Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1249 Today
» 1313 Yesterday
» 9020 Week
» 37411 Month
» 162888 Year
» 239475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

09 0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D3665 09001 02/02/1959 DA Eastleigh Prs Preserved 58.20
D3666 09002 03/02/1959 DA Eastleigh 25/09/1992 33.58 Prs Preserved 58.20
D3667 09003 19/02/1959 DA Eastleigh 58.16
D3668 09004 17/02/1959 DA Eastleigh 31/07/2007 48.42 Prs Preserved 58.16
D3669 09005 19/02/1959 DA Norwood Junction Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 58.16
D3670 09006 25/03/1959 DA Ashford 58.06
D3671 09007 26/03/1959 DA Hither Green Prs Preserved 58.06
D3719 09008 13/04/1959 DA Hither Green 58.01
D3720 09009 15/04/1959 DA Hither Green 58.01
D3721 09010 17/04/1959 DA Hither Green Prs Preserved 58.00
D4099 09011 19/09/1961 HO Hither Green 55.57
D4100 09012 26/09/1961 HO Ashford 55.55
D4101 09013 03/10/1961 HO Ashford Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 55.53
D4102 09014 12/10/1961 HO Norwood Junction 55.51
D4103 09015 26/10/1961 HO Norwood Junction Prs Preserved 55.47
D4104 09016 26/10/1961 HO Norwood Junction Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 55.47
D4105 09017 07/11/1961 HO Chester (MR) 55.44
D4106 09018 13/11/1961 HO Carlisle Kingmoor 55.42
D4107 09019 16/11/1961 HO Carlisle Upperby 55.41
D4108 09020 23/11/1961 HO Stoke 55.39
D4109 09021 29/11/1961 HO Stoke 31/12/2007 46.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/07/2008 46.70
D4110 09022 08/12/1961 HO Stoke 55.35
D4111 09023 15/12/1961 HO Nuneaton 55.33
D4112 09024 22/12/1961 HO Nuneaton 55.32
D4113 09025 04/01/1962 HO Longsight 31/08/2005 43.58 Prs Preserved 55.28
D4114 09026 21/01/1962 HO Lostock Hall 01/10/2005 43.75 Prs Preserved 55.23