Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 683 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 5281 Week
» 17102 Month
» 185874 Year
» 1070255 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "Radials" Class 0-6-2T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2463 32463 12/1897 09/1959 Three Bridges 61.75 61.87
2464 32464 12/1897 02/1956 Horsham 58.17
2465 32465 04/1898 04/1955 Horsham 57
2467 32467 05/1898 04/1958 Brighton 59.92 59.96
2468 32468 05/1898 20/01/1963 Brighton 64.67 65.29
2469 32469 06/1898 10/1961 Three Bridges 63.33 63.38
2470 32470 06/1898 23/06/1962 Brighton 64 64.12
2471 32471 06/1898 09/1959 Bricklayers Arms 61.25 61.62
2472 32472 06/1898 30/06/1962 Nine Elms 64 64.12
2473 32473 06/1898 27/10/1962 Nine Elms 64.33 Prs Preserved
2474 32474 08/1898 05/1963 Brighton 64.75 64.87
2475 32475 10/1898 06/1961 Brighton 62.67 62.79
2476 32476 10/1898 04/1957 Nine Elms 58.5 58.62
2479 32479 12/1898 06/1963 Brighton 64.5 64.62
2480 32480 12/1898 11/1959 Brighton 60.92 60.96
2481 32481 12/1898 04/1958 Brighton 59.33 59.37
2482 32482 12/1898 11/1955 Brighton 56.92 56.95
2484 32484 05/1899 09/1960 Brighton 61.33 61.46
2485 32485 05/1899 12/1957 Brighton 58.58 58.71
2486 32486 05/1899 01/1959 Nine Elms 59.67 59.79
2487 32487 06/1899 23/12/1962 Nine Elms 63.5 64.21
2488 32488 06/1899 06/1957 Tonbridge 58 58.21
2490 32490 06/1899 12/1955 Guildford 56.5
2491 32491 09/1899 01/1961 Eastleigh 61.33 61.46
2492 32492 10/1899 05/1957 Nine Elms 57.58 57.70
2493 32493 11/1899 02/1958 Nine Elms 58.25 58.37
2494 32494 11/1899 09/1959 Brighton 59.83 59.87
2495 32495 11/1899 09/1960 Brighton 60.83 60.87
2496 32496 12/1899 11/1955 Brighton 55.92
2497 32497 05/1900 11/1959 Nine Elms 59.5 59.54
2498 32498 05/1900 11/11/1961 Nine Elms 61.5 61.71
2499 32499 06/1900 06/1957 Nine Elms 57 57.04
2500 32500 06/1900 27/01/1962 Nine Elms 61.58 61.63
2501 32501 06/1900 08/1955 Reading (S.R.) 55.17 55.45
2502 32502 06/1900 02/1958 Brighton 57.67 57.79
2503 32503 08/1900 14/04/1963 Brighton 62.67 62.87
2504 32504 09/1900 25/11/1961 Brighton 61.17 61.29
2505 32505 10/1900 03/1961 Nine Elms 60.42 60.62
2506 32506 10/1900 06/1961 Eastleigh 60.67 60.79
2507 32507 12/1900 04/1959 Brighton 58.33 58.54
2508 32508 12/1900 01/1960 Brighton 59.08 59.21
2509 32509 12/1900 31/03/1962 Brighton 61.25 61.37
2510 32510 12/1900 29/09/1962 Eastleigh 61.75 61.87
2511 32511 02/1901 10/1956 Horsham 55.67 55.70
2512 32512 02/1901 05/1961 Brighton 60.25 60.45
2513 32513 03/1901 01/1956 Brighton 54.83
2514 32514 03/1901 10/1956 Brighton 55.58 55.62
2515 32515 04/1901 05/1961 Brighton 60.08 60.29
2516 32516 04/1901 10/1955 Brighton 54.5 54.54
2517 32517 06/1901 06/1959 Tunbridge Wells West 58 58.04
2518 32518 06/1901 06/1955 Brighton 54
2519 32519 06/1901 09/1959 Brighton 58.25 58.62
2520 32520 06/1901 01/1957 Three Bridges 55.58 56.21
2556 32556 01/1901 09/1961 Brighton 60.67 60.79
2557 32557 09/1901 23/12/1962 Nine Elms 61.25 62.12
2558 32558 10/1901 11/1956 Eastleigh 55.08
2559 32559 10/1901 06/1960 Eastleigh 58.67 58.79
2560 32560 11/1901 08/1958 Nine Elms 56.75 56.79
2561 32561 11/1901 06/1956 Redhill 54.58
2562 32562 12/1901 08/1960 Brighton 58.67 58.87
2563 32563 12/1901 08/1961 Eastleigh 59.67 59.71
2564 32564 12/1901 09/1961 Three Bridges 59.75 59.87
2565 32565 05/1902 06/1961 Bricklayers Arms 59.08 59.29
2566 32566 06/1902 04/1959 Brighton 56.83 56.95
2577 32577 06/1903 10/1959 Brighton 56.33 56.62
2578 32578 06/1903 04/1961 Brighton 57.83 58.04
2579 32579 07/1903 11/1959 Eastleigh 56.33 56.46
2580 32580 07/1903 17/04/1962 Brighton 58.75 58.79
2581 32581 09/1903 17/04/1962 Brighton 58.58 58.62
2582 32582 09/1903 10/1956 Tunbridge Wells West 53.08