Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 344 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1443 Week
» 7577 Month
» 235461 Year
» 1457026 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

81 Bo-Bo


BR (Type B) BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E3001 81001 04/11/1959 Longsight 29/07/1984 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 30/09/1986 26.92
E3002 29/01/1960 02/11/1968 8.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1969 8.93
E3003 81002 27/02/1960 01/10/1990 30.67 Prs Preserved 60.38
E3004 81003 30/03/1960 30/03/1988 28 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 10/01/1992 31.80
E3005 81004 04/05/1960 30/04/1990 29.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/05/1992 32.07
E3006 81005 08/07/1960 20/02/1989 28.58 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 15/01/1992 31.54
E3007 81006 21/07/1960 03/10/1988 28.25 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 20/01/1992 31.52
E3008 81007 23/09/1960 14/12/1989 29.25 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 24/01/1992 31.36
E3009 07/10/1960 24/08/1968 7.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1968 7.82
E3010 81008 22/10/1960 30/03/1988 27.42 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 28/11/1991 31.12
E3011 81009 11/11/1960 17/12/1990 30.08 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 07/02/1992 31.26
E3012 81010 18/11/1960 23/05/1990 29.5 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 07/01/1992 31.16
E3013 81011 02/12/1960 05/04/1989 28.33 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 17/12/1991 31.06
E3014 81012 16/12/1960 22/07/1991 30.58 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 07/02/1992 31.16
E3015 81013 30/12/1960 01/11/1989 28.92 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 13/12/1991 30.97
E3016 81014 08/03/1961 30/03/1988 27 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 03/12/1991 30.76
E3017 81015 05/05/1961 17/12/1984 23.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/05/1992 31.09
E3018 81016 23/03/1961 11/07/1983 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/02/1985 23.90
E3019 30/03/1961 18/07/1971 10.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1971 10.51
E3020 81017 27/04/1961 15/07/1991 30.25 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 03/01/1992 30.71
E3021 81018 13/06/1961 20/01/1986 24.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/07/1992 31.11
E3022 81019 14/09/1961 03/01/1989 27.33 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 28/11/1991 30.22
E3023 81020 05/02/1962 09/09/1987 25.58 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 09/12/1991 29.86
E3301 E3096 81021 04/1962 28/04/1987 25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/10/1992 30.50
E3302 E3097 81022 01/04/1962 10/07/1987 25.25 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 07/11/1990 28.62