Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1252 Today
» 1313 Yesterday
» 9023 Week
» 37414 Month
» 162891 Year
» 239478 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

82 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E3046 04/05/1960 17/01/1971 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/06/1971 11.08
E3047 82001 11/07/1960 17/07/1983 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1985 24.65
E3048 82002 03/08/1960 19/07/1983 22.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1984 24.34
E3049 82003 15/08/1960 17/07/1983 22.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 25/06/1993 32.88
E3050 82004 23/09/1960 02/10/1983 23.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1984 24.04
E3051 82005 28/10/1960 13/10/1987 27 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/07/1993 32.70
E3052 82006 02/12/1960 17/07/1983 22.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1984 23.84
E3053 82007 19/01/1962 17/07/1983 21.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1984 22.71
E3054 82008 30/10/1961 01/12/1987 26.17 Prs Preserved 55.46
E3055 07/04/1962 30/09/1969 7.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1970 8.32