 05/1939 to G2A |
52.33 | ||||||||||
1774 | 9130 | 49130 | 08/1910 | 03/1931 from G |
01/12/1962 | 52.33 | |||||||||||
1776 | 9131 | 49131 | 08/1910 | 12/1926 from G |
07/1948 | 07/1941 to G2A |
37.92 | ||||||||||
1403 | 9134 | 49134 | 08/1910 | 12/1937 from G |
31/03/1962 | 51.58 | |||||||||||
1424 | 9135 | 49135 | 08/1910 | 11/1927 from G |
11/1949 | 39.25 | |||||||||||
1462 | 9136 | 49136 | 09/1910 | 01/1937 from G |
08/1948 | 37.92 | |||||||||||
1700 | 9137 | 49137 | 09/1910 | 11/1927 from G |
07/10/1961 | 01/1946 to G2A |
51.08 | ||||||||||
1727 | 9138 | 49138 | 09/1910 | 11/1934 from G |
02/02/1952 | 10/1938 to G2A |
41.42 | ||||||||||
1735 | 9139 | 49139 | 09/1910 | 09/1928 from G |
15/09/1962 | 52 | |||||||||||
1775 | 9140 | 49140 | 09/1910 | 10/1928 from G |
17/09/1955 | 03/1941 to G2A |
45 | ||||||||||
1794 | 9141 | 49141 | 09/1910 | 02/1930 from G |
21/07/1962 | 01/1941 to G2A |
51.83 | ||||||||||
1788 | 9143 | 49143 | 09/1910 | 10/1931 from G |
24/10/1959 | 01/1947 to G2A |
49.08 | ||||||||||
2014 | 9144 | 49144 | 09/1910 | 03/1926 from G |
10/11/1962 | 10/1944 to G2A |
52.17 | ||||||||||
1329 | 9155 | 49155 | 02/1912 | 26/05/1962 | 11/1939 to G2A |
50.25 | |||||||||||
1384 | 9156 | 49156 | 02/1912 | 03/02/1951 | 39 | ||||||||||||
1426 | 9157 | 49157 | 02/1912 | 19/01/1959 | 08/1939 to G2A |
46.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||||
1633 | 9158 | 49158 | 02/1912 | 10/1962 | 01/1939 to G2A |
50.67 | |||||||||||
1697 | 9159 | 49159 | 02/1912 | 05/1949 | 37.25 | ||||||||||||
1778 | 9160 | 49160 | 03/1912 | 14/11/1959 | 09/1947 to G2A |
47.67 | |||||||||||
1791 | 9161 | 49161 | 03/1912 | 12/04/1957 | 12/1939 to G2A |
45.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 10/05/1957 | 45.18 | |||||||
2001 | 9162 | 49162 | 03/1912 | 16/05/1953 | 41.17 | ||||||||||||
2015 | 9163 | 49163 | 03/1912 | 08/12/1951 | 01/1941 to G2A |
39.75 | |||||||||||
2034 | 9164 | 49164 | 03/1912 | 14/10/1961 | 05/1944 to G2A |
49.58 | |||||||||||
1568 | 9165 | 49165 | 03/1912 | 18/09/1948 | 36.5 | ||||||||||||
1655 | 9166 | 49166 | 04/1912 | 03/1949 | 36.92 | 37.02 | |||||||||||
1696 | 9167 | 49167 | 04/1912 | 28/12/1957 | 12/1945 to G2A |
45.67 | |||||||||||
1698 | 9168 | 49168 | 04/1912 | 25/01/1958 | 09/1939 to G2A |
45.75 | |||||||||||
1783 | 9169 | 49169 | 04/1912 | 12/1949 | 12/1939 to G2A |
37.67 | |||||||||||
1162 | 9170 | 49170 | 05/1912 | 16/07/1949 | 03/1941 to G2A |
