Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 150 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 4539 Week
» 18847 Month
» 281824 Year
» 358411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

82 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
  3046   04/05/1960 LMW
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Withdrawn
05/11/1960
17/01/1971
17/01/1971
  3047 82001 11/07/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
  3048 82002 03/08/1960 W Withdrawn 19/07/1983 19/07/1983
  3049 82003 15/08/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
  3050 82004 23/09/1960 W Withdrawn 02/10/1983 02/10/1983
  3051 82005 28/10/1960 W Withdrawn 13/10/1987 13/10/1987
  3052 82006 02/12/1960 GS
LG
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Longsight (Electric)
Withdrawn
21/10/1972
26/01/1974
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
  3053 82007 19/01/1962 GS
LG
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Longsight (Electric)
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
11/05/1974
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
  3054 82008 30/10/1961 W Withdrawn 01/12/1987 01/12/1987
  3055   07/04/1962 W Withdrawn 30/09/1969 30/09/1969