09 0-6-0
Old Number | Company | Old Num Type | New Number | Company | Subtype | New Num Type | Date | Notes | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D3934 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08766 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 25/10/1973 | |
D4001 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08833 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 11/1973 | ||
D3927 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08759 | BR | Tops | TOPS | on | 02/11/1973 | |
D3665 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09001 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D3666 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09002 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D3668 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09004 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D3720 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09009 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D4013 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08845 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 12/1973 | ||
D4099 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09011 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D4104 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09016 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D4107 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09019 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D4110 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09022 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 12/1973 | |
D3667 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09003 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D3670 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09006 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D3671 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09007 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D3719 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09008 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D3721 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09010 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4100 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09012 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4102 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09014 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4103 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09015 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4105 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09017 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4106 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09018 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D4109 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09021 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 01/1974 | |
D3669 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09005 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D3917 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08749 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 02/1974 | ||
D4003 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08835 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 02/1974 | ||
D4101 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09013 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D4108 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09020 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D4111 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09023 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D4112 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09024 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D4113 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09025 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 02/1974 | |
D3536 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08421 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 03/1974 | ||
D4000 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08832 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 03/1974 | ||
D3900 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08732 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 04/1974 | ||
D4114 | BR | Pre TOPS | 09026 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | m/e | 04/1974 | |
D3949 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08781 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 05/1974 | ||
D3787 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08620 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 07/1974 | ||
D3884 | BR | Pre TOPS | 08717 | BR | Tops | TOPS | 09/1974 | ||
09017 | BR | TOPS | 97806 | BR | Dept | TOPS | m/e | 07/1987 | |
08833 | BR | TOPS | 09101 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 17/08/1992 | |
08832 | BR | TOPS | 09102 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 22/09/1992 | |
08421 | BR | TOPS | 09201 | BR | 09/2 | TOPS | on | 22/09/1992 | |
08781 | BR | TOPS | 09203 | BR | 09/2 | TOPS | on | 02/10/1992 | |
08717 | BR | TOPS | 09204 | BR | 09/2 | TOPS | on | 23/10/1992 | |
08732 | BR | TOPS | 09202 | BR | 09/2 | TOPS | on | 24/11/1992 | |
08620 | BR | TOPS | 09205 | BR | 09/2 | TOPS | on | 10/12/1992 | |
08766 | BR | TOPS | 09103 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 05/01/1993 | |
08749 | BR | TOPS | 09104 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 05/01/1993 | |
08835 | BR | TOPS | 09105 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 15/03/1993 | |
08759 | BR | TOPS | 09106 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 09/06/1993 | |
08845 | BR | TOPS | 09107 | BR | 09/1 | TOPS | on | 23/07/1993 | |
97806 | BR | TOPS | 09017 | BR | 09/0 | TOPS | on | 18/06/1998 |