Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2809 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16215 Week
» 69231 Month
» 188758 Year
» 3215611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Adams "395" Class 0-6-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
3029
|
30564
|
11/1885 |
|
12/04/1958 |
|
72.42 |
|
|
|
72.46 |
3083
|
30565
|
11/1885 |
|
14/02/1953 |
|
67.25 |
|
|
|
68.04 |
3101
|
30566
|
12/1885 |
|
07/02/1959 |
|
73.17 |
|
|
|
73.38 |
3154
|
30567
|
03/1883 |
|
09/1959 |
|
76.5 |
|
|
|
76.64 |
3155
|
30568
|
03/1883 |
|
12/04/1958 |
|
75.08 |
|
|
|
75.13 |
3163
|
30569
|
05/1883 |
|
06/1956 |
|
73.08 |
|
|
|
|
3167
|
30570
|
05/1883 |
|
29/12/1956 |
|
73.58 |
|
|
|
73.81 |
3397
|
30571
|
12/1881 |
|
07/1953 |
|
71.58 |
|
|
|
71.96 |
3400
|
30572
|
01/1882 |
|
26/01/1957 |
|
75 |
|
|
|
75.21 |
3433
|
30573
|
04/1883 |
|
24/11/1956 |
|
73.58 |
|
|
|
73.80 |
3436
|
30574
|
04/1883 |
|
05/01/1957 |
|
73.75 |
|
|
|
73.96 |
3439
|
30575
|
05/1883 |
|
13/12/1958 |
|
75.58 |
|
|
|
75.72 |
3440
|
30576
|
05/1883 |
|
30/12/1950 |
|
67.58 |
|
|
|
67.72 |
3441
|
30577
|
05/1883 |
|
04/02/1956 |
|
72.75 |
|
|
|
72.80 |
3442
|
30578
|
05/1883 |
|
10/08/1957 |
|
74.25 |
|
|
|
74.47 |
3496
|
30579
|
10/1885 |
|
14/01/1956 |
|
70.25 |
|
|
|
70.30 |
3506
|
30580
|
12/1885 |
|
06/1957 |
|
71.5 |
|
|
|
71.55 |
3509
|
30581
|
12/1885 |
|
14/03/1953 |
|
67.25 |
|
|
|
67.46 |