GWR Collett "8100" Class 2-6-2T
GWR (Orig.) | GWR | GWR (51xx) | GWR (81xx) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
99 | 3100 | 5100 | 8100 | 09/1903 | 26/09/1938 from 3100/5100 |
04/10/1962 | 59.08 | |||||||
3115 | 5115 | 8109 | 02/1905 | 30/11/1939 from 3100/5100 |
26/06/1965 | 60.33 | ||||||||
3116 | 5116 | 8107 | 02/1905 | 28/07/1939 from 3100/5100 |
18/05/1962 | 57.25 | ||||||||
3118 | 5118 | 8102 | 02/1905 | 15/06/1938 from 3100/5100 |
14/05/1964 | 59.25 | ||||||||
3120 | 5120 | 8106 | 03/1905 | 17/06/1939 from 3100/5100 |
28/12/1963 | 58.75 | ||||||||
3123 | 5123 | 8101 | 05/1905 | 25/03/1938 from 3100/5100 |
22/03/1961 | 55.83 | ||||||||
3124 | 5124 | 8104 | 05/1905 | 13/01/1939 from 3100/5100 |
26/12/1964 | 59.58 | ||||||||
3126 | 5126 | 8105 | 06/1905 | 01/04/1939 from 3100/5100 |
20/06/1957 | 52 | 418,327 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/09/1957 | 52.27 | |||
3133 | 5133 | 8108 | 01/1906 | 26/09/1939 from 3100/5100 |
29/11/1960 | 54.83 | ||||||||
3145 | 5145 | 8103 | 03/1906 | 01/11/1938 from 3100/5100 |
28/11/1963 | 57.67 |