Widnes | 37.17 | ||||||||||
1505 | 9171 | 49171 | 05/1912 | 02/1952 | 39.75 | 22.60 | |||||||||||
1790 | 9172 | 49172 | 04/1912 | 10/08/1957 | 10/1938 to G2A |
45.33 | |||||||||||
2018 | 9173 | 49173 | 04/1912 | 18/07/1964 | 03/1947 to G2A |
52.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||||
2104 | 9174 | 49174 | 05/1912 | 22/02/1958 | 12/1939 to G2A |
45.75 | |||||||||||
2119 | 9175 | 49175 | 05/1912 | 01/1948 | 35.67 | 35.78 | |||||||||||
2284 | 9176 | 49176 | 05/1912 | 14/01/1950 | 11/1941 to G2A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) | 37.67 | ||||||||||
2254 | 9177 | 49177 | 05/1912 | 02/02/1959 | 05/1940 to G2A |
46.75 | |||||||||||
2337 | 9178 | 49178 | 06/1912 | 05/1951 | 12/1946 to G2A |
38.92 | |||||||||||
2345 | 9179 | 49179 | 06/1912 | 18/12/1948 | 36.5 | ||||||||||||
2349 | 9180 | 49180 | 06/1912 | 07/03/1959 | 12/1938 to G2A |
46.75 | |||||||||||
2385 | 9181 | 49181 | 06/1912 | 04/04/1959 | 04/1940 to G2A |
46.83 | |||||||||||
2393 | 9182 | 49182 | 06/1912 | 12/1947 | 35.5 | ||||||||||||
674 | 9183 | 49183 | 07/1912 | 06/1950 | 37.92 | 37.94 | |||||||||||
1746 | 9184 | 49184 | 07/1912 | 01/1949 | 01/1940 to G2A |
36.5 | |||||||||||
955 | 9185 | 49185 | 10/1912 | 04/1949 | 04/1939 to G2A |
36.5 | |||||||||||
1108 | 9186 | 49186 | 10/1912 | 14/09/1957 | 02/1941 to G2A |
44.92 | |||||||||||
2162 | 9187 | 49187 | 10/1912 | 16/02/1952 | 39.33 | ||||||||||||
2225 | 9188 | 49188 | 10/1912 | 10/09/1949 | 03/1947 to G2A |
36.92 | |||||||||||
2281 | 9189 | 49189 | 10/1912 | 26/01/1957 | 04/1946 to G2A |
44.25 | |||||||||||
2289 | 9190 | 49190 | 11/1912 | 02/1950 | 37.25 | ||||||||||||
2301 | 9191 | 49191 | 11/1912 | 14/10/1961 | 11/1945 to G2A |
48.92 | |||||||||||
2374 | 9192 | 49192 | 11/1912 | 11/1949 | 06/1939 to G2A |
37 | |||||||||||
328 | 9193 | 49193 | 12/1912 | 11/1951 | 38.92 | ||||||||||||
631 | 9194 | 49194 | 12/1912 | 10/1949 | 36.83 | ||||||||||||
1529 | 9195 | 49195 | 12/1912 | 03/1949 | 36.25 | ||||||||||||
2091 | 9196 | 49196 | 12/1912 | 14/10/1961 | 08/1947 to G2A |
48.83 | |||||||||||
2286 | 9197 | 49197 | 12/1912 | 05/1948 | 35.42 | 35.94 | |||||||||||
2380 | 9198 | 49198 | 11/1912 | 29/05/1948 | 08/1942 to G2A |
35.5 | |||||||||||
2405 | 9199 | 49199 | 11/1912 | 22/09/1962 | 06/1947 to G2A |
49.83 | |||||||||||
2421 | 9200 | 49200 | 12/1912 | 28/03/1959 | 02/1947 to G2A |
46.25 | |||||||||||
326 | 9201 | 49201 | 01/1913 | 19/06/1948 | 35.42 | 35.52 | |||||||||||
