Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4878 Week
» 7460 Month
» 272093 Year
» 1493658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "3P" Class 2-6-2T


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
3P 71 40071 15/02/1935 9A

6H
W
Longsight

Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
12/07/1958
23/12/1961
23/12/1961
3P 72 40072 15/02/1935 7B
1A
1C
24E
24D
W
Bangor
Willesden
Watford
Blackpool Central
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
07/10/1950
11/09/1954
09/12/1961
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
3P 73 40073 20/02/1935 7B
1A
3C
2A
2B
6E
6G
16C
16B
W
Bangor
Willesden
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Rugby
Nuneaton
Wrexham Rhosddu
Llandudno Junction
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
19/05/1951
26/03/1955
21/05/1955
11/08/1956
01/11/1958
17/10/1959
09/04/1960
18/08/1962
18/08/1962
3P 74 40074 25/02/1935 19G
20E
56C
56F
56A
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Manningham
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
31/01/1959
14/01/1961
24/06/1961
17/11/1961
17/11/1961
3P 75 40075 05/03/1935 14B
19B
20D
W
Kentish Town
Sheffield Millhouses
Normanton
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
08/07/1961
08/07/1961
3P 76 40076 02/03/1935 5D
9G
9A
6C
6B
6H
W
Stoke
Gorton
Longsight
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
14/03/1959
20/06/1959
09/04/1960
23/04/1960
20/10/1961
20/10/1961
3P 77 40077 07/03/1935 9B
2B
6G
W
Stockport Edgeley
Nuneaton
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/02/1960
11/06/1960
08/07/1961
08/07/1961
3P 78 40078 08/03/1935 5D
9G
9A
6C
6B
6H
W
Stoke
Gorton
Longsight
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Mold Junction
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
14/03/1959
20/06/1959
09/04/1960
23/04/1960
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3P 79 40079 19/03/1935 14B
3C
14B
16D
16B
W
Kentish Town
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Kentish Town
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
09/08/1952
29/11/1952
09/04/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 80 40080 18/03/1935 8B
10E
3C
3B
3C
3A
1A
W
Warrington Dallam
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bushbury
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
23/02/1952
26/02/1955
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
06/01/1962
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3P 81 40081 27/03/1935 8B
5D
9B

2B
24L
6H
24L
W
Warrington Dallam
Stoke
Stockport Edgeley

Nuneaton
Carnforth
Bangor
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
03/01/1953
22/03/1958
20/02/1960
16/04/1960
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 82 40082 25/03/1935 19B
20C
20A
20C
55E
W
Sheffield Millhouses
Royston
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
31/10/1953
24/04/1954
22/07/1961
27/02/1962
27/02/1962
3P 83 40083 27/03/1935 7B
3A
6G
W
Bangor
Bescot
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
03/02/1962
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3P 84 40084 02/04/1935 8B
3C
3B
6K
9A
W
Warrington Dallam
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bushbury
Rhyl
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
30/01/1954
21/05/1955
08/10/1955
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 85 40085 08/05/1935 5F
5D
8E
3C
6H
1A
6E
89C
84G
84D
6A
6G
W
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Brunswick
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bangor
Willesden
Wrexham Rhosddu
Machynlleth
Kidderminster
Leamington
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
04/11/1950
14/06/1952
05/11/1955
11/08/1956
03/11/1956
30/01/1960
10/09/1960
03/12/1960
29/04/1961
16/06/1962
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
3P 86 40086 08/04/1935 5F
6G
6E
89C
89A
6A
8E
6A
24L
6G
W
Uttoxeter
Llandudno Junction
Wrexham Rhosddu
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Chester (MR)
Northwich
Chester (MR)
Carnforth
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
16/06/1956
30/01/1960
05/11/1960
29/04/1961
17/06/1961
12/08/1961
26/08/1961
23/06/1962
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 87 40087 11/04/1935 7A
1A
2B
24K
2B
W
Llandudno Junction
Willesden
Nuneaton
Preston
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
29/11/1952
10/12/1960
11/02/1961
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 88 40088 12/04/1935 19G
5D
6E
6C
9E
16B
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Stoke
