Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 90 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2235 Week
» 16492 Month
» 244376 Year
» 1465941 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "El Radials" Class 0-6-2T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2094 32094 11/1883 05/1955 Plymouth Friary 71.5 71.54
2095 32095 11/1883 24/11/1956 Plymouth Friary 73
2096 32096 12/1883 10/11/1956 Plymouth Friary 72.92 75.05
2124 32124 08/1878 31/01/1959 Exmouth Junction 80.42 80.63
2135 32135 01/1879 02/1959 Exmouth Junction 80.08 80.30
2608 32608 11/1876 11/05/1957 Barnstaple Junction 80.5 80.63
2610 32610 12/1874 04/1956 Barnstaple Junction 81.33 81.39
2695 32695 09/1876 04/1957 Exmouth Junction 80.58 80.63
2696 32696 10/1876 07/01/1956 Barnstaple Junction 79.25 80.30
2697 32697 09/1876 28/11/1959 Exmouth Junction 83.17 83.39