Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 646 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1773 Week
» 13066 Month
» 277699 Year
» 1499264 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "3P" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 75     14B Kentish Town  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 115     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 71     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 72     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 73     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 74     19G Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 75 14B Kentish Town 19B Sheffield Millhouses  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 76     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 77     9B Stockport Edgeley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 78     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 79     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 80     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 81     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 82     19B Sheffield Millhouses  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 83     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 84     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 85     5F Uttoxeter  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 86     5F Uttoxeter  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 87     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 88     19G Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 89     19G Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 90     19D Heaton Mersey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 91     14C St Albans  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 92     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 93     19D Heaton Mersey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 94     19D Heaton Mersey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 95     19D Heaton Mersey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 96     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 97     21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 98     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 99     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 100     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 101     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 102     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 103     11A Carnforth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 104     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 105     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 106     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 107     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 108     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 109     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 110     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 111     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 112     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 113     19D Heaton Mersey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 114     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 115 14B Kentish Town 21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 116     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 117     21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 118     19G Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 119     22A Bristol Barrow Road  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 120     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 121     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 122     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 123     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 124     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 125     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 126     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 127     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 128     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 129     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 130     6A Chester (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 131     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 132     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 133     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 134     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 135     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 136     6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 137     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 138     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 139     19B Sheffield Millhouses  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 140     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 141     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 142     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 143     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 144     2A Rugby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 145     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 146     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 147     19G Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 148     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 149     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 150     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 151     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 152     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 153     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 154     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 155     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 156     5F Uttoxeter  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 157     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 158     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 159     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 160     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 161     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 162     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 163     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 164     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 165     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 166     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 167     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 168     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 169     20C Royston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 170     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 171     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 172     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 173     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 174     22A Bristol Barrow Road  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 175     21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 176     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 177     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 178     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 179     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 180     16B Spital Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 181     20C Royston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 182     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 183     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 184     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 185     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 186     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 187     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 188     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 189     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 190     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 191     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 192     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 193     