Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 876 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1916 Week
» 12086 Month
» 289882 Year
» 1174263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "56xx" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
5600 12/1924 07/1962 Cardiff Canton 37.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1962 37.86
5601 12/1924 01/1965 Rhymney 40.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1965 40.44
5602 12/1924 09/1964 Cardiff East Dock 39.75 40.11
5603 12/1924 09/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 39.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 40.03
5604 01/1925 13/11/1962 Llanelly 37.83 38.77
5605 01/1925 05/1966 Croes Newydd 41.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 41.94
5606 02/1925 13/11/1965 Wadebridge 40.75 41.19
5607 02/1925 12/1963 Treherbert 38.83 38.94
5608 02/1925 08/1963 Treherbert 38.5 39.19
5609 02/1925 10/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 39.67 39.94
5610 02/1925 12/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 38.83 39.10
5611 02/1925 09/02/1963 Treherbert 38 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1963 38.44
5612 02/1925 04/1963 Llanelly 38.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1964 39.19
5613 02/1925 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 40.25 40.52
5614 02/1925 08/1963 Abercynon 38.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1964 38.94
5615 03/1925 07/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 38.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1964 38.86
5616 03/1925 09/1963 Swansea East Dock 38.5 39.19
5617 03/1925 09/1962 Abercynon 37.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 08/1963 38.44
5618 03/1925 03/1965 Rhymney 40 40.11
5619 03/1925 06/1964 Barry 39.25 Prs Preserved
5620 06/1925 07/1963 Aberdare 38.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 38.78
5621 06/1925 06/1965 Rhymney 40 40.36
5622 06/1925 06/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 38 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 38.53
5623 06/1925 02/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.67 38.94
5624 06/1925 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 39 39.11
5625 08/1925 10/1963 Cardiff East Dock 38.17 38.78
5626 08/1925 12/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 38.33 38.61
5627 08/1925 04/1963 Abercynon 37.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 38.36
5628 08/1925 09/02/1963 Swansea East Dock 37.5 38.19
5629 08/1925 05/1964 Abercynon 38.75 38.94
5630 08/1925 05/12/1962 Abercynon 37.33 38.02
5631 08/1925 09/1962 Swansea East Dock 37.08 38.19
5632 09/1925 09/1964 Abercynon 39 39.28
5633 09/1925 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 39.67 39.94
5634 09/1925 07/1964 Whitland 38.83 39.28
5635 09/1925 05/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.67 38.86
5636 09/1925 05/1962 Merthyr Tydfil 36.67 37.02
5637 09/1925 06/1964 Barry 38.75 Prs Preserved
5638 09/1925 02/1964 Pontypool Road 38.42 38.52
5639 09/1925 05/1962 Barry 36.67 37.02
5640 10/1925 06/1963 Leamington 37.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1963 38.19
5641 10/1925 09/1964 Abercynon 38.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.19
5642 10/1925 09/1962 Aberdare 36.92 36.94
5643 10/1925 07/1963 Barry 37.75 Prs Preserved
5644 11/1925 06/1963 Abercynon 37.58 37.77
5645 11/1925 06/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 37.58 38.28
5646 11/1925 09/1962 Treherbert 36.83 38.19
5647 11/1925 03/1964 Aberdare 38.33 38.61
5648 11/1925 09/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1965 39.28
5649 11/1925 03/1963 Aberdare 37.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1963 38.02
5650 01/1926 06/1963 Cardiff Canton 37.42 38.36
5651 01/1926 12/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.92 39.36
5652 01/1926 09/1962 Merthyr Tydfil 36.67 36.86
5653 01/1926 01/1963 Barry 37 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1963 37.44
5654 01/1926 12/1963 Cardiff East Dock 37.92 38.19
5655 01/1926 06/1965 Rhymney 39.42 39.78
5656 02/1926 02/1964 Swansea East Dock 38 38.44
5657 02/1926 07/1962 Abercynon 36.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1962 36.69
5658 02/1926 13/11/1965 Wadebridge 39.75 40.19
5659 02/1926 27/11/1965 Croes Newydd 39.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 40.03
5660 02/1926 10/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.67 39.10
5661 02/1926 07/1962 Merthyr Tydfil 36.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1962 36.61
5662 02/1926 11/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 38.75 39.03