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Trafford Park (LMS)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
19/05/1951
29/11/1952
26/02/1955
04/03/1961
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 89 40089 17/04/1935 19G
19D
16B
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
29/04/1961
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3P 90 40090 20/04/1935 19D
20A
20E
27C
27C
16B
27C
W
Heaton Mersey
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Southport
Southport
Kirkby in Ashfield
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
08/09/1951
03/12/1955
18/06/1960
08/07/1961
02/12/1961
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 91 40091 09/05/1935 14C
14B
86K
86G
24E
W
St Albans
Kentish Town
Abergavenny
Pontypool Road
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
31/12/1951
30/01/1954
29/08/1959
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 92 40092 16/05/1935 14B
15E
16B
15E
W
Kentish Town
Leicester (G.C.)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
04/03/1961
18/03/1961
20/05/1961
20/05/1961
3P 93 40093 16/05/1935 19D
2C
5F
2B
8E
9A
6G
W
Heaton Mersey
Warwick
Uttoxeter
Nuneaton
Brunswick
Longsight
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
03/01/1953
24/01/1953
16/05/1953
19/06/1954
11/06/1960
27/01/1962
27/01/1962
3P 94 40094 16/05/1935 19D
9E
9F
16B
W
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
27/01/1951
29/04/1961
07/10/1961
07/10/1961
3P 95 40095 22/05/1935 19D
7A
W
Heaton Mersey
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 96 40096 23/05/1935 14B
3C
14B
16C
W
Kentish Town
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Kentish Town
Mansfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
09/08/1952
28/01/1956
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 97 40097 25/05/1935 21A
86K
86K
87K
17F
9F
W
Saltley
Abergavenny
Abergavenny
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1951
17/05/1952
21/05/1955
23/03/1957
26/03/1960
05/08/1961
05/08/1961
3P 98 40098 29/05/1935 14B
14B
86K
86G
86K
82E
82G
6A
6G
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Abergavenny
Pontypool Road
Tredegar
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
31/03/1952
09/10/1954
26/03/1955
26/03/1960
31/12/1960
29/04/1961
16/06/1962
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
3P 99 40099 30/05/1935 14B
21A
21B
21A
24E
24D
W
Kentish Town
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Blackpool Central
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
21/02/1953
16/05/1953
14/08/1954
17/06/1961
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
3P 100 40100 06/1935 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1962
18/08/1962
3P 101 40101 06/06/1935 6C
6K
6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rhyl
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
08/10/1955
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 102 40102 08/06/1935 6C
6H
6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
09/10/1954
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 103 40103 14/06/1935 11A
8A
7A
6E
6C
24E
W
Carnforth
Edge Hill
Llandudno Junction
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
27/01/1951
19/05/1951
29/11/1952
11/09/1954
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 104 40104 20/06/1935 6C
2B
1A
2B
1A
2B
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Willesden
Nuneaton
Willesden
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1953
11/08/1956
03/11/1956
17/06/1961
24/06/1961
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
3P 105 40105 25/06/1935 21B
86K
86K
87K
17F
9F
W
Bournville
Abergavenny
Abergavenny
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1951
17/05/1952
30/01/1954
23/03/1957
26/03/1960
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 106 40106 27/06/1935 9A
6E
6E
6A
24K
6A
6G
W
Longsight
Wrexham Rhosddu
Chester West
Chester (MR)
Preston
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
01/11/1958
09/04/1960
10/12/1960
13/05/1961
16/06/1962
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 107 40107 29/06/1935 9A
8D
6C
6G
W
Longsight
Widnes
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/05/1960
16/07/1960
10/06/1961
02/09/1961
02/09/1961
3P 108 40108 03/07/1935 9A
3C
3E
5C
21E
W
Longsight
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Monument Lane
Stafford
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
19/06/1954
26/11/1960
29/04/1961
25/11/1961
25/11/1961
3P 109 40109 06/07/1935 2E
2B
