SR Maunsell "Q" Class 0-6-0
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
530 | 30530 | 01/1938 | 20/12/1964 | 26.92 | 27.35 | |||||
531 | 30531 | 06/1938 | 19/07/1964 | 26.08 | 26.52 | |||||
532 | 30532 | 06/1938 | 05/01/1964 | 25.58 | 26.52 | |||||
533 | 30533 | 07/1938 | 03/03/1963 | 24.67 | 24.85 | |||||
534 | 30534 | 09/1938 | 22/12/1962 | 24.25 | 25.68 | |||||
535 | 30535 | 09/1938 | 25/04/1965 | 26.58 | 27.35 | |||||
536 | 30536 | 10/1938 | 05/01/1964 | 25.25 | 25.77 | |||||
537 | 30537 | 10/1938 | 08/12/1962 | 24.17 | 25.60 | |||||
538 | 30538 | 11/1938 | 14/07/1963 | 24.67 | 26.02 | |||||
539 | 30539 | 12/1938 | Bournemouth | 13/01/1963 | 24.08 | 24.52 | ||||
540 | 30540 | 04/01/1939 | Bournemouth | 24/11/1962 | 23.83 | 25.38 | ||||
541 | 30541 | 23/01/1939 | Guildford | 29/11/1964 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | |||
542 | 30542 | 03/1939 | Guildford | 20/12/1964 | 25.75 | 26.19 | ||||
543 | 30543 | 29/03/1939 | Guildford | 20/12/1964 | 25.75 | 26.15 | ||||
544 | 30544 | 04/1939 | 05/01/1964 | 24.75 | 25.27 | |||||
545 | 30545 | 06/1939 | 18/04/1965 | 25.83 | 26.27 | |||||
546 | 30546 | 06/1939 | 10/05/1964 | 24.92 | Cut | R A Kings (Norwich) | 12/1964 | 25.52 | ||
547 | 30547 | 07/1939 | 05/01/1964 | 24.5 | 25.02 | |||||
548 | 30548 | 08/1939 | 21/03/1965 | 25.58 | 25.93 | |||||
549 | 30549 | 09/1939 | 21/07/1963 | 23.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1964 | 24.60 |