633 | 9202 | 49202 | 01/1913 | 05/10/1957 | 04/1946 to G2A |
44.75 | |||||||||||
1192 | 9203 | 49203 | 01/1913 | 14/11/1959 | 09/1940 to G2A |
46.83 | |||||||||||
2245 | 9204 | 49204 | 01/1913 | 07/04/1951 | 38.25 | ||||||||||||
107 | 9205 | 49205 | 06/1913 | 04/1951 | 12/1941 to G2A |
37.83 | |||||||||||
93 | 9206 | 49206 | 07/1913 | 12/1947 | 34.42 | ||||||||||||
138 | 9207 | 49207 | 07/1913 | 16/07/1949 | 11/1939 to G2A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) | 36 | ||||||||||
670 | 9208 | 49208 | 07/1913 | 02/1951 | 37.58 | 37.61 | |||||||||||
734 | 9209 | 49209 | 07/1913 | 14/10/1961 | 11/1940 to G2A |
48.25 | |||||||||||
787 | 9210 | 49210 | 07/1913 | 14/10/1961 | 12/1946 to G2A |
48.25 | |||||||||||
1127 | 9211 | 49211 | 07/1913 | 09/1949 | 12/1943 to G2A |
36.17 | |||||||||||
1128 | 9212 | 49212 | 08/1913 | 21/04/1956 | 12/1940 to G2A |
42.67 | |||||||||||
2201 | 9213 | 49213 | 08/1913 | 09/1951 | 38.08 | ||||||||||||
2378 | 9214 | 49214 | 08/1913 | 10/08/1957 | 07/1941 to G2A |
44 | |||||||||||
43 | 9215 | 49215 | 08/1913 | 12/1947 | 34.33 | ||||||||||||
669 | 9216 | 49216 | 08/1913 | 24/11/1962 | 05/1940 to G2A |
49.25 | |||||||||||
1314 | 9217 | 49217 | 08/1913 | 02/1949 | 08/1939 to G2A |
35.5 | |||||||||||
1343 | 9218 | 49218 | 09/1913 | 03/1951 | 01/1947 to G2A |
37.5 | |||||||||||
2117 | 9219 | 49219 | 09/1913 | 30/09/1950 | 10/1944 to G2A |
37 | |||||||||||
2195 | 9220 | 49220 | 09/1913 | 04/02/1950 | 07/1942 to G2A |
36.42 | |||||||||||
2246 | 9221 | 49221 | 09/1913 | 09/1949 | 36 | ||||||||||||
2258 | 9222 | 49222 | 09/1913 | 29/09/1951 | 38 | ||||||||||||
2390 | 9223 | 49223 | 09/1913 | 06/04/1957 | 10/1940 to G2A |
43.58 | |||||||||||
2452 | 9224 | 49224 | 10/1913 | 01/12/1962 | 12/1940 to G2A |
49.17 | |||||||||||
20 | 9225 | 49225 | 03/1914 | 20/03/1948 | 34 | ||||||||||||
131 | 9226 | 49226 | 03/1914 | 06/03/1959 | 12/1941 to G2A |
45 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||||
795 | 9227 | 49227 | 03/1914 | 02/1949 | 05/1946 to G2A |
34.92 | |||||||||||
329 | 9228 | 49228 | 04/1914 | 04/04/1959 | 06/1939 to G2A |
45 | |||||||||||
1181 | 9229 | 49229 | 04/1914 | 19/11/1960 | 10/1947 to G2A |
46.58 | |||||||||||
1214 | 9230 | 49230 | 04/1914 | 30/11/1957 | 12/1947 to G2A |
43.58 | |||||||||||
1486 | 9231 | 49231 | 03/1914 | 02/1948 | 33.92 | 34.11 | |||||||||||
1500 | 9232 | 49232 | 04/1914 | 17/06/1950 | Patricroft | 36.17 | |||||||||||
