Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 118 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2263 Week
» 16520 Month
» 244404 Year
» 1465969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

81 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 08/04/1962 E3020 ??   Crewe Works visit: Around the works - New erecting shop. SLS 5/1962  
Sat 06/01/1968 E3009 ??   On 6th January 1968, E3009 was working the 11:30 Manchester-Euston when it was in a massive collision at Hixon in Staffordshire