5663 02/1926 08/1962 Merthyr Tydfil 36.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1962 36.69
5664 02/1926 08/1962 Barry 36.5 37.35
5665 06/1926 06/1965 Pontypool Road 39 39.19
5666 06/1926 07/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 37.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 37.53
5667 06/1926 07/1965 Croes Newydd 39.08 39.36
5668 06/1926 09/1964 Barry 38.25 Prs Preserved
5669 06/1926 09/1964 Cardiff East Dock 38.25 38.45
5670 08/1926 10/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 38.17 38.36
5671 08/1926 01/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 37.42 37.61
5672 08/1926 09/1963 Cardiff Canton 37.08 37.69
5673 08/1926 03/1965 Cardiff East Dock 38.58 38.78
5674 08/1926 04/1964 Treherbert 37.67 38.28
5675 09/1926 12/1964 Llanelly 38.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 04/1965 38.61
5676 09/1926 11/1965 Croes Newydd 39.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 39.69
5677 09/1926 11/1965 Croes Newydd 39.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 39.69
5678 09/1926 01/1964 Treherbert 37.33 37.69
5679 09/1926 07/1963 Wellington 36.83 37.02
5680 09/1926 12/1963 Aberdare 37.25 37.52
5681 10/1926 05/1965 Rhymney 38.58 38.86
5682 10/1926 05/1962 Abercynon 35.58 35.94
5683 10/1926 03/1964 Radyr 37.42 37.61
5684 10/1926 07/1965 Wadebridge 38.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 39.03
5685 01/1927 02/1964 Abercynon 37.08 37.27
5686 01/1927 03/1965 Rhymney 38.17 38.36
5687 01/1927 12/1963 Merthyr Tydfil 36.92 37.86
5688 01/1927 06/1965 Rhymney 38.42 38.78
5689 01/1927 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 38.33 38.61
5690 01/1927 08/1963 Aberbeeg 36.58 37.19
5691 01/1927 06/1965 Cardiff East Dock 38.42 38.78
5692 01/1927 07/1965 Cardiff East Dock 38.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 38.78
5693 01/1927 09/02/1963 Treherbert 36.08 37.02
5694 01/1927 11/1964 Cardiff East Dock 37.83 38.11
5695 01/1927 18/12/1962 Treherbert 35.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1963 36.61
5696 01/1927 05/1965 Rhymney 38.33 38.61
5697 01/1927 04/1963 Cardiff Canton 36.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 36.94
5698 01/1927 09/1962 Aberdare 35.67 35.94
5699 01/1927 11/1964 Cardiff East Dock 37.83 38.19
6600 08/1927 08/1962 Llantrisant 35 36.36
6601 08/1927 05/11/1962 Aberbeeg 35.25 35.36
6602 08/1927 10/1964 Llanelly 37.17 37.53
6603 09/1927 03/1964 Abercynon 36.5 36.78
6604 09/1927 10/1965 Croes Newydd 38.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 38.36
6605 09/1927 01/1964 Cardiff East Dock 36.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1964 36.61
6606 09/1927 01/1965 Cardiff East Dock 37.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1965 37.78
6607 09/1927 03/1963 Cardiff Canton 35.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1964 36.44
6608 09/1927 06/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 36.75 37.28
6609 09/1927 09/1963 Tyseley 36 36.19
6610 09/1927 02/02/1963 Croes Newydd 35.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1964 36.36
6611 09/1927 11/1965 Croes Newydd 38.17 38.69
6612 10/1927 05/1965 Rhymney 37.58 37.86
6613 10/1927 10/1965 Llanelly 38 38.36
6614 10/1927 06/1965 Neath (Court Sart) 37.67 38.03
6615 12/1927 05/1963 Croes Newydd 35.42 35.69
6616 12/1927 09/1962 Neath (Court Sart) 34.75 35.94
6617 12/1927 09/1962 Croes Newydd 34.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1964 36.19
6618 12/1927 11/1963 Wadebridge 35.92 36.11
6619 01/1928 03/1963 Barry 35.17 Prs Preserved
6620 01/1928 12/1963 Duffryn Yard 35.92 36.19
6621 01/1928 12/1964 Cardiff East Dock 36.92 37.19
6622 01/1928 12/1964 Pontypool Road 36.92 37.27
6623 01/1928 06/1963 Llanelly 35.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1964 36.02
6624 01/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 36.42 36.78
6625 01/1928 11/1965 Wadebridge 37.83 38.27
6626 01/1928 11/1965 Croes Newydd 37.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 04/1966 38.27
6627 02/1928 11/1963 Aberdare 35.75 35.94
6628 02/1928 05/1965 Neath (Court Sart) 37.25 37.52
6629 02/1928 22/10/1962 Cardiff Canton 34.67 35.52
6630 08/1928 09/1962 Hereford 34.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1963 34.85
6631 08/1928 09/1963 Oxley 35.08 35.44
6632 08/1928 09/1963 Croes Newydd 35.08 35.27
6633 08/1928 05/1965 Wadebridge 36.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 37.02
6634 08/1928 04/1964 Pontypool Road 35.67 Prs Preserved
6635 08/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.83 37.36
6636 08/1928 06/1963 Pontypool Road 34.83 35.77