2033 | 9233 | 49233 | 04/1914 | 22/05/1948 | 34.08 | 34.19 | |||||||||||
2200 | 9234 | 49234 | 04/1914 | 25/06/1960 | 01/1940 to G2A |
46.17 | |||||||||||
108 | 9235 | 49235 | 05/1914 | 11/02/1950 | 11/1939 to G2A |
35.75 | |||||||||||
175 | 9236 | 49236 | 05/1914 | 13/03/1948 | 33.83 | ||||||||||||
351 | 9237 | 49237 | 05/1914 | 31/12/1949 | 01/1939 to G2A |
Edge Hill | 35.58 | ||||||||||
965 | 9238 | 49238 | 06/1914 | 07/1949 | 07/1939 to G2A |
35.08 | |||||||||||
1142 | 9239 | 49239 | 05/1914 | 09/1957 | 03/1942 to G2A |
43.33 | |||||||||||
1485 | 9240 | 49240 | 06/1914 | 15/09/1962 | 11/1940 to G2A |
48.25 | |||||||||||
2336 | 9241 | 49241 | 05/1914 | 20/09/1952 | 38.33 | ||||||||||||
2379 | 9242 | 49242 | 05/1914 | 05/1949 | 02/1941 to G2A |
35 | |||||||||||
2058 | 9243 | 49243 | 06/1914 | 11/03/1961 | 11/1939 to G2A |
46.75 | |||||||||||
2156 | 9244 | 49244 | 06/1914 | 04/1952 | 09/1941 to G2A |
37.83 | |||||||||||
2237 | 9245 | 49245 | 06/1914 | 12/12/1959 | 10/1940 to G2A |
45.5 | |||||||||||
48 | 9246 | 49246 | 07/1914 | 13/01/1962 | 12/1939 to G2A |
47.5 | |||||||||||
62 | 9247 | 49247 | 07/1914 | 16/11/1957 | 10/1938 to G2A |
43.33 | |||||||||||
72 | 9248 | 49248 | 07/1914 | 05/1949 | 34.83 | ||||||||||||
99 | 9249 | 49249 | 07/1914 | 12/12/1959 | 05/1940 to G2A |
45.42 | |||||||||||
176 | 9250 | 49250 | 07/1914 | 10/04/1948 | 33.75 | 33.86 | |||||||||||
203 | 9251 | 49251 | 07/1914 | 01/1948 | 33.5 | 33.61 | |||||||||||
931 | 9252 | 49252 | 08/1914 | 14/11/1959 | 10/1940 to G2A |
45.25 | |||||||||||
2094 | 9253 | 49253 | 08/1914 | 15/03/1952 | 06/1947 to G2A |
37.58 | |||||||||||
2234 | 9254 | 49254 | 08/1914 | 13/04/1957 | 10/1947 to G2A |
42.67 | |||||||||||
170 | 9255 | 49255 | 05/1916 | 03/1950 | 33.83 | ||||||||||||
545 | 9256 | 49256 | 05/1916 | 05/1949 | 11/1938 to G2A |
33 | |||||||||||
885 | 9257 | 49257 | 05/1916 | 04/11/1950 | 01/1946 to G2A |
34.5 | |||||||||||
942 | 9258 | 49258 | 05/1916 | 03/1951 | 06/1941 to G2A |
34.83 | |||||||||||
982 | 9259 | 49259 | 05/1916 | 03/1949 | 32.83 | ||||||||||||
1167 | 9260 | 49260 | 05/1916 | 30/04/1958 | 10/1938 to G2A |
41.92 | |||||||||||
1217 | 9261 | 49261 | 05/1916 | 10/03/1951 | 34.83 | ||||||||||||
1528 | 9262 | 49262 | 06/1916 | 08/12/1962 | 02/1939 to G2A |
46.5 | |||||||||||
1729 | 9263 | 49263 | 06/1916 | 03/1949 | 32.75 | ||||||||||||
2288 | 9264 | 49264 | 06/1916 | 13/01/1951 | 08/1940 to G2A |
