Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 150 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 4539 Week
» 18847 Month
» 281824 Year
» 358411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

82 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
05/11/1960 Reallocation 3046     LMW London Midland - Western Lines  
30/09/1969 Condemned 3055       COND  
17/01/1971 Condemned 3046 LMW London Midland - Western Lines   COND  
21/10/1972 Reallocation 3052     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 82006 GS Glasgow Shields Road LG Longsight (Electric)  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 82007     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 82007 GS Glasgow Shields Road LG Longsight (Electric)  
17/07/1983 Condemned 82001       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 82003       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 82006 LG Longsight (Electric)   COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 82007 LG Longsight (Electric)   COND  
19/07/1983 Condemned 82002       COND  
02/10/1983 Condemned 82004       COND  
13/10/1987 Condemned 82005       COND  
01/12/1987 Condemned 82008       COND