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 194     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 195     25G Farnley Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 196     25G Farnley Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 197     25G Farnley Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 198     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 199     24C Lostock Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 200     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 201     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 202     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 203     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 204     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 205     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 206     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 207     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 208     2D Nuneaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 209     7A Llandudno Junction  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 40089 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 19D Heaton Mersey  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 90 19D Heaton Mersey 20A Holbeck (MR)  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 141 15C Leicester Midland 15D Bedford  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 40120 15C Leicester Midland 16A Nottingham  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 40127 5D Stoke 2D Nuneaton  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 85 5F Uttoxeter 5D Stoke  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 40183 20G Hellifield 19B Sheffield Millhouses  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 40196 25G Farnley Junction 23C Southport  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 40197 25G Farnley Junction 23C Southport  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 40072 7B Bangor 1A Willesden  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 40073 7B Bangor 1A Willesden  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 40087 7A Llandudno Junction 1A Willesden  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 40094 19D Heaton Mersey 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 40144 2A Rugby 6A Chester (MR)  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 40088 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 5D Stoke  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 40180 16B Spital Bridge 8E Brunswick  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40072 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40118 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 9F Heaton Mersey  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40124 7B Bangor 7A Llandudno Junction  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40203 2E Warwick 8E Brunswick  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40085 5D Stoke 8E Brunswick  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40095 19D Heaton Mersey 7A Llandudno Junction  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40103 11A Carnforth 8A Edge Hill  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40116 15C Leicester Midland 22A Bristol Barrow Road  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40124 7A Llandudno Junction 9F Heaton Mersey  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40127 2D Nuneaton 8E Brunswick  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40137 7A Llandudno Junction 2B Nuneaton  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40144 6A Chester (MR) 8A Edge Hill  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40156 5F Uttoxeter 5F Uttoxeter  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40159 28A Motherwell 63A Perth South  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40200 28A Motherwell 63A Perth South  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40207 8B Warrington Dallam 7A Llandudno Junction  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40208 2D Nuneaton 7A Llandudno Junction  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 40209 7A Llandudno Junction 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 40091 14C St Albans 14B Kentish Town  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 40098 14B Kentish Town 14B Kentish Town  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 40155 14B Kentish Town 14B Kentish Town  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 40172 14B Kentish Town 14B Kentish Town  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 40094 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 9F Heaton Mersey  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 40103 8A Edge Hill 7A Llandudno Junction  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 40118 9F Heaton Mersey 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 40144 8A Edge Hill 5D Stoke  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 40147 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 20D Normanton  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 40144 5D Stoke 6A Chester (MR)  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40073 1A Willesden 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40088 5D Stoke 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40103 7A Llandudno Junction 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40120 16A Nottingham 19B Sheffield Millhouses  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40126 5D Stoke 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40128 5D Stoke 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40144 6A Chester (MR) 5D Stoke  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 40075 19B Sheffield Millhouses 20D Normanton  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 40147 20D Normanton 20A Holbeck (MR)  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 40201 2D Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 40205 2D Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 40090 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 40139 19B Sheffield Millhouses 20C Royston  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 40140 16A Nottingham 20C Royston  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 40173 21B Bournville 23C Lancaster Green Ayre  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 40134 7A Llandudno Junction 8D Widnes  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 40143 2D Nuneaton 7A Llandudno Junction  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 40080 8B Warrington Dallam 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 40147 20A Holbeck (MR) 20C Royston  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 40148 14B Kentish Town 20A Holbeck (MR)  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 40168 21B Bournville 21A Saltley  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40091 14B Kentish Town 86K Abergavenny  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40097 21A Saltley 86K Abergavenny  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40105 21B Bournville 86K Abergavenny  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40141 15D Bedford 86K Abergavenny  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40145 15C Leicester Midland 86K Abergavenny  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 40171 14B Kentish Town 86K Abergavenny  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 40143 7A Llandudno Junction 5D Stoke  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40080 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40084 8B Warrington Dallam 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40108 9A Longsight 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40146 15C Leicester Midland 16D Mansfield  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 40079 14B Kentish Town 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 40096 14B Kentish Town 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 40149 14B Kentish Town 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 40155 14B Kentish Town 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 40173 23C Lancaster Green Ayre 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
