SR Wainwright "C" Class 0-6-0
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 31004 | 07/1901 | 11/11/1961 | 60.33 | 60.38 | |||||
1018 | 31018 | 10/1900 | 10/01/1959 | 58.25 | 58.29 | |||||
1033 | 31033 | 10/1900 | 19/03/1960 | 59.42 | 59.45 | |||||
1037 | 31037 | 03/1901 | 25/02/1961 | 59.92 | 60.04 | |||||
1038 | 31038 | 07/1901 | 03/1954 | 52.67 | ||||||
1054 | 31054 | 03/1901 | 20/08/1960 | 59.42 | 59.63 | |||||
1059 | 31059 | 11/1902 | 22/02/1958 | 55.25 | 55.37 | |||||
1061 | 31061 | 07/1901 | 29/07/1961 | 60 | 60.29 | |||||
1063 | 31063 | 07/1900 | 04/1956 | 55.75 | 55.79 | |||||
1068 | 31068 | 01/1903 | 10/1961 | 58.75 | 58.87 | |||||
1071 | 31071 | 07/1901 | 09/1959 | 58.17 | 58.46 | |||||
1086 | 31086 | 09/1900 | 22/10/1960 | 60.08 | 60.21 | |||||
1090 | 31090 | 01/1903 | 08/08/1953 | 50.58 | 50.78 | |||||
1102 | 31102 | 09/1900 | 05/1960 | 59.67 | 59.79 | |||||
1112 | 31112 | 09/1900 | 05/05/1962 | 61.67 | 61.70 | |||||
1113 | 31113 | 03/1902 | 15/07/1961 | 59.33 | 59.46 | |||||
1150 | 31150 | 11/1902 | 21/10/1961 | 58.92 | 59.04 | |||||
1191 | 31191 | 07/1900 | 09/1959 | 59.17 | 59.29 | |||||
1218 | 31218 | 12/1900 | 05/05/1962 | 61.42 | 61.37 | |||||
1219 | 31219 | 12/1900 | 10/10/1959 | 58.83 | 58.87 | |||||
1221 | 31221 | 03/1901 | 15/08/1959 | 58.42 | 58.46 | |||||
1223 | 31223 | 03/1901 | 14/05/1960 | 59.17 | 59.21 | |||||
1225 | 31225 | 12/1900 | 04/06/1955 | 54.5 | ||||||
1227 | 31227 | 12/1900 | 24/10/1959 | 58.83 | 58.96 | |||||
1229 | 31229 | 01/1900 | 10/1961 | 61.75 | 61.87 | |||||
1234 | 31234 | 04/1901 | 08/08/1953 | 52.33 | ||||||
1242 | 31242 | 04/1902 | 30/09/1961 | 59.42 | 59.46 | |||||
1243 | 31243 | 04/1902 | 10/10/1959 | 57.5 | 57.54 | |||||
1244 | 31244 | 04/1902 | 21/10/1961 | 59.5 | 59.54 | |||||
1245 | 31245 | 12/1902 | 08/08/1959 | 56.67 | 56.96 | |||||
1252 | 31252 | 12/1902 | 07/1959 | 56.58 | 57.12 | |||||
1253 | 31253 | 01/1903 | 17/10/1959 | 56.75 | 56.95 | |||||
1255 | 31255 | 06/1900 | 30/09/1961 | 61.25 | 61.29 | |||||
1256 | 31256 | 06/1900 | 29/07/1961 | 61.08 | 61.21 | |||||
1257 | 31257 | 06/1900 | 08/1949 | 49.17 | ||||||
1260 | 31260 | 08/1904 | 05/1953 | 48.75 | ||||||
1267 | 31267 | 01/1904 | 30/06/1962 | 58.42 | 58.54 | |||||
1268 | 31268 | 02/1904 | 05/05/1962 | 58.25 | 58.28 | |||||
1270 | 31270 | 06/1904 | 20/06/1959 | 55 | 55.04 | |||||
1271 | 31271 | 12/1904 | 07/1963 | 58.58 | 63.04 | |||||
1272 | 31272 | 02/1904 | 08/08/1959 | 55.5 | 55.95 | |||||
1277 | 31277 | 02/1904 | 09/1955 | 51.58 | ||||||
1280 | 31280 | 02/1908 | 07/1963 | 55.42 | 55.87 | |||||
1287 | 31287 | 05/1908 | 08/10/1960 | 52.42 | 52.54 | |||||
1291 | 31291 | 02/1908 | 05/1953 | 45.25 | 45.28 | |||||
1293 | 31293 | 06/1908 | 05/05/1962 | 53.92 | 53.95 | |||||
1294 | 31294 | 06/1908 | 10/1955 | 47.33 | 47.36 | |||||
1297 | 31297 | 06/1908 | 12/09/1959 | 51.25 | 51.28 | |||||
1298 | 31298 | 03/1908 | 11/1960 | 52.67 | 52.87 | |||||
1317 | 31317 | 03/1908 | 24/02/1962 | 53.92 | 54.04 | |||||
1460 | 31460 | 10/1902 | 02/1949 | 46.33 | ||||||
1461 | 31461 | 12/1902 | 31/08/1958 | 55.67 | 55.70 | |||||
1480 | 31480 | 01/1904 | 08/07/1961 | 57.5 | 57.54 | |||||
