SR Billinton "D3" Class 0-4-4T
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2364 | 32364 | 06/1892 | 10/1952 | 60.33 | ||||||
2365 | 32365 | 06/1892 | 13/12/1952 | 60.5 | 60.71 | |||||
2366 | 32366 | 07/1892 | 03/1949 | 56.67 | ||||||
2367 | 32367 | 07/1892 | 02/1949 | 56.58 | ||||||
2368 | 32368 | 08/1892 | 03/1953 | 60.58 | 60.79 | |||||
2370 | 32370 | 10/1892 | 09/1948 | 55.92 | 55.95 | |||||
2371 | 32371 | 12/1892 | 10/1948 | 55.83 | ||||||
2372 | 32372 | 12/1892 | 05/1953 | 60.42 | 60.45 | |||||
2373 | 32373 | 12/1892 | 11/1948 | 55.92 | ||||||
2374 | 32374 | 12/1892 | 02/1949 | 56.17 | ||||||
2376 | 32376 | 04/1893 | 05/1953 | 60.08 | 60.12 | |||||
2377 | 32377 | 05/1893 | 09/1948 | 55.33 | 55.37 | |||||
2378 | 32378 | 05/1893 | 07/08/1952 | 59.25 | ||||||
2379 | 32379 | 07/1893 | 12/1952 | 59.42 | 59.54 | |||||
2380 | 32380 | 07/1893 | 05/1953 | 59.83 | 59.87 | |||||
2383 | 32383 | 12/1893 | 12/1948 | 55 | ||||||
2384 | 32384 | 12/1893 | 11/1953 | 59.92 | ||||||
2385 | 32385 | 12/1893 | 18/07/1953 | 59.58 | 59.87 | |||||
2386 | 32386 | 12/1893 | 06/1952 | 58.5 | ||||||
2387 | 32387 | 04/1894 | 03/1949 | 54.92 | ||||||
2388 | 32388 | 05/1894 | 15/12/1951 | 57.58 | ||||||
2389 | 32389 | 05/1894 | 12/03/1949 | 54.83 | ||||||
2390 | 32390 | 05/1894 | 01/10/1955 | 61.42 | 61.54 | |||||
2391 | 32391 | 06/1894 | 12/1952 | 58.5 | 58.54 | |||||
2393 | 32393 | 04/1896 | 10/1951 | 55.5 | 55.62 | |||||
2394 | 32394 | 04/1896 | 12/1951 | 55.67 | ||||||
2395 | 32395 | 05/1896 | 30/06/1949 | Eastbourne | 53.08 | 53.20 | ||||
2398 | 32398 | 11/1896 | 12/03/1949 | 52.33 | 52.36 |