76 Bo+Bo
LNER (Orig) | LNER (1946) | BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | BR (AB/MU) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6701 | 6000 | 26000 | 19/02/1941 | 22/03/1970 | Reddish | 29.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 11/1972 | 31.76 | ||||
26001 | 76001 | 27/10/1950 | Gorton | 02/11/1980 | Reddish | 30.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 32.49 | ||||
26002 | 76002 | 27/10/1950 | Gorton | 25/06/1978 | Reddish | 27.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 33.33 | ||||
26003 | 76003 | 76036 | 15/11/1950 | Gorton | 20/07/1981 | Reddish | 30.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/06/1983 | 32.57 | |||
26004 | 76004 | 17/02/1951 | Gorton | 25/06/1978 | 27.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1984 | 32.93 | |||||
26005 | 13/01/1951 | 22/03/1970 | 19.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/1971 | 20.60 | |||||||
26006 | 76006 | 13/01/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 32.36 | ||||||
26007 | 76007 | 17/02/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 32.35 | ||||||
26008 | 76008 | 17/03/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 32.27 | ||||||
26009 | 76009 | 17/03/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1983 | 32.35 | ||||||
26010 | 76010 | 17/03/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 32.27 | ||||||
26011 | 76011 | 17/03/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 32.27 | ||||||
26012 | 76012 | 19/05/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1983 | 32.18 | ||||||
26013 | 76013 | 19/05/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 32.01 | ||||||
26014 | 76014 | 23/06/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 31.92 | ||||||
26015 | 76015 | 23/06/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 31.75 | ||||||
26016 | 76016 | 15/05/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 31.94 | ||||||
26017 | 18/05/1951 | 22/03/1970 | 18.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (at Reddish Depot) | 09/10/1971 | 20.41 | |||||||
26018 | 76018 | 76035 | 18/05/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 30.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 32.10 | |||||
26019 | 76019 | 22/09/1951 | 09/10/1971 | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 05/1972 | 20.66 | ||||||
26020 | 76020 | 20/10/1951 | 11/08/1977 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 72.28 | |||||||
26021 | 76021 | 20/10/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 29.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 31.51 | ||||||
26022 | 76022 | 20/10/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 29.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 31.67 | ||||||
26023 | 76023 | 20/10/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 29.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1983 | 31.84 | ||||||
26024 | 76024 | 20/10/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 29.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 31.67 | ||||||
26025 | 76025 | 19/01/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 31.26 | ||||||
26026 | 76026 | 19/01/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1983 | 31.51 | ||||||
26027 | 76027 | 16/02/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 31.18 | ||||||
26028 | 76028 | 16/01/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1983 | 31.52 | ||||||
26029 | 76029 | 28/12/1951 | 20/07/1981 | 29.58 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sheffield) | 04/1983 | 31.32 | ||||||
26030 | 76030 | 19/01/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 31.26 | ||||||
26031 | 19/01/1952 | 09/10/1971 | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 05/1972 | 20.33 | |||||||
26032 | 76032 | 19/04/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.25 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sheffield) | 04/1983 | 31.01 | ||||||
26033 | 76033 | 19/04/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.25 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sheffield) | 04/1983 | 31.01 | ||||||
26034 | 76034 | 19/04/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 30.92 | ||||||
26035 | 16/02/1952 | 22/03/1970 | 18.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (at Reddish Depot) | 11/1971 | 19.76 | |||||||
26036 | 76036 | 76003 | 16/02/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.42 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 05/1983 | 31.26 | |||||
26037 | 76037 | 16/02/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.42 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 05/1983 | 31.26 | ||||||
26038 | 76038 | 76050 | 19/04/1952 | 06/02/1977 | 24.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 31.85 | |||||
26039 | 76039 | 76048 | 19/04/1952 | 06/02/1977 | 24.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 31.85 | |||||
26040 | 76040 | 17/05/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.17 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 05/1983 | 31.01 | ||||||
26041 | 76041 | 17/05/1952 | 02/11/1980 | 28.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 30.85 | ||||||
26042 | 14/05/1952 | 22/03/1970 | 17.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (at Reddish Depot) | 11/1971 | 19.52 | |||||||
26043 | 76043 | 14/05/1952 | 25/06/1978 | 26.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 31.78 | ||||||
26044 | 76044 | 76031 | 19/06/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 29.08 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sheffield) | 02/1984 | 31.68 | |||||
26045 | 19/07/1952 | 28/11/1971 | Reddish | 19.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 04/1972 | 19.75 | ||||||
26046 | 76046 | 23/08/1952 | 02/11/1980 | 28.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 30.58 | ||||||
26047 | 76047 | 23/08/1952 | 02/11/1980 | 28.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 30.75 | ||||||
26048 | 76048 | 76039 | 18/10/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 28.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1983 | 30.68 | |||||
26049 | 76049 | 18/10/1952 | 02/11/1980 | 28.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 30.42 | ||||||
26050 | 76050 | 76038 | 16/11/1952 | 20/07/1981 | 28.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 30.51 | |||||
26051 | 76051 | 17/01/1953 | 20/07/1981 | 28.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1983 | 30.26 | ||||||
26052 | 76052 | 14/02/1953 | 25/06/1978 | 25.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 31.02 | ||||||
26053 | 76053 | 14/03/1953 | 02/11/1980 | 27.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1983 | 30.02 | ||||||
26054 | 76054 | 16/05/1953 | 20/07/1981 | 28.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1983 | 30.02 | ||||||
26055 | 76055 | 20/06/1953 | 06/02/1977 | 23.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1984 | 30.68 | ||||||
26056 | 76056 | 25/07/1953 | 25/06/1978 | 24.92 | Cut | C F Booth (at Reddish Depot) | 02/1983 | 29.58 | ||||||
26057 | 76057 | 10/09/1953 | 06/02/1977 | 23.42 | Cut | C F Booth (at Reddish Depot) | 02/1983 | 29.45 |