34.58 | |||||||||||
94 | 9268 | 49268 | 11/1917 | 14/11/1959 | 07/1940 to G2A |
42 | |||||||||||
112 | 9269 | 49269 | 10/1917 | 09/1949 | 31.92 | ||||||||||||
360 | 9270 | 49270 | 11/1917 | 14/11/1959 | 10/1935 to G2A |
42 | |||||||||||
851 | 9271 | 49271 | 11/1917 | 02/11/1957 | 03/1940 to G2A |
40 | |||||||||||
2088 | 9274 | 49274 | 10/1917 | 10/04/1948 | 30.5 | 30.52 | |||||||||||
2256 | 9275 | 49275 | 10/1917 | 14/10/1961 | 12/1939 to G2A |
44 | |||||||||||
2290 | 9276 | 49276 | 11/1917 | 12/1958 | 12/1935 to G2A |
41.08 | |||||||||||
2296 | 9277 | 49277 | 11/1917 | 17/02/1962 | 08/1947 to G2A |
44.25 | |||||||||||
2274 | 9278 | 49278 | 11/1917 | 24/10/1959 | 09/1940 to G2A |
41.92 | |||||||||||
2423 | 9279 | 49279 | 12/1917 | 11/02/1950 | 32.17 | ||||||||||||
83 | 9280 | 49280 | 01/1918 | 17/09/1949 | 03/1940 to G2A |
31.67 | |||||||||||
720 | 9281 | 49281 | 01/1918 | 08/12/1962 | 12/1938 to G2A |
44.92 | |||||||||||
750 | 9282 | 49282 | 01/1918 | 01/1957 | 10/1947 to G2A |
39 | |||||||||||
943 | 9283 | 49283 | 01/1918 | 16/07/1949 | Bushbury | 31.5 | |||||||||||
1121 | 9284 | 49284 | 01/1918 | 03/1950 | 10/1940 to G2A |
32.17 | |||||||||||
1313 | 9285 | 49285 | 02/1918 | 07/1949 | 31.42 | ||||||||||||
2082 | 9286 | 49286 | 02/1918 | 24/04/1946 | 28.17 | ||||||||||||
2167 | 9287 | 49287 | 02/1918 | 01/12/1962 | 09/1944 to G2A |
44.83 | |||||||||||
2172 | 9288 | 49288 | 02/1918 | 14/10/1961 | 11/1939 to G2A |
43.67 | |||||||||||
2412 | 9289 | 49289 | 03/1918 | 14/11/1959 | 08/1939 to G2A |
41.67 | |||||||||||
1129 | 9290 | 49290 | 03/1918 | 03/1949 | 01/1940 to G2A |
31 | |||||||||||
1614 | 9291 | 49291 | 03/1918 | 20/05/1950 | 04/1943 to G2A |
32.17 | |||||||||||
2150 | 9293 | 49293 | 03/1918 | 01/12/1962 | 01/1940 to G2A |
44.75 | |||||||||||
2250 | 9294 | 49294 | 03/1918 | 31/12/1949 | 02/1940 to G2A |
Bescot | 31.75 | ||||||||||
2297 | 9295 | 49295 | 04/1918 | 14/08/1948 | 30.33 | 30.61 | |||||||||||
2343 | 9296 | 49296 | 04/1918 | 05/1951 | 07/1939 to G2A |
33.08 | |||||||||||
230 | 9297 | 49297 | 05/1918 | 04/1949 | 30.92 | ||||||||||||
264 | 9298 | 49298 | 05/1918 | 31/12/1949 | 10/1939 to G2A |
Willesden | 31.58 | ||||||||||
2376 | 9299 | 49299 | 04/1918 | 16/07/1949 | 05/1943 to G2A |
Preston | 31.25 | ||||||||||
2410 | 9300 | 49300 | 04/1918 | 24/11/1951 | 04/1942 to G2A |
33.58 | |||||||||||
2422 | 9301 | 49301 | 04/1918 | 14/03/1959 | 07/1939 to G2A |
40.92 | |||||||||||