31/03/1952 Reallocation 40098 14B Kentish Town 86K Abergavenny  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 40146 16D Mansfield 15C Leicester Midland  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 40147 20C Royston 20D Normanton  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 40097 86K Abergavenny 86K Abergavenny  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 40105 86K Abergavenny 86K Abergavenny  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 40145 86K Abergavenny 86K Abergavenny  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 40074 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 20E Manningham  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 40085 8E Brunswick 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 40143 5D Stoke 6K Rhyl  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 40180 8E Brunswick 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40122 5D Stoke 6G Llandudno Junction  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40125 5D Stoke 6G Llandudno Junction  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40132 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6H Bangor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40137 2B Nuneaton 8D Widnes  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40143 6K Rhyl 5D Stoke  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40149 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 20E Manningham  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40155 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 20E Manningham  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40202 2D Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40079 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 14B Kentish Town  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40096 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 14B Kentish Town  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40122 6G Llandudno Junction 3B Bushbury  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40125 6G Llandudno Junction 3B Bushbury  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40178 16A Nottingham 20E Manningham  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40207 7A Llandudno Junction 3B Bushbury  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 40135 2E Warwick 2B Nuneaton  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 40147 20D Normanton 20E Manningham  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 40185 31E Dawsholm 68B Dumfries  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 40204 2D Nuneaton 2B Nuneaton  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40093 19D Heaton Mersey 2C Warwick  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40118 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 8E Brunswick  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40132 6H Bangor 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40143 5D Stoke 2B Nuneaton  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40079 14B Kentish Town 16D Mansfield  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40081 8B Warrington Dallam 5D Stoke  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40087 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40088 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40099 14B Kentish Town 21A Saltley  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40103 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40109 2E Warwick 2B Nuneaton  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40126 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40128 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40206 2D Nuneaton 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 40081 5D Stoke 9B Stockport Edgeley  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 40093 2C Warwick 5F Uttoxeter  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 40143 2B Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 40093 5F Uttoxeter 2B Nuneaton  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 40099 21A Saltley 21B Bournville  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 40201 5D Stoke 8D Widnes  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 40156 5F Uttoxeter 2C Warwick  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 40205 5D Stoke 2C Warwick  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 40082 19B Sheffield Millhouses 20C Royston  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 40093 2B Nuneaton 8E Brunswick  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 40099 21B Bournville 21A Saltley  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40086 5F Uttoxeter 6G Llandudno Junction  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40102 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6H Bangor  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40126 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6K Rhyl  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40129 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 3E Monument Lane  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40206 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3D Aston  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 40168 21A Saltley 16D Mansfield  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 40202 5D Stoke 8B Warrington Dallam  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 40143 5D Stoke 8B Warrington Dallam  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 40112 14B Kentish Town 20E Manningham  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 40175 21A Saltley 16D Mansfield  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 40082 20C Royston 20A Holbeck (MR)  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 40104 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 2B Nuneaton  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 40120 19B Sheffield Millhouses 22A Bristol Barrow Road  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 40126 6K Rhyl 2C Warwick  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 40145 86K Abergavenny 86G Pontypool Road  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 40084 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3B Bushbury  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 40091 86K Abergavenny 86G Pontypool Road  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 40105 86K Abergavenny 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 40163 16A Nottingham 20G Hellifield  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 40120 22A Bristol Barrow Road 20G Hellifield  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 40149 20E Manningham 21A Saltley  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 40082 20A Holbeck (MR) 20C Royston  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 40093 8E Brunswick 9A Longsight  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 40108 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3E Monument Lane  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 40118 8E Brunswick 6K Rhyl  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 40129 3E Monument Lane 3B Bushbury  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 40180 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3D Aston  
07/08/1954 Reallocation 40150 27C Hamilton (West) 60B Aviemore  