24E
W
Warwick
Nuneaton
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
11/09/1954
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 110 40110 10/07/1935 6C
6E
89C
84G
6A
6H
1A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Wrexham Rhosddu
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
30/01/1960
27/02/1960
22/04/1961
10/06/1961
16/09/1961
05/05/1962
05/05/1962
3P 111 40111 18/07/1935 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1961
20/10/1961
3P 112 40112 20/07/1935 14B
20E
56C
W
Kentish Town
Manningham
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/01/1959
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
3P 113 40113 08/1935 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 114 40114 03/08/1935 14B
20E
56C
W
Kentish Town
Manningham
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
31/01/1959
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
3P 115 40115 07/08/1935 14B
21A
16C
16B
W
Kentish Town
Saltley
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
28/03/1959
09/04/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 116 40116 14/08/1935 15C
22A
6E
6C
6H
W
Leicester Midland
Bristol Barrow Road
Chester West
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/08/1958
20/06/1959
15/07/1961
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 117 40117 14/08/1935 21A
56A
50E
W
Saltley
Wakefield
Scarborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
06/01/1962
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
3P 118 40118 16/08/1935 19G
9F
9E
8E
6K
3E
8D
24L
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LMS)
Brunswick
Rhyl
Monument Lane
Widnes
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
27/01/1951
04/10/1952
19/06/1954
09/10/1954
30/05/1959
17/09/1960
19/08/1961
19/08/1961
3P 119 40119 21/08/1935 22A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1962
18/08/1962
3P 120 40120 23/08/1935 15C
16A
19B
22A
20G
24D
W
Leicester Midland
Nottingham
Sheffield Millhouses
Bristol Barrow Road
Hellifield
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
19/05/1951
28/11/1953
27/02/1954
18/05/1957
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
3P 121 40121 30/08/1935 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 122 40122 08/1935 5D
6G
3B
3C
6H
1A
2B
2C
9G
9A
5C
9A
8D
6C
6G
W
Stoke
Llandudno Junction
Bushbury
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bangor
Willesden
Nuneaton
Warwick
Gorton
Longsight
Stafford
Longsight
Widnes
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
09/08/1952
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
11/08/1956
03/11/1956
20/04/1957
15/11/1958
14/03/1959
09/05/1959
18/07/1959
28/05/1960
16/07/1960
10/06/1961
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
3P 123 40123 03/09/1935 7A
W
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 124 40124 09/09/1935 7B
7A
9F
16B
W
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/11/1950
25/02/1961
02/09/1961
02/09/1961
3P 125 40125 07/09/1935 5D
6G
3B
1A
8B
W
Stoke
Llandudno Junction
Bushbury
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
09/08/1952
16/06/1956
05/10/1957
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 126 40126 11/09/1935 5D
6E
6C
6K
2C
6E
84J
84G
82E
82G
6A
W
Stoke
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rhyl
Warwick
Wrexham Rhosddu
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
29/11/1952
11/07/1953
28/11/1953
11/08/1956
30/01/1960
26/03/1960
16/07/1960
10/09/1960
15/04/1961
20/05/1961
20/05/1961
3P 127 40127 13/09/1935 5D
2D
8E
W
Stoke
Nuneaton
Brunswick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
04/11/1950
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 128 40128 18/09/1935 5D
6E
6C
6E
6G
6G
1A
6G
1A
W
Stoke
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Wrexham Rhosddu
Llandudno Junction
Llandudno Junction
Willesden
Llandudno Junction
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
29/11/1952
08/09/1956
10/01/1959
28/03/1959
17/12/1960
31/12/1960
16/09/1961
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 129 40129 19/09/1935 6C
3E
3B
3D
3C
3E
2B
3E
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Monument Lane
Bushbury
Aston
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Monument Lane
Nuneaton
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
19/06/1954
21/05/1955
06/10/1956
30/11/1957
27/02/1960
23/04/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 130 40130 21/09/1935 6A
W
