Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1471 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14877 Week
» 67893 Month
» 187420 Year
» 3214273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
BMJR/GWR Dunbar "Unclass" Class 0-6-2T
BMR |
GWR (1st) |
GWR (2nd) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
36
|
11
|
421
|
12/1909 |
|
17/01/1949 |
|
39.08 |
|
|
|
|
37
|
21
|
422
|
12/1909 |
|
12/06/1950 |
|
40.5 |
|
|
|
|
38
|
332
|
423
|
12/1909 |
|
09/12/1949 |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
40 |
|
|
|
|
39
|
504
|
424
|
01/1910 |
|
10/01/1948 |
|
38 |
|
|
|
|
40
|
698
|
425
|
03/1914 |
|
20/02/1951 |
|
36.92 |
|
|
|
|
41
|
888
|
426
|
03/1914 |
|
21/03/1950 |
|
36 |
|
|
|
|
42
|
1084
|
|
04/1914 |
|
14/11/1947 |
|
33.58 |
|
|
|
|
43
|
1113
|
428
|
04/1914 |
|
11/08/1950 |
|
36.33 |
|
|
|
|