Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 150 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 4539 Week
» 18847 Month
» 281824 Year
» 358411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

09 0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D3665 09001 02/02/1959 71A
73C
73FSub
73C
SU
Eastleigh (New)
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
Selhurst
02/02/1959
24/09/1962
10/01/1966
09/07/1967
28/01/1974
D3666 09002 03/02/1959 71A
75C
73C
SU
W
Eastleigh (New)
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Selhurst
Withdrawn
03/02/1959
20/07/1964
15/09/1970
28/01/1974
25/09/1992
25/09/1992
D3667 09003 19/02/1959 71A
75C
Eastleigh (New)
Norwood Junction
19/02/1959
20/07/1964
D3668 09004 17/02/1959 71A
75C
75A
73C
W
Eastleigh (New)
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Hither Green
Withdrawn
17/02/1959
26/11/1959
06/01/1964
08/04/1968
31/07/2007
31/07/2007
D3669 09005 19/02/1959 75C
75A
75C
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Selhurst
19/02/1959
05/07/1965
30/09/1971
D3670 09006 25/03/1959 73F
73E
73C
73E
73E
73FSub
73C
Ashford (New)
Faversham
Hither Green
Faversham
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
25/03/1959
14/06/1959
22/10/1959
26/11/1959
31/12/1959
27/01/1964
09/07/1967
D3671 09007 26/03/1959 73C
73E
73FSub
73C
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
26/03/1959
14/06/1959
27/01/1964
30/09/1968
D3719 09008 13/04/1959 73C
73E
73C
73F
CF
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Cardiff Canton
13/04/1959
14/06/1959
09/12/1963
30/04/1972
29/05/1988
D3720 09009 15/04/1959 73C
73E
75C
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Norwood Junction
15/04/1959
14/06/1959
26/11/1959
D3721 09010 17/04/1959 73C
73E
73C
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Hither Green
17/04/1959
14/06/1959
09/12/1963
D4099 09011 19/09/1961 73C
73FSub
73C
73F
Hither Green (New)
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
19/09/1961
05/03/1962
09/12/1963
30/09/1968
D4100 09012 26/09/1961 73F
73FSub
70B
75C
Ashford (New)
Ashford Chart Leacon
Feltham
Selhurst
26/09/1961
07/02/1966
09/07/1967
22/07/1970
D4101 09013 03/10/1961 73F
70B
73F
CF
Ashford (New)
Feltham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Cardiff Canton
03/10/1961
09/07/1967
29/01/1968
29/05/1988
D4102 09014 12/10/1961 75C
73FSub
70B
75C
Norwood Junction (New)
Ashford Chart Leacon
Feltham
Selhurst
12/10/1961
02/07/1962
09/07/1967
22/07/1970
D4103 09015 26/10/1961 75C
73FSub
73C
75A
70B
75C
Norwood Junction (New)
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
Brighton
Feltham
Selhurst
26/10/1961
30/07/1962
12/10/1964
08/04/1968
09/07/1968
22/07/1970
D4104 09016 26/10/1961 75C
70B
75C
Norwood Junction (New)
Feltham
Selhurst
26/10/1961
29/07/1968
22/07/1970
D4105 09017 07/11/1961 6A
70B
75C
Chester (MR) (New)
Feltham
Selhurst
07/11/1961
23/09/1968
22/07/1970
D4106 09018 13/11/1961 12A
2A
5A
16A
75C
70B
73F
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Rugby
Crewe Diesel
Toton
Selhurst
Feltham
Ashford Chart Leacon
13/11/1961
20/04/1963
20/07/1968
10/08/1968
23/09/1968
10/02/1969
05/03/1969
D4107 09019 16/11/1961 12B
12A
73C
73F
Carlisle Upperby (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
16/11/1961
22/06/1963
30/09/1968
03/06/1969
D4108 09020 23/11/1961 5D
5A
91S
70D
70B
75C
Stoke (New)
Crewe Diesel
To Southern Region
Eastleigh
Feltham
Selhurst
23/11/1961
05/02/1966
01/02/1969
10/02/1969
03/06/1969
22/07/1970
D4109 09021 29/11/1961 5D
5B
5A
91S
75C
W
Stoke (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
To Southern Region
Selhurst
Withdrawn
29/11/1961
23/04/1966
25/11/1967
07/12/1968
09/12/1968
31/12/2007
31/12/2007
D4110 09022 08/12/1961 5D
5B
5A
73F
91S
Stoke (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Ashford Chart Leacon
To Southern Region
08/12/1961
23/04/1966
25/11/1967
03/06/1969
21/06/1969
D4111 09023 15/12/1961 2B
1F
1E
1G
1F
5D
5B
5A
70B
70D
75C
AF
Nuneaton (New)
Rugby
Bletchley
Woodford Halse
Rugby
Stoke
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Feltham
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Ashford Chart Leacon
15/12/1961
14/09/1963
12/12/1964
13/02/1965
06/03/1965
19/06/1965
23/04/1966
25/11/1967
26/04/1969
28/04/1969
22/07/1970
31/03/1979
D4112 09024 22/12/1961 2B
1F
1A
5A
6A
5A
8J
BR
EH
91S
BM
Nuneaton (New)
Rugby
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
Chester (MR)
Crewe Diesel
Allerton
Bristol Bath Road
Eastleigh
To Southern Region
Bournemouth
22/12/1961
14/09/1963
12/12/1964
05/11/1966
16/11/1968
07/12/1968
04/01/1969
20/07/1974
31/01/1976
21/02/1976
31/10/1976
D4113 09025 04/01/1962 9A
8J
BR
EH
91S
BM
W
Longsight (New)
Allerton
Bristol Bath Road
Eastleigh
To Southern Region
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
04/01/1962
21/09/1968
13/07/1974
31/01/1976
21/02/1976
31/10/1976
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
D4114 09026 21/01/1962 24C
5A
70B
75C
BM
W
Lostock Hall (New)
Crewe Diesel
Feltham
Selhurst
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
21/01/1962
14/12/1968
01/01/1969
04/01/1969
31/10/1976
01/10/2005
01/10/2005