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 131 40131 26/09/1935 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 132 40132 28/09/1935 6C
6H
6C
6H
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
03/11/1956
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 133 40133 03/10/1935 7B
W
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 134 40134 04/10/1935 7A
8D
W
Llandudno Junction
Widnes
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 135 40135 08/10/1935 2E
2B
6C
2B
W
Warwick
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
06/11/1954
04/10/1958
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 136 40136 10/10/1935 6C
6C
6H
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1957
05/10/1957
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 137 40137 15/10/1935 7A
2B
8D
6C
6G
W
Llandudno Junction
Nuneaton
Widnes
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
12/07/1952
16/07/1960
10/06/1961
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
3P 138 40138 17/10/1935 9A
2B
24L
6G
W
Longsight
Nuneaton
Carnforth
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
10/02/1962
23/06/1962
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
3P 139 40139 19/10/1935 19B
20C
20E
56A
W
Sheffield Millhouses
Royston
Manningham
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
16/07/1955
31/01/1959
29/10/1959
29/10/1959
3P 140 40140 24/10/1935 16A
20C
20A
W
Nottingham
Royston
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
16/07/1955
04/11/1961
04/11/1961
3P 141 40141 30/10/1935 15C
15D
86K
87K
17F
W
Leicester Midland
Bedford
Abergavenny
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
31/12/1951
14/08/1954
23/03/1957
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 142 40142 01/11/1935 22C
16B
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1961
22/07/1961
22/07/1961
3P 143 40143 05/11/1935 2D
7A
5D
6K
5D
2B
5D
8B
9A
8D
W
Nuneaton
Llandudno Junction
Stoke
Rhyl
Stoke
Nuneaton
Stoke
Warrington Dallam
Longsight
Widnes
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
26/01/1952
14/06/1952
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
03/01/1953
05/09/1953
26/01/1957
23/03/1957
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3P 144 40144 13/11/1935 2A
6A
8A
5D
6A
5D
21B
1A
W
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Edge Hill
Stoke
Chester (MR)
Stoke
Bournville
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
04/11/1950
27/01/1951
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
23/03/1957
05/08/1961
23/12/1961
23/12/1961
3P 145 40145 20/07/1937 15C
86K
86K
86G
27C
W
Leicester Midland
Abergavenny
Abergavenny
Pontypool Road
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1951
17/05/1952
26/12/1953
29/08/1959
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
3P 146 40146 04/08/1937 15C
16D
15C
16C
16B
W
Leicester Midland
Mansfield
Leicester Midland
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
19/04/1952
25/02/1956
09/04/1960
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3P 147 40147 14/08/1937 19G
20D
20A
20C
20D
20E
56E
56F
56A
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Normanton
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Normanton
Manningham
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
17/07/1951
29/12/1951
19/04/1952
06/09/1952
31/01/1959
18/06/1960
24/06/1961
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
3P 148 40148 20/08/1937 14B
20A
19B
55D
W
Kentish Town
Holbeck (MR)
Sheffield Millhouses
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
11/08/1956
20/06/1959
25/08/1962
25/08/1962
3P 149 40149 26/08/1937 14B
3C
20E
21A
18A
W
Kentish Town
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Manningham
Saltley
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
12/07/1952
27/02/1954
23/04/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 150 40150 02/09/1937 27C
60B
60D
63A
W
Hamilton (West)
Aviemore
Wick
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1954
09/06/1956
11/08/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 151 40151 09/09/1937 27C
60B
68B
65D
67B
W
Hamilton (West)
Aviemore
Dumfries
Dawsholm
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1954
11/05/1957
01/08/1959
21/11/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 152 40152 16/09/1937 27C
68B
W
Hamilton (West)
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1960
08/01/1962
08/01/1962
3P 153 40153 22/09/1937 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 154 40154 24/09/1937 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/01/1962
08/01/1962
