BR Swindon & Crewe 52 C-C
BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D1000 | 29/12/1961 | SW | Laira | 11/02/1974 | Laira | 12.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1974 | 12.55 | WESTERN ENTERPRISE |
D1001 | 12/02/1962 | SW | Laira | 04/10/1976 | Laira | 14.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 15.52 | WESTERN PATHFINDER |
D1002 | 19/03/1962 | SW | Laira | 29/01/1974 | Laira | 11.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/06/1974 | 12.24 | WESTERN EXPLORER |
D1003 | 14/04/1962 | SW | Laira | 05/01/1975 | Laira | 12.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1977 | 15.33 | WESTERN PIONEER |
D1004 | 12/05/1962 | SW | Laira | 01/08/1973 | Laira | 11.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 19/09/1974 | 12.36 | WESTERN CRUSADER |
D1005 | 18/06/1962 | SW | Laira | 16/11/1976 | Laira | 14.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/06/1977 | 15.01 | WESTERN VENTURER |
D1006 | 06/07/1962 | SW | Laira | 06/04/1975 | Laira | 12.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/03/1977 | 14.73 | WESTERN STALWART |
D1007 | 01/08/1962 | SW | Laira | 29/01/1974 | Laira | 11.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/02/1975 | 12.58 | WESTERN TALISMAN |
D1008 | 04/09/1962 | SW | Laira | 21/10/1974 | Laira | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/10/1975 | 13.11 | WESTERN HARRIER |
D1009 | 24/09/1962 | SW | Old Oak Common | 10/11/1976 | Laira | 14.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1978 | 16.19 | WESTERN INVADER |
D1010 | 15/10/1962 | SW | Old Oak Common | 28/02/1977 | Laira | 14.33 | Prs | Preserved | 61.25 | WESTERN CAMPAIGNER | |
D1011 | 27/10/1962 | SW | Old Oak Common | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 13 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1978 | 16.15 | WESTERN THUNDERER |
D1012 | 17/11/1962 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 02/11/1975 | Laira | 13 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1979 | 16.46 | WESTERN FIREBRAND |
D1013 | 13/12/1962 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 28/02/1977 | Laira | 14.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.08 | WESTERN RANGER | |
D1014 | 24/12/1962 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 06/08/1974 | Laira | 11.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/02/1975 | 12.15 | WESTERN LEVIATHAN |
D1015 | 21/01/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 13/12/1976 | Laira | 13.92 | Prs | Preserved | 60.98 | WESTERN CHAMPION | |
D1016 | 16/02/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 29/12/1975 | Laira | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.50 | WESTERN GLADIATOR |
D1017 | 15/03/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/08/1973 | Laira | 10.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/03/1975 | 12.00 | WESTERN WARRIOR |
D1018 | 02/04/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 04/06/1973 | Laira | 10.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 20/03/1974 | 10.97 | WESTERN BUCCANEER |
D1019 | 02/05/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 06/05/1973 | Laira | 10 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/10/1974 | 11.43 | WESTERN CHALLENGER |
D1020 | 21/05/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 04/06/1973 | Laira | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/04/1974 | 10.92 | WESTERN HERO |
D1021 | 17/06/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 10/08/1976 | Laira | 13.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/02/1979 | 15.71 | WESTERN CAVALIER |
D1022 | 16/07/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 18/01/1977 | Laira | 13.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1978 | 15.43 | WESTERN SENTINEL |
D1023 | 23/09/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 28/02/1977 | Laira | 13.42 | Prs | Preserved | 60.31 | WESTERN FUSILIER | |
D1024 | 01/10/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 18/11/1973 | Laira | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 14/08/1974 | 10.88 | WESTERN HUNTSMAN |
D1025 | 01/11/1963 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 11.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1979 | 15.22 | WESTERN GUARDSMAN |
D1026 | 24/12/1963 | SW | Old Oak Common | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 11.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/08/1976 | 12.63 | WESTERN CENTURION |
D1027 | 28/01/1964 | SW | Laira | 02/11/1975 | Laira | 11.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/06/1976 | 12.38 | WESTERN LANCER |
D1028 | 25/02/1964 | SW | Swindon | 06/10/1976 | Laira | 12.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/06/1979 | 15.35 | WESTERN HUSSAR |
D1029 | 20/04/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 18/11/1974 | Laira | 10.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/05/1975 | 11.11 | WESTERN LEGIONNAIRE |
D1030 | 05/12/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 19/04/1976 | Laira | 12.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 22/09/1976 | 12.81 | WESTERN MUSKETEER |
D1031 | 20/12/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 01/02/1975 | Laira | 11.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/10/1976 | 12.81 | WESTERN RIFLEMAN |
D1032 | 31/12/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 06/05/1973 | Laira | 9.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/12/1974 | 10.94 | WESTERN MARKSMAN |
D1033 | 17/01/1964 | CW | Old Oak Common | 17/09/1976 | Laira | 12.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1979 | 15.29 | WESTERN TROOPER |
D1034 | 15/04/1964 | CW | Old Oak Common | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 11.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 20/05/1977 | 13.10 | WESTERN DRAGOON |
D1035 | 27/07/1962 | CW | Laira | 05/01/1975 | Laira | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1976 | 14.19 | WESTERN YEOMAN |
D1036 | 29/08/1962 | CW | Laira | 01/11/1976 | Laira | 14.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/02/1977 | 14.50 | WESTERN EMPEROR |