1481 | 31481 | 04/1904 | 11/11/1961 | 57.58 | 57.71 | |||||
1486 | 31486 | 12/1902 | 05/1953 | 50.42 | 50.45 | |||||
1495 | 31495 | 06/1904 | 11/03/1961 | 56.75 | 56.87 | |||||
1498 | 31498 | 06/1904 | 29/07/1961 | 57.08 | 57.37 | |||||
1508 | 31508 | 07/1904 | 28/09/1957 | 53.17 | 53.29 | |||||
1510 | 31510 | 07/1904 | 30/06/1962 | 57.92 | 58.04 | |||||
1513 | 31513 | 06/1908 | 03/1955 | 46.75 | ||||||
1572 | 31572 | 09/1903 | 03/1954 | 50.5 | ||||||
1573 | 31573 | 09/1903 | 18/11/1961 | 58.17 | 58.29 | |||||
1575 | 31575 | 09/1903 | 22/07/1961 | 57.83 | 57.87 | |||||
1576 | 31576 | 05/1903 | 07/11/1959 | 56.5 | 56.54 | |||||
1578 | 31578 | 10/1903 | 24/06/1961 | 57.67 | 57.79 | |||||
1579 | 31579 | 10/1903 | 07/10/1961 | 58 | 58.04 | |||||
1580 | 31580 | 08/1903 | 08/08/1953 | 50 | ||||||
1581 | 31581 | 05/1903 | 12/03/1960 | 56.83 | 56.87 | |||||
1582 | 31582 | 06/1903 | 07/06/1958 | 55 | 55.04 | |||||
1583 | 31583 | 08/1903 | 07/1961 | 57.92 | 58.04 | |||||
1584 | 31584 | 06/1903 | 17/02/1962 | 58.67 | 58.79 | |||||
1585 | 31585 | 06/1903 | 14/02/1959 | 55.67 | 55.95 | |||||
1588 | 31588 | 03/1908 | 23/06/1962 | 54.25 | 54.37 | |||||
1589 | 31589 | 03/1908 | 11/11/1961 | 53.67 | 53.79 | |||||
1590 | 31590 | 07/1908 | 11/02/1961 | 52.58 | 52.70 | |||||
1592 | 31592 | 02/1902 | 07/1963 | 61.42 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
1593 | 31593 | 05/1902 | 08/02/1958 | 55.75 | 55.96 | |||||
1681 | 31681 | 06/1900 | 14/02/1959 | 58.67 | 58.79 | |||||
1682 | 31682 | 06/1900 | 21/10/1961 | 61.33 | 61.38 | |||||
1683 | 31683 | 06/1900 | 13/06/1959 | 59 | 59.04 | |||||
1684 | 31684 | 06/1900 | 21/10/1961 | 61.33 | 61.38 | |||||
1686 | 31686 | 07/1900 | 05/05/1962 | 61.83 | 61.87 | |||||
1687 | 31687 | 07/1900 | 02/04/1955 | 54.75 | ||||||
1688 | 31688 | 07/1900 | 20/02/1960 | 59.58 | 59.63 | |||||
1689 | 31689 | 07/1900 | 31/03/1962 | 61.67 | 61.79 | |||||
1690 | 31690 | 07/1900 | 23/06/1962 | 61.92 | 62.04 | |||||
1691 | 31691 | 07/1900 | 21/10/1961 | 61.25 | 61.29 | |||||
1692 | 31692 | 07/1900 | 23/04/1960 | 59.75 | 59.87 | |||||
1693 | 31693 | 07/1900 | 10/06/1961 | 60.92 | 60.96 | |||||
1694 | 31694 | 07/1900 | 25/03/1961 | 60.67 | 60.96 | |||||
1695 | 31695 | 07/1900 | 24/06/1961 | 60.92 | 61.04 | |||||
1711 | 31711 | 12/1900 | 05/01/1957 | 56.08 | 56.28 | |||||
1712 | 31712 | 12/1900 | 09/02/1957 | 56.17 | 56.37 | |||||
1713 | 31713 | 12/1900 | 02/04/1955 | 54.33 | ||||||
1714 | 31714 | 12/1900 | 07/1961 | 60.58 | 60.71 | |||||
1715 | 31715 | 12/1900 | 11/11/1961 | 60.92 | 60.96 | |||||
1716 | 31716 | 01/1901 | 21/10/1961 | 60.75 | 60.87 | |||||
1717 | 31717 | 01/1901 | 24/02/1962 | 61.08 | 61.20 | |||||
1718 | 31718 | 01/1901 | 24/09/1955 | 54.67 | 54.78 | |||||
1719 | 31719 | 01/1901 | 19/05/1962 | 61.33 | 61.45 | |||||
1720 | 31720 | 01/1901 | 21/10/1961 | 60.75 | 60.79 | |||||
1721 | 31721 | 01/1901 | 31/03/1962 | 61.17 | 61.29 | |||||
1722 | 31722 | 01/1901 | 05/05/1962 | 61.33 | 61.37 | |||||
1723 | 31723 | 01/1901 | 27/01/1962 | 61 | 61.13 | |||||
1724 | 31724 | 01/1901 | 05/05/1962 | 61.33 | 61.37 | |||||
1725 | 31725 | 01/1901 | 27/08/1960 | 59.58 | 60.71 |