6637 08/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.83 36.19
6638 09/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.75 36.27
6639 09/1928 10/1963 Penzance 35.08 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1964 35.69
6640 09/1928 09/1962 Oxley 34 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 35.19
6641 09/1928 09/1962 Neath (Court Sart) 34 35.19
6642 09/1928 09/02/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 34.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1963 34.94
6643 09/1928 08/1965 Llanelly 36.92 37.11
6644 09/1928 07/1965 Wadebridge 36.83 37.36
6645 09/1928 08/1962 Oxley 33.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1963 34.85
6646 09/1928 05/1964 Wadebridge 35.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 35.94
6647 09/1928 09/1962 Cardiff Canton 34 34.77
6648 09/1928 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.67 36.94
6649 09/1928 02/1965 Rhymney 36.42 36.52
6650 08/1928 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.75 37.02
6651 08/1928 10/1965 Croes Newydd 37.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 37.53
6652 08/1928 12/1963 Llanelly 35.33 35.86
6653 08/1928 12/1963 Llanelly 35.33 35.86
6654 08/1928 06/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.83 37.19
6655 08/1928 03/1965 Rhymney 36.58 36.77
6656 08/1928 09/1965 Stourbridge Junction 37.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1966 37.61
6657 08/1928 06/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.83 37.19
6658 09/1928 04/1965 Pontypool Road 36.58 37.02
6659 08/1928 10/1963 Cardiff East Dock 35.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 35.36
6660 09/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.75 36.27
6661 09/1928 06/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.75 37.11
6662 09/1928 04/1963 Swansea East Dock 34.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 35.27
6663 09/1928 06/1963 Leamington 34.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 35.19
6664 09/1928 12/1963 Aberdare 35.25 35.52
6665 09/1928 10/1965 Wadebridge 37.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 37.27
6666 09/1928 07/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 34.83 35.10
6667 09/1928 11/1965 Wadebridge 37.17 37.69
6668 09/1928 04/12/1965 Croes Newydd 37.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 37.44
6669 09/1928 05/12/1962 Cardiff Canton 34.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1963 34.85
6670 09/1928 10/1963 Barry 35.08 35.52
6671 09/1928 10/1965 Truro 37.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 37.69
6672 09/1928 07/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 37.11
6673 09/1928 03/1963 Aberdare 34.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1963 35.19
6674 09/1928 07/1963 Croes Newydd 34.83 35.44
6675 09/1928 06/1963 Pontypool Road 34.75 35.69
6676 09/1928 04/1963 Aberbeeg 34.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 35.52
6677 09/1928 09/02/1963 Pontypool Road 34.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1963 34.77
6678 09/1928 11/1964 Stourbridge Junction 36.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 36.52
6679 09/1928 09/1965 Stourbridge Junction 37 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1966 37.52
6680 10/1928 04/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.5 35.61
6681 10/1928 10/1965 Wadebridge 37 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 37.19
6682 10/1928 02/1964 Radyr 35.33 35.61
6683 10/1928 10/1965 Croes Newydd 37 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 37.36
6684 10/1928 11/1964 Cardiff East Dock 36.08 36.36
6685 10/1928 09/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 35.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 36.28
6686 10/1928 04/1964 Merthyr Tydfil 35.5
6687 10/1928 05/1962 Aberdare 33.58 33.94
6688 10/1928 04/1964 Treherbert 35.5 35.94
6689 10/1928 06/1965 Cardiff East Dock 36.67 37.02
6690 10/1928 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.67 36.19
6691 10/1928 06/1965 Llanelly 36.67 36.86
6692 10/1928 09/1965 Stourbridge Junction 36.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1966 37.44
6693 10/1928 09/02/1963 Pontypool Road 34.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1963 34.69
6694 10/1928 10/1963 Croes Newydd 35 35.36
6695 10/1928 07/1964 Cardiff East Dock 35.75 Prs Preserved
6696 10/1928 12/1963 Barry 35.17 35.52
6697 10/1928 05/1966 Croes Newydd 37.58 Prs Preserved
6698 10/1928 09/03/1963 Croes Newydd 34.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1964 35.36
6699 10/1928 12/1963 Cardiff East Dock 35.17 35.44