Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 831 Today
» 1022 Yesterday
» 831 Week
» 26613 Month
» 224130 Year
» 300717 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

09 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/02/1959 To Service 3665   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
03/02/1959 To Service 3666   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
17/02/1959 To Service 3668   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
19/02/1959 To Service 3667   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
19/02/1959 To Service 3669   NEW 75C Norwood Junction  
25/03/1959 To Service 3670   NEW 73F Ashford  
26/03/1959 To Service 3671   NEW 73C Hither Green  
13/04/1959 To Service 3719   NEW 73C Hither Green  
15/04/1959 To Service 3720   NEW 73C Hither Green  
17/04/1959 To Service 3721   NEW 73C Hither Green  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 3670 73F Ashford 73E Faversham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 3671 73C Hither Green 73E Faversham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 3719 73C Hither Green 73E Faversham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 3720 73C Hither Green 73E Faversham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 3721 73C Hither Green 73E Faversham  
22/10/1959 Reallocation 3670 73E Faversham 73C Hither Green  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 3668 71A Eastleigh 75C Norwood Junction  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 3670 73C Hither Green 73E Faversham  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 3720 73E Faversham 75C Norwood Junction  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 3670 73E Faversham 73E Faversham  
19/09/1961 To Service 4099   NEW 73C Hither Green  
26/09/1961 To Service 4100   NEW 73F Ashford  
03/10/1961 To Service 4101   NEW 73F Ashford  
12/10/1961 To Service 4102   NEW 75C Norwood Junction  
26/10/1961 To Service 4103   NEW 75C Norwood Junction  
26/10/1961 To Service 4104   NEW 75C Norwood Junction  
07/11/1961 To Service 4105   NEW 6A Chester (MR)  
13/11/1961 To Service 4106   NEW 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
16/11/1961 To Service 4107   NEW 12B Carlisle Upperby  
23/11/1961 To Service 4108   NEW 5D Stoke  
29/11/1961 To Service 4109   NEW 5D Stoke  
08/12/1961 To Service 4110   NEW 5D Stoke  
15/12/1961 To Service 4111   NEW 2B Nuneaton  
22/12/1961 To Service 4112   NEW 2B Nuneaton  
04/01/1962 To Service 4113   NEW 9A Longsight  
21/01/1962 To Service 4114   NEW 24C Lostock Hall  
05/03/1962 Reallocation 4099 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 4102 75C Norwood Junction 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
30/07/1962 Reallocation 4103 75C Norwood Junction 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 3665 71A Eastleigh 73C Hither Green  
20/04/1963 Reallocation 4106 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 2A Rugby  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 4107 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 4111 2B Nuneaton 1F Rugby  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 4112 2B Nuneaton 1F Rugby  
09/12/1963 Reallocation 3719 73E Faversham 73C Hither Green  
09/12/1963 Reallocation 3721 73E Faversham 73C Hither Green  
09/12/1963 Reallocation 4099 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 73C Hither Green  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 3668 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
27/01/1964 Reallocation 3670 73E Faversham 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
27/01/1964 Reallocation 3671 73E Faversham 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 3666 71A Eastleigh 75C Norwood Junction  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 3667 71A Eastleigh 75C Norwood Junction  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 4103 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 73C Hither Green  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 4111 1F Rugby 1E Bletchley  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 4112 1F Rugby 1A Willesden  
13/02/1965 Reallocation 4111 1E Bletchley 1G Woodford Halse  
06/03/1965 Reallocation 4111 1G Woodford Halse 1F Rugby  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 4111 1F Rugby 5D Stoke  
05/07/1965 Reallocation 3669 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
10/01/1966 Reallocation 3665 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 4108 5D Stoke 5A Crewe Diesel  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 4100 73F Ashford 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 4109 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 4110 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 4111 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