3P 155 40155 10/1937 14B
14B
3C
20E
56A
56F
56B
56A
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Manningham
Wakefield
Low Moor
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
22/03/1952
12/07/1952
21/09/1957
19/10/1957
11/10/1958
28/02/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 156 40156 06/10/1937 5F
5F
2C
1A
2B
1A
8B
16C
16B
W
Uttoxeter
Uttoxeter
Warwick
Willesden
Nuneaton
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
18/04/1953
11/08/1956
01/12/1956
23/03/1957
05/10/1957
17/10/1959
09/04/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 157 40157 09/10/1937 5D
1A
2B
6C
2B
6C
1A
W
Stoke
Willesden
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
09/08/1958
04/10/1958
16/07/1960
05/08/1961
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3P 158 40158 14/10/1937 27C
W
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/01/1962
08/01/1962
3P 159 40159 21/10/1937 28A
63A
65D
64A
65D
W
Motherwell
Perth South
Dawsholm
St Margarets
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
22/01/1955
06/07/1957
12/04/1958
12/1962
12/1962
3P 160 40160 28/10/1937 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 161 40161 04/11/1937 14B
82E
82G
W
Kentish Town
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1960
05/11/1960
31/12/1960
31/12/1960
3P 162 40162 10/11/1937 21B
24D
W
Bournville
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1957
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 163 40163 16/11/1937 16A
20G
24D
W
Nottingham
Hellifield
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
18/05/1957
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 164 40164 20/11/1937 14B
21A
24E
24D
W
Kentish Town
Saltley
Blackpool Central
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
11/09/1954
09/12/1961
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
3P 165 40165 25/11/1937 15C
15E
16B
W
Leicester Midland
Leicester (G.C.)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
05/11/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 166 40166 12/1937 14B
27A
24E
W
Kentish Town
Bank Hall
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
21/02/1959
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 167 40167 07/12/1937 14B
15E
W
Kentish Town
Leicester (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 168 40168 10/12/1937 21B
21A
16D
16B
W
Bournville
Saltley
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
08/08/1953
09/04/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 169 40169 16/12/1937 20C
56A
56B
56A
W
Royston
Wakefield
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/09/1957
11/10/1958
28/02/1959
23/10/1959
23/10/1959
3P 170 40170 18/12/1937 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/01/1962
08/01/1962
3P 171 40171 24/12/1937 14B
86K
82E
82G
W
Kentish Town
Abergavenny
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1951
16/07/1960
08/10/1960
20/05/1961
20/05/1961
3P 172 40172 12/1937 14B
14B
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 173 40173 05/01/1938 21B
23C
3C
3A
6H
W
Bournville
Lancaster Green Ayre
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
22/03/1952
14/06/1958
06/01/1962
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 174 40174 08/01/1938 22A
24E
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
09/06/1962
09/06/1962
3P 175 40175 17/03/1938 21A
16D
16B
W
Saltley
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
09/04/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 176 40176 24/03/1938 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 177 40177 04/1938 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 178 40178 08/04/1938 16A
20E
27C
55F
99H
27C
W
Nottingham
Manningham
Southport
Manningham
Horwich Works
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
07/02/1959
14/02/1959
14/02/1959
28/02/1959
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 179 40179 14/04/1938 21B
W
Bournville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1962
27/02/1962
3P 180 40180 22/04/1938 16B
8E
3C
3D
2B
3D
1A
21D
W
Spital Bridge
Brunswick
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Aston
Nuneaton
Aston
Willesden
Aston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
14/06/1952
19/06/1954
05/03/1960
23/04/1960
18/03/1961
08/04/1961
20/01/1962
20/01/1962
3P 181 40181 28/04/1938 20C
55E
W
Royston
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/02/1962
30/03/1962
30/03/1962
3P 182 40182 05/05/1938 15C
22A
15C
15E
16B
W
Leicester Midland
Bristol Barrow Road
Leicester Midland
Leicester (G.C.)
