Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
MSWJR/GWR "MSWJ" Class 2-4-0
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1334
|
01/01/1894 |
|
24/09/1952 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1335
|
01/01/1894 |
|
24/09/1952 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1336
|
01/01/1894 |
|
24/03/1954 |
|
60.17 |
506,867 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/05/1954 |
60.42 |