2441 | 9302 | 49302 | 05/1918 | 12/1951 | 12/1946 to G2A |
33.58 | |||||||||||
880 | 9303 | 49303 | 05/1918 | 27/11/1948 | 30.5 | ||||||||||||
1071 | 9305 | 49305 | 05/1918 | 03/1949 | 30.83 | ||||||||||||
1657 | 9306 | 49306 | 06/1918 | 14/11/1959 | 08/1940 to G2A |
41.42 | |||||||||||
1693 | 9307 | 49307 | 06/1918 | 30/09/1950 | 01/1946 to G2A |
32.25 | |||||||||||
2066 | 9308 | 49308 | 06/1918 | 04/04/1959 | 01/1943 to G2A |
40.83 | |||||||||||
2199 | 9309 | 49309 | 06/1918 | 03/07/1948 | 30.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 28/08/1948 | 30.22 | ||||||||
2235 | 9310 | 49310 | 07/1918 | 14/10/1961 | 11/1940 to G2A |
43.25 | |||||||||||
2253 | 9311 | 49311 | 07/1918 | 10/10/1959 | 01/1941 to G2A |
41.25 | |||||||||||
757 | 9312 | 49312 | 07/1918 | 04/1951 | 04/1940 to G2A |
32.75 | |||||||||||
829 | 9313 | 49313 | 07/1918 | 16/12/1961 | 12/1939 to G2A |
43.42 | |||||||||||
894 | 9314 | 49314 | 07/1918 | 01/12/1962 | 01/1947 to G2A |
44.42 | |||||||||||
1107 | 9315 | 49315 | 08/1918 | 27/06/1959 | 08/1939 to G2A |
40.83 | |||||||||||
1435 | 9316 | 49316 | 08/1918 | 24/01/1957 | 10/1939 to G2A |
38.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/02/1957 | 38.51 | |||||||
1495 | 9317 | 49317 | 08/1918 | 03/1950 | 04/1940 to G2A |
31.58 | |||||||||||
1785 | 9318 | 49318 | 09/1918 | 02/11/1957 | 06/1940 to G2A |
39.17 | |||||||||||
2054 | 9320 | 49320 | 09/1918 | 12/1949 | 31.25 | 32.19 | |||||||||||
2160 | 9321 | 49321 | 09/1918 | 25/06/1960 | 11/1935 to G2A |
41.75 | |||||||||||
2236 | 9322 | 49322 | 09/1918 | 10/03/1956 | 01/1939 to G2A |
37.5 | |||||||||||
172 | 9323 | 49323 | 10/1918 | 22/09/1962 | 04/1941 to G2A |
43.92 | |||||||||||
1261 | 9325 | 49325 | 11/1918 | 12/11/1949 | 07/1943 to G2A |
31 | |||||||||||
1306 | 9326 | 49326 | 10/1918 | 01/08/1953 | 34.83 | ||||||||||||
1487 | 9327 | 49327 | 10/1918 | 14/11/1959 | 03/1940 to G2A |
41.08 | |||||||||||
1793 | 9328 | 49328 | 10/1918 | 01/12/1962 | 04/1944 to G2A |
44.17 | |||||||||||
2287 | 9329 | 49329 | 10/1918 | 03/1949 | 01/1940 to G2A |
30.42 | |||||||||||
279 | 9330 | 49330 | 11/1918 | 07/03/1959 | 01/1940 to G2A |
40.33 | |||||||||||
1158 | 9332 | 49332 | 11/1918 | 29/07/1950 | 31.67 | ||||||||||||
1359 | 9333 | 49333 | 11/1918 | 20/05/1950 | 08/1940 to G2A |
31.5 | |||||||||||
2497 | 9334 | 49334 | 12/1918 | 09/1950 | 31.75 | ||||||||||||
2524 | 9011 | 49011 | 10/1892 | 08/1925 from B |
31/12/1949 | Aston | 57.17 |