07/08/1954 Reallocation 40151 27C Hamilton (West) 60B Aviemore  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 40099 21A Saltley 24E Blackpool Central  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 40141 86K Abergavenny 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 40164 14B Kentish Town 21A Saltley  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 40072 1C Watford 24E Blackpool Central  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 40103 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 24E Blackpool Central  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 40109 2B Nuneaton 24E Blackpool Central  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 40164 21A Saltley 24E Blackpool Central  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 40174 22A Bristol Barrow Road 24E Blackpool Central  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40098 86K Abergavenny 86G Pontypool Road  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40102 6H Bangor 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40114 14B Kentish Town 20E Manningham  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40118 6K Rhyl 3E Monument Lane  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 40135 2B Nuneaton 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 40193 16A Nottingham 20A Holbeck (MR)  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 40200 63A Perth South 65D Dawsholm  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 40159 63A Perth South 65D Dawsholm  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 40080 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3B Bushbury  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 40088 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 40182 15C Leicester Midland 22A Bristol Barrow Road  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 40073 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 2A Rugby  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 40098 86G Pontypool Road 86K Tredegar  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 40182 22A Bristol Barrow Road 15C Leicester Midland  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40073 2A Rugby 2B Nuneaton  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40084 3B Bushbury 6K Rhyl  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40097 86K Abergavenny 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40101 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6K Rhyl  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40122 3B Bushbury 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40129 3B Bushbury 3D Aston  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40122 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 6H Bangor  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40139 20C Royston 20E Manningham  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40140 20C Royston 20A Holbeck (MR)  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40084 6K Rhyl 9A Longsight  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40101 6K Rhyl 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 40085 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 6H Bangor  
26/11/1955 Reallocation 40185 68B Dumfries 68A Carlisle Kingmoor  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 40090 20E Manningham 27C Southport  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 40166 14B Kentish Town 27A Bank Hall  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 40096 14B Kentish Town 16C Mansfield  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 40146 15C Leicester Midland 16C Mansfield  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 40184 20G Hellifield 16C Mansfield  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 40080 3B Bushbury 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 40207 3B Bushbury 2B Nuneaton  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 40205 2C Warwick 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 40150 60B Aviemore 60D Wick  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40086 6G Llandudno Junction 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40125 3B Bushbury 1A Willesden  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40208 7A Llandudno Junction 1A Willesden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40073 2B Nuneaton 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40085 6H Bangor 1A Willesden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40104 2B Nuneaton 1A Willesden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40110 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40122 6H Bangor 1A Willesden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40126 2C Warwick 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40148 20A Holbeck (MR) 19B Sheffield Millhouses  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40156 2C Warwick 1A Willesden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 40157 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 40128 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 40129 3D Aston 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 40157 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40085 1A Willesden 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40104 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40106 9A Longsight 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40122 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40132 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6H Bangor  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40138 9A Longsight 2B Nuneaton  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40208 1A Willesden 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
01/12/1956 Reallocation 40156 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 40143 8B Warrington Dallam 9A Longsight  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 40202 8B Warrington Dallam 6D Chester Northgate  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40097 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 17F Trafford Park (LMS)  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40105 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 17F Trafford Park (LMS)  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40141 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 17F Trafford Park (LMS)  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40143 9A Longsight 8D Widnes  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40144 5D Stoke 21B Bournville  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40156 2B Nuneaton 1A Willesden  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 40122 2B Nuneaton 2C Warwick  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 40151 60B Aviemore 68B Dumfries  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 40120 20G Hellifield 24D Lower Darwen  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 40162 21B Bournville 24D Lower Darwen  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 40163 20G Hellifield 24D Lower Darwen  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 40183 19B Sheffield Millhouses 24D Lower Darwen  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 40159 65D Dawsholm 64A St Margarets  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 40186 31E Dawsholm 64A St Margarets  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40202 6D Chester Northgate 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
07/09/1957 Reallocation 40136 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
21/09/1957 Reallocation 40155 20E Manningham 56A Wakefield  
21/09/1957 Reallocation 40169 20C Royston 56A Wakefield  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40125 1A Willesden 8B Warrington Dallam  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40136 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6H Bangor  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40156 1A Willesden 8B Warrington Dallam  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 40155 56A Wakefield 56F Low Moor  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 40129 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3E Monument Lane  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 40202 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 9A Longsight  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 40185 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 6H Bangor  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 40202 9A Longsight 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 40159 64A St Margarets 65D Dawsholm  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 40186 64A St Margarets 65D Dawsholm  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40080 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40083 7B Bangor 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40173 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
