Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1523 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19326 Week
» 72342 Month
» 191869 Year
» 3218722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Drummond "L11" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
134
|
30134
|
04/1904 |
|
03/1951 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
46.95 |
148
|
30148
|
04/1904 |
|
08/03/1952 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
47.95 |
154
|
30154
|
05/1903 |
|
04/1951 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
47.95 |
155
|
30155
|
05/1903 |
|
04/1951 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
47.95 |
156
|
30156
|
06/1903 |
|
05/05/1951 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
47.95 |
157
|
30157
|
06/1903 |
|
08/03/1952 |
|
48.75 |
|
|
|
48.78 |
158
|
30158
|
06/1903 |
|
12/1950 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
47.53 |
159
|
30159
|
07/1903 |
|
10/03/1951 |
|
47.67 |
|
|
|
47.70 |
161
|
30161
|
08/1903 |
|
02/1950 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
46.87 |
163
|
30163
|
09/1903 |
|
27/10/1951 |
|
48.08 |
|
|
|
48.28 |
164
|
30164
|
10/1903 |
|
10/1951 |
|
48 |
|
|
|
48.03 |
165
|
30165
|
10/1903 |
|
04/1951 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
47.53 |
166
|
30166
|
04/1904 |
|
15/07/1950 |
|
46.25 |
|
|
|
46.36 |
167
|
30167
|
05/1904 |
|
09/1949 |
|
45.33 |
|
|
|
45.62 |
168
|
30168
|
05/1904 |
|
02/1950 |
|
45.75 |
|
|
|
45.86 |
169
|
30169
|
08/1904 |
|
07/1949 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
45.12 |
170
|
30170
|
08/1904 |
|
06/1952 |
|
47.83 |
|
|
|
47.87 |
171
|
30171
|
09/1904 |
|
09/1951 |
|
47 |
|
|
|
47.03 |
172
|
30172
|
09/1904 |
|
06/1952 |
|
47.75 |
|
|
|
47.78 |
173
|
30173
|
09/1904 |
|
05/1951 |
|
46.67 |
|
|
|
46.69 |
174
|
30174
|
04/1906 |
|
09/1951 |
|
45.42 |
|
|
|
45.45 |
175
|
30175
|
04/1906 |
|
12/1951 |
|
45.67 |
|
|
|
45.70 |
405
|
30405
|
09/1906 |
|
02/1951 |
|
44.42 |
|
|
|
44.53 |
406
|
30406
|
09/1906 |
|
06/1951 |
|
44.75 |
|
|
|
44.78 |
407
|
30407
|
05/1906 |
|
11/1950 |
|
44.5 |
|
|
|
44.53 |
408
|
30408
|
05/1906 |
|
03/1951 |
|
44.83 |
|
|
|
44.95 |
409
|
30409
|
06/1906 |
|
06/1951 |
|
45 |
|
|
|
45.03 |
410
|
30410
|
06/1906 |
|
12/1949 |
|
43.5 |
|
|
|
43.70 |
411
|
30411
|
06/1906 |
|
06/1952 |
|
46 |
|
|
|
46.03 |
412
|
30412
|
07/1906 |
|
12/1950 |
|
44.42 |
|
|
|
44.45 |
413
|
30413
|
07/1906 |
|
03/1951 |
|
44.67 |
|
|
|
44.70 |
414
|
30414
|
07/1906 |
|
05/1951 |
|
44.83 |
|
|
|
44.86 |
435
|
30435
|
10/1906 |
|
12/1949 |
|
43.17 |
|
|
|
43.20 |
436
|
30436
|
11/1906 |
|
07/1951 |
|
44.67 |
|
|
|
44.78 |
437
|
30437
|
12/1906 |
|
06/1952 |
|
45.5 |
|
|
|
45.53 |
438
|
30438
|
03/1907 |
|
10/1951 |
|
44.58 |
|
|
|
44.62 |
439
|
30439
|
03/1907 |
|
05/1949 |
|
42.17 |
|
|
|
42.45 |
440
|
30440
|
04/1907 |
|
05/1949 |
|
42.08 |
|
|
|
42.36 |
441
|
30441
|
05/1907 |
|
04/1951 |
|
43.92 |
|
|
|
44.03 |
442
|
30442
|
05/1907 |
|
12/1951 |
|
44.58 |
|
|
|
44.62 |