05/11/1966 Reallocation 4112 1A Willesden 5A Crewe Diesel  
09/07/1967 Reallocation 3665 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 73C Hither Green  
09/07/1967 Reallocation 3670 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 73C Hither Green  
09/07/1967 Reallocation 4100 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 70B Feltham  
09/07/1967 Reallocation 4101 73F Ashford 70B Feltham  
09/07/1967 Reallocation 4102 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 70B Feltham  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 4109 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe Diesel  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 4110 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe Diesel  
25/11/1967 Reallocation 4111 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe Diesel  
29/01/1968 Reallocation 4101 70B Feltham 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
08/04/1968 Reallocation 3668 75A Brighton 73C Hither Green  
08/04/1968 Reallocation 4103 73C Hither Green 75A Brighton  
09/07/1968 Reallocation 4103 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
20/07/1968 Reallocation 4106 2A Rugby 5A Crewe Diesel  
29/07/1968 Reallocation 4104 75C Norwood Junction 70B Feltham  
10/08/1968 Reallocation 4106 5A Crewe Diesel 16A Toton  
21/09/1968 Reallocation 4113 9A Longsight 8J Allerton  
23/09/1968 Reallocation 4105 6A Chester (MR) 70B Feltham  
23/09/1968 Reallocation 4106 16A Toton 75C Selhurst  
30/09/1968 Reallocation 3671 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 73C Hither Green  
30/09/1968 Reallocation 4099 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
30/09/1968 Reallocation 4107 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 73C Hither Green  
16/11/1968 Reallocation 4112 5A Crewe Diesel 6A Chester (MR)  
07/12/1968 Reallocation 4109 5A Crewe Diesel 91S To Southern Region  
07/12/1968 Reallocation 4112 6A Chester (MR) 5A Crewe Diesel  
09/12/1968 Reallocation 4109 91S To Southern Region 75C Selhurst  
14/12/1968 Reallocation 4114 24C Lostock Hall 5A Crewe Diesel  
01/01/1969 Reallocation 4114 5A Crewe Diesel 70B Feltham  
04/01/1969 Reallocation 4112 5A Crewe Diesel 8J Allerton  
04/01/1969 Reallocation 4114 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
01/02/1969 Reallocation 4108 5A Crewe Diesel 91S To Southern Region  
10/02/1969 Reallocation 4106 75C Selhurst 70B Feltham  
10/02/1969 Reallocation 4108 91S To Southern Region 70D Eastleigh  
05/03/1969 Reallocation 4106 70B Feltham 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
26/04/1969 Reallocation 4111 5A Crewe Diesel 70B Feltham  
28/04/1969 Reallocation 4111 70B Feltham 70D Eastleigh  
03/06/1969 Reallocation 4107 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
03/06/1969 Reallocation 4108 70D Eastleigh 70B Feltham  
03/06/1969 Reallocation 4110 5A Crewe Diesel 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
21/06/1969 Reallocation 4110 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 91S To Southern Region  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4100 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4102 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4103 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4104 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4105 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4108 70B Feltham 75C Selhurst  
22/07/1970 Reallocation 4111 70D Eastleigh 75C Selhurst  
15/09/1970 Reallocation 3666 75C Norwood Junction 73C Hither Green  
30/09/1971 Reallocation 3669 75A Brighton 75C Selhurst  
30/04/1972 Reallocation 3719 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
28/01/1974 Reallocation 09001 73C Hither Green SU Selhurst  
28/01/1974 Reallocation 09002 73C Hither Green SU Selhurst  
13/07/1974 Reallocation 09025 8J Allerton BR Bristol Bath Road  
20/07/1974 Reallocation 09024 8J Allerton BR Bristol Bath Road  
31/01/1976 Reallocation 09024 BR Bristol Bath Road EH Eastleigh  
31/01/1976 Reallocation 09025 BR Bristol Bath Road EH Eastleigh  
21/02/1976 Reallocation 09024 EH Eastleigh 91S To Southern Region  
21/02/1976 Reallocation 09025 EH Eastleigh 91S To Southern Region  
31/10/1976 Reallocation 09024 91S To Southern Region BM Bournemouth  
31/10/1976 Reallocation 09025 91S To Southern Region BM Bournemouth  
31/10/1976 Reallocation 09026 75C Selhurst BM Bournemouth  
31/03/1979 Reallocation 09023 75C Selhurst AF Ashford Chart Leacon  
29/05/1988 Reallocation 09008 73F Ashford Chart Leacon CF Cardiff Canton  
29/05/1988 Reallocation 09013 73F Ashford Chart Leacon CF Cardiff Canton  
25/09/1992 Condemned 09002 SU Selhurst   COND  
31/08/2005 Condemned 09025 BM Bournemouth   COND  
01/10/2005 Condemned 09026 BM Bournemouth   COND  
31/07/2007 Condemned 09004 73C Hither Green   COND  
31/12/2007 Condemned 09021 75C Selhurst   COND