12/07/1958 Reallocation 40071 24L   6H Bangor  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 40116 22A Bristol Barrow Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 40157 2B Nuneaton 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 40135 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 2B Nuneaton  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 40157 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 2B Nuneaton  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 40155 56F Low Moor 56B Ardsley  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 40169 56A Wakefield 56B Ardsley  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 40073 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6G Llandudno Junction  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 40106 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6E Chester West  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 40076 5D Stoke 9G Gorton  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 40078 5D Stoke 9G Gorton  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 40122 2C Warwick 9G Gorton  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 40192 24C Lostock Hall 24A Accrington  
03/01/1959 Reallocation 40190 24C Lostock Hall 55F Manningham  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 40128 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 40165 15C Leicester Midland 15E Leicester (G.C.)  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 40167 14B Kentish Town 15E Leicester (G.C.)  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 40182 15C Leicester Midland 15E Leicester (G.C.)  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40074 20E Manningham 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40112 20E Manningham 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40114 20E Manningham 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40117 21A Saltley 56A Wakefield  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40139 20E Manningham 56A Wakefield  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40147 20E Manningham 56E Sowerby Bridge  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 40190 55F Manningham 56E Sowerby Bridge  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 40178 20E Manningham 27C Southport  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 40192 24A Accrington 24C Lostock Hall  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 40178 27C Southport 55F Manningham  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 40178 55F Manningham 99H Horwich Works  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 40166 27A Bank Hall 24E Blackpool Central  
28/02/1959 Reallocation 40155 56B Ardsley 56A Wakefield  
28/02/1959 Reallocation 40169 56B Ardsley 56A Wakefield  
28/02/1959 Reallocation 40178 99H Horwich Works 27C Southport  
28/02/1959 Reallocation 40190 56E Sowerby Bridge 56E Sowerby Bridge  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 40076 9G Gorton 9A Longsight  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 40078 9G Gorton 9A Longsight  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 40122 9G Gorton 9A Longsight  
28/03/1959 Reallocation 40115 21A Saltley 16C Mansfield  
28/03/1959 Reallocation 40128 6G Llandudno Junction 6G Llandudno Junction  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 40122 9A Longsight 5C Stafford  
30/05/1959 Reallocation 40118 3E Monument Lane 8D Widnes  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 40076 9A Longsight 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 40078 9A Longsight 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 40116 6E Chester West 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 40148 19B Sheffield Millhouses 55D Royston  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 40122 5C Stafford 9A Longsight  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 40151 68B Dumfries 65D Dawsholm  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 40091 86G Pontypool Road 24E Blackpool Central  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 40145 86G Pontypool Road 27C Southport  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 40203 8E Brunswick 14B Kentish Town  
10/10/1959 Reallocation 40183 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
10/10/1959 Reallocation 40185 6H Bangor 2B Nuneaton  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 40073 6G Llandudno Junction 16C Mansfield  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 40156 8B Warrington Dallam 16C Mansfield  
23/10/1959 Condemned 40169 56A Wakefield   COND  
29/10/1959 Condemned 40139 56A Wakefield   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40084 9A Longsight   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40096 16C Mansfield   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40125 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40127 8E Brunswick   COND  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40151 65D Dawsholm 67B Hurlford  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40160 14B Kentish Town   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40163 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40172 14B Kentish Town   COND  
21/11/1959 Condemned 40204 2B Nuneaton   COND  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 40092 14B Kentish Town 15E Leicester (G.C.)  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 40085 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 40086 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 40110 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 40126 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 84J Croes Newydd  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 40205 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 40077 9B Stockport Edgeley 2B Nuneaton  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 40081 24L   2B Nuneaton  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 40110 89C Machynlleth 84G Shrewsbury  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 40129 3E Monument Lane 2B Nuneaton  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 40180 3D Aston 2B Nuneaton  
19/03/1960 Reallocation 40202 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 8D Widnes  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 40097 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 9F Heaton Mersey  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 40098 86K Tredegar 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 40105 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 9F Heaton Mersey  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 40126 84J Croes Newydd 84G Shrewsbury  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 40205 89C Machynlleth 84G Shrewsbury  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40073 16C Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40076 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6B Mold Junction  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40078 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6B Mold Junction  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40079 16D Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40106 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40115 16C Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40146 16C Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40156 16C Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40168 16D Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40175 16D Mansfield 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 40185 2B Nuneaton 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
16/04/1960 Reallocation 40081 2B Nuneaton 24L Carnforth  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 40076 6B Mold Junction 6H Bangor  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 40078 6B Mold Junction 6H Bangor  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 40129 2B Nuneaton 3E Monument Lane  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 40149 21A Saltley 18A Toton  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 40180 2B Nuneaton 3D Aston  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 40182 15E Leicester (G.C.) 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
28/05/1960 Reallocation 40107 9A Longsight 8D Widnes  
28/05/1960 Reallocation 40122 9A Longsight 8D Widnes  
28/05/1960 Reallocation 40202 8D Widnes 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