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1955
23/04/1955
10/01/1959
21/05/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 183 40183 12/05/1938 20G
19B
24D
24C
24D
W
Hellifield
Sheffield Millhouses
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
18/05/1957
10/10/1959
05/11/1960
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 184 40184 20/05/1938 20G
16C
W
Hellifield
Mansfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1956
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 185 40185 18/10/1937 31E
68B
68A
6H
2B
16B
6G
W
Dawsholm
Dumfries
Carlisle Kingmoor
Bangor
Nuneaton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
26/11/1955
22/02/1958
10/10/1959
09/04/1960
16/07/1960
24/02/1962
24/02/1962
3P 186 40186 21/10/1937 31E
64A
65D
66C
66B
W
Dawsholm
St Margarets
Dawsholm
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
12/04/1958
24/03/1962
24/11/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 187 40187 26/10/1937 31E
66C
66B
W
Dawsholm
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
22/12/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 188 40188 29/10/1937 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 189 40189 02/11/1937 31E
W
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 190 40190 24/11/1937 24C
55F
56E
56E
56F
56A
51A
W
Lostock Hall
Manningham
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Wakefield
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1959
31/01/1959
28/02/1959
18/06/1960
24/06/1961
25/11/1961
19/11/1962
19/11/1962
3P 191 40191 01/12/1937 24C
16B
27D
27C
W
Lostock Hall
Kirkby in Ashfield
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1961
25/11/1961
02/12/1961
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
3P 192 40192 09/12/1937 24C
24A
24C
24D
W
Lostock Hall
Accrington
Lostock Hall
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1958
07/02/1959
05/11/1960
23/12/1961
23/12/1961
3P 193 40193 17/12/1937 16A
20A
55D
W
Nottingham
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
14/01/1961
25/08/1962
25/08/1962
3P 194 40194 20/12/1937 24C
W
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 195 40195 12/1937 25G
16B
W
Farnley Junction
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1961
25/11/1961
25/11/1961
3P 196 40196 03/01/1938 25G
23C
W
Farnley Junction
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 197 40197 06/01/1938 25G
23C
W
Farnley Junction
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 198 40198 10/01/1938 24C
W
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 199 40199 24/01/1938 24C
W
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 200 40200 27/01/1938 28A
63A
65D
W
Motherwell
Perth South
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
25/12/1954
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3P 201 40201 03/02/1938 2D
5D
8D
6C
1A
W
Nuneaton
Stoke
Widnes
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
21/02/1953
16/07/1960
05/08/1961
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 202 40202 14/02/1938 2D
5D
8B
6D
6C
9A
6C
8D
6C
6G
W
Nuneaton
Stoke
Warrington Dallam
Chester Northgate
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Longsight
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Widnes
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
08/08/1953
26/01/1957
10/08/1957
25/01/1958
22/03/1958
19/03/1960
28/05/1960
15/07/1961
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
3P 203 40203 21/02/1938 2E
8E
14B
W
Warwick
Brunswick
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
26/09/1959
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
3P 204 40204 03/03/1938 2D
2B
W
Nuneaton
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1952
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
3P 205 40205 09/03/1938 2D
5D
2C
6E
89C
84G
6A
6H
W
Nuneaton
Stoke
Warwick
Wrexham Rhosddu
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
18/04/1953
19/05/1956
30/01/1960
26/03/1960
15/04/1961
10/06/1961
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3P 206 40206 18/03/1938 2D
3C
3D
1A
21D
24L
W
Nuneaton
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Aston
Willesden
Aston
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
11/07/1953
17/12/1960
31/12/1960
25/02/1961
17/02/1962
17/02/1962
3P 207 40207 21/04/1938 8B
7A
3B
2B
1A
2B
W
Warrington Dallam
Llandudno Junction
Bushbury
Nuneaton
Willesden
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/08/1952
24/03/1956
18/03/1961
08/04/1961
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
3P 208 40208 22/04/1938 2D
7A
1A
9E
W
Nuneaton
Llandudno Junction
Willesden
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
16/06/1956
03/11/1956
28/10/1961
28/10/1961
3P 209 40209 21/04/1938 7A
6C
W
Llandudno Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
28/10/1961
28/10/1961