D1037 | 31/08/1962 | CW | Laira | 24/05/1976 | Laira | 13.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/02/1977 | 14.47 | WESTERN EMPRESS |
D1038 | 07/09/1962 | CW | Laira | 08/10/1973 | Laira | 11.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 20/11/1974 | 12.21 | WESTERN SOVEREIGN |
D1039 | 07/09/1962 | CW | Laira | 21/07/1973 | Laira | 10.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/09/1974 | 12.00 | WESTERN KING |
D1040 | 20/09/1962 | CW | Old Oak Common | 29/02/1976 | Laira | 13.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/08/1976 | 13.90 | WESTERN QUEEN |
D1041 | 10/10/1962 | CW | Old Oak Common | 23/02/1977 | Laira | 14.33 | Prs | Preserved | 61.26 | WESTERN PRINCE | |
D1042 | 19/10/1962 | CW | Old Oak Common | 21/07/1973 | Laira | 10.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/05/1974 | 11.59 | WESTERN PRINCESS |
D1043 | 26/10/1962 | CW | Old Oak Common | 04/04/1976 | Laira | 13.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/02/1977 | 14.30 | WESTERN DUKE |
D1044 | 12/11/1962 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 01/02/1975 | Laira | 12.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/09/1975 | 12.84 | WESTERN DUCHESS |
D1045 | 16/11/1962 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 16/12/1974 | Laira | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/08/1975 | 12.77 | WESTERN VISCOUNT |
D1046 | 24/12/1962 | CW | Bristol Bath Road | 11/12/1975 | Laira | 13 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/11/1976 | 13.89 | WESTERN MARQUIS |
D1047 | 04/02/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 29/02/1976 | Laira | 13 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/09/1976 | 13.61 | WESTERN LORD |
D1048 | 15/12/1962 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 28/02/1977 | Laira | 14.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.08 | WESTERN LADY | |
D1049 | 14/12/1962 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 26/04/1976 | Laira | 13.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/02/1977 | 14.15 | WESTERN MONARCH |
D1050 | 01/01/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 06/04/1975 | Laira | 12.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/04/1976 | 13.28 | WESTERN RULER |
D1051 | 21/01/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 02/09/1976 | Laira | 13.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.58 | WESTERN AMBASSADOR |
D1052 | 04/02/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 12.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 22/04/1976 | 13.22 | WESTERN VICEROY |
D1053 | 11/02/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 15/11/1976 | Laira | 13.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.52 | WESTERN PATRIARCH |
D1054 | 02/03/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 25/11/1976 | Laira | 13.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1977 | 14.21 | WESTERN GOVERNOR |
D1055 | 02/03/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 05/01/1976 | Laira | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/06/1976 | 13.30 | WESTERN ADVOCATE |
D1056 | 08/03/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 15/12/1976 | Laira | 13.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1979 | 16.20 | WESTERN SULTAN |
D1057 | 06/04/1963 | CW | Newton Abbot | 02/05/1976 | Laira | 13.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/06/1977 | 14.24 | WESTERN CHIEFTAIN |
D1058 | 25/03/1963 | CW | Bristol Bath Road | 24/01/1977 | Laira | 13.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/06/1979 | 16.28 | WESTERN NOBLEMAN |
D1059 | 06/04/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/07/1976 | 13.30 | WESTERN EMPIRE |
D1060 | 11/04/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 18/11/1973 | Laira | 10.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/07/1974 | 11.24 | WESTERN DOMINION |
D1061 | 19/04/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 21/10/1974 | Laira | 11.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/08/1975 | 12.31 | WESTERN ENVOY |
D1062 | 06/05/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 22/08/1974 | Laira | 11.25 | Prs | Preserved | 60.69 | WESTERN COURIER | |
D1063 | 17/05/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 04/04/1976 | Laira | 12.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.26 | WESTERN MONITOR |
D1064 | 24/05/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 11/12/1975 | Laira | 12.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/06/1977 | 14.11 | WESTERN REGENT |
D1065 | 18/06/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 04/11/1976 | Laira | 13.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.17 | WESTERN CONSORT |
D1066 | 14/06/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 12/11/1974 | Laira | 11.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1975 | 11.94 | WESTERN PREFECT |
D1067 | 18/07/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 24/01/1976 | Laira | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/09/1976 | 13.18 | WESTERN DRUID |
D1068 | 12/07/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 12/10/1976 | Laira | 13.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1977 | 14.10 | WESTERN RELIANCE |
D1069 | 21/10/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 06/10/1975 | Laira | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/02/1977 | 13.30 | WESTERN VANGUARD |
D1070 | 28/10/1963 | CW | Cardiff Canton | 30/12/1976 | Laira | 13.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1979 | 15.56 | WESTERN GAUNTLET |
D1071 | 07/11/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 07/12/1976 | Laira | 13.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1978 | 15.07 | WESTERN RENOWN |
D1072 | 07/11/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 02/11/1976 | Laira | 13 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/04/1977 | 13.42 | WESTERN GLORY |
D1073 | 03/12/1963 | CW | Old Oak Common | 29/08/1974 | Laira | 10.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1975 | 11.71 | WESTERN BULWARK |