04/06/1960 Reallocation 40152 27C Hamilton (West) 68B Dumfries  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 40077 2B Nuneaton 6G Llandudno Junction  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 40093 9A Longsight 6G Llandudno Junction  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 40081 24L Carnforth 6H Bangor  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 40090 27C Southport 27C Southport  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 40147 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 40190 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40107 8D Widnes 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40122 8D Widnes 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40126 84G Shrewsbury 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40137 8D Widnes 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40157 2B Nuneaton 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40161 14B Kentish Town 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40171 86K Abergavenny 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40185 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 40201 8D Widnes 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 40085 89C Machynlleth 84G Kidderminster  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 40126 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 40081 6H Bangor 24L Carnforth  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 40118 8D Widnes 24L Carnforth  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 40171 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 40086 89C Machynlleth 89A Shrewsbury  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 40161 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 40165 15E Leicester (G.C.) 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 40183 24C Lostock Hall 24D Lower Darwen  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 40192 24C Lostock Hall 24D Lower Darwen  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 40108 3E Monument Lane 5C Stafford  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 40085 84G Kidderminster 84D Leamington  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 40087 2B Nuneaton 24K Preston  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 40106 6A Chester (MR) 24K Preston  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 40128 6G Llandudno Junction 1A Willesden  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 40206 3D Aston 1A Willesden  
28/12/1960 Condemned 40161 82G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 40098 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 40128 1A Willesden 6G Llandudno Junction  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 40206 1A Willesden 21D Aston  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 40074 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 56F Low Moor  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 40193 20A Holbeck (MR) 55D Royston  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 40087 24K Preston 2B Nuneaton  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 40124 9F Heaton Mersey 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 40206 21D Aston 24L Carnforth  
04/03/1961 Reallocation 40088 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
04/03/1961 Reallocation 40092 15E Leicester (G.C.) 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 40092 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 15E Leicester (G.C.)  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 40180 3D Aston 1A Willesden  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 40207 2B Nuneaton 1A Willesden  
08/04/1961 Reallocation 40180 1A Willesden 21D Aston  
08/04/1961 Reallocation 40207 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 40142 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40085 84D Leamington 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40086 89A Shrewsbury 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40098 82G Templecombe (S&D) 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40110 84G Shrewsbury 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40126 82G Templecombe (S&D) 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40171 82G Templecombe (S&D) 6A Chester (MR)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 40205 84G Shrewsbury 6A Chester (MR)  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 40089 19D Heaton Mersey 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 40094 9F Heaton Mersey 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 40108 5C Stafford 21E Monument Lane  
13/05/1961 Reallocation 40106 24K Preston 6A Chester (MR)  
20/05/1961 Condemned 40092 15E Leicester (G.C.)   COND  
20/05/1961 Condemned 40126 6A Chester (MR)   COND  
20/05/1961 Condemned 40171 6A Chester (MR)   COND  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 40107 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 40110 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 40122 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 40137 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 40205 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 40086 6A Chester (MR) 8E Northwich  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 40099 24E Blackpool Central 24D Lower Darwen  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 40104 2B Nuneaton 1A Willesden  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 40074 56F Low Moor 56A Wakefield  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 40104 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 40147 56F Low Moor 56A Wakefield  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 40190 56F Low Moor 56A Wakefield  
08/07/1961 Condemned 40075 20D Normanton   COND  
08/07/1961 Condemned 40077 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
08/07/1961 Reallocation 40090 27C Southport 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 40116 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6H Bangor  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 40202 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6G Llandudno Junction  
22/07/1961 Reallocation 40082 20C Royston 55E Normanton  
22/07/1961 Condemned 40142 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
05/08/1961 Condemned 40097 9F Heaton Mersey   COND  
05/08/1961 Reallocation 40144 21B Bournville 1A Willesden  
05/08/1961 Reallocation 40157 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 1A Willesden  
05/08/1961 Reallocation 40201 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 1A Willesden  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 40086 8E Northwich 6A Chester (MR)  
19/08/1961 Condemned 40118 24L Carnforth   COND  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 40086 6A Chester (MR) 24L Carnforth  
02/09/1961 Condemned 40107 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
02/09/1961 Condemned 40124 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 40110 6H Bangor 1A Willesden  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 40128 6G Llandudno Junction 1A Willesden  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 40191 24C Lostock Hall 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 40195 25G Farnley Junction 16B Kirkby in Ashfield  
07/10/1961 Condemned 40094 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
20/10/1961 Condemned 40076 6H Bangor   COND  
