Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2155 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19958 Week
» 72974 Month
» 192501 Year
» 3219354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
SR Billinton "E4X" Class 0-6-2T
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
2466
|
32466
|
04/1898 |
|
13/12/1958 |
|
60.67 |
|
|
|
60.95 |
2477
|
32477
|
10/1898 |
|
17/01/1959 |
|
60.25 |
|
|
|
60.38 |
2478
|
32478
|
11/1898 |
|
30/06/1956 |
|
57.58 |
|
|
|
57.79 |
2489
|
32489
|
06/1899 |
|
07/05/1955 |
|
55.92 |
|
|
|
|