20/10/1961 Condemned 40111 14B Kentish Town   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40079 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40081 24L Carnforth   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40091 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40095 7A Llandudno Junction   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40101 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40102 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40103 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40115 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40121 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40123 7A Llandudno Junction   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40129 3E Monument Lane   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40130 6A Chester (MR)   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40131 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40132 6H Bangor   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40133 7B Bangor   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40134 8D Widnes   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40136 6H Bangor   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40141 17F Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 40143 8D Widnes   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40149 18A Toton   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40156 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40162 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40165 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40166 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40167 15E Leicester (G.C.)   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40168 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40175 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40178 27C Southport   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40182 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40183 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40184 16C Mansfield   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40194 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40199 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40208 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
28/10/1961 Condemned 40209 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
04/11/1961 Condemned 40140 20A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
17/11/1961 Condemned 40074 56A Wakefield   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 40108 21E Monument Lane   COND  
25/11/1961 Reallocation 40190 56A Wakefield 51A Darlington  
25/11/1961 Reallocation 40191 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
25/11/1961 Condemned 40195 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 40090 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 27C Southport  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 40191 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 27C Southport  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 40072 24E Blackpool Central 24D Lower Darwen  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 40164 24E Blackpool Central 24D Lower Darwen  
23/12/1961 Condemned 40071 6H Bangor   COND  
23/12/1961 Condemned 40144 1A Willesden   COND  
23/12/1961 Condemned 40192 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 40080 3A Bescot 1A Willesden  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 40117 56A Wakefield 50E Scarborough  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 40173 3A Bescot 6H Bangor  
08/01/1962 Condemned 40152 68B Dumfries   COND  
08/01/1962 Condemned 40154 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
08/01/1962 Condemned 40158 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
08/01/1962 Condemned 40170 12G Dumfries   COND  
20/01/1962 Condemned 40180 21D Aston   COND  
27/01/1962 Condemned 40093 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
03/02/1962 Reallocation 40083 3A Bescot 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/02/1962 Reallocation 40138 2B Nuneaton 24L Carnforth  
10/02/1962 Condemned 40207 2B Nuneaton   COND  
17/02/1962 Reallocation 40181 20C Royston 55E Normanton  
17/02/1962 Condemned 40206 24L Carnforth   COND  
24/02/1962 Condemned 40185 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
27/02/1962 Condemned 40082 55E Normanton   COND  
27/02/1962 Condemned 40179 21B Bournville   COND  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 40186 65D Dawsholm 66C Hamilton (West)  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 40187 31E Dawsholm 66C Hamilton (West)  
30/03/1962 Condemned 40181 55E Normanton   COND  
05/05/1962 Condemned 40110 1A Willesden   COND  
09/06/1962 Condemned 40174 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 40085 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 40098 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 40106 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 40086 24L Carnforth 6G Llandudno Junction  
23/06/1962 Condemned 40122 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 40138 24L Carnforth 6G Llandudno Junction  
07/07/1962 Condemned 40085 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40088 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40090 27C Southport   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40105 9F Heaton Mersey   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40109 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40113 19D Heaton Mersey   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40128 1A Willesden   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40173 6H Bangor   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40197 23C Southport   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40198 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40201 1A Willesden   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 40203 14B Kentish Town   COND  
04/08/1962 Condemned 40089 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
04/08/1962 Condemned 40146 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
11/08/1962 Reallocation 40150 60D Wick 63A Perth South  
18/08/1962 Condemned 40073 16B Kirkby in Ashfield   COND  
18/08/1962 Condemned 40100 14B Kentish Town   COND  
18/08/1962 Condemned 40119 22A Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
25/08/1962 Condemned 40148 55D Royston   COND  
25/08/1962 Condemned 40193 55D Royston   COND  
01/09/1962 Condemned 40072 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
08/09/1962 Condemned 40080 1A Willesden   COND  
15/09/1962 Condemned 40104 2B Nuneaton   COND  
15/09/1962 Condemned 40202 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
22/09/1962 Condemned 40138 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
22/09/1962 Condemned 40145 27C Southport   COND  
22/09/1962 Condemned 40191 27C Southport   COND  
13/10/1962 Condemned 40099 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
13/10/1962 Condemned 40120 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
13/10/1962 Condemned 40164 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 40098 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 40137 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
19/11/1962 Condemned 40112 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
19/11/1962 Condemned 40114 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)   COND  
19/11/1962 Condemned 40117 50E Scarborough   COND  
19/11/1962 Condemned 40147 56A Wakefield   COND  
19/11/1962 Condemned 40190 51A Darlington   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40086 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40087 2B Nuneaton   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40106 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40116 6H Bangor   COND  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40135 2B Nuneaton   COND  
24/11/1962 Reallocation 40186 66C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
24/11/1962 Condemned 40205 6H Bangor   COND  
12/1962 Condemned 40159 65D Dawsholm   COND  
01/12/1962 Condemned 40078 6H Bangor   COND  
01/12/1962 Condemned 40083 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
01/12/1962 Condemned 40157 1A Willesden   COND  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 40187 66C Hamilton (West) 66B Motherwell  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40150 63A Perth South   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40151 67B Hurlford   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40153 27C Hamilton (West)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40155 56A Wakefield   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40176 31E Dawsholm   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40177 31E Dawsholm   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40186 66B Motherwell   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40187 66B Motherwell   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40188 31E Dawsholm   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40189 31E Dawsholm   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40196 23C Southport   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 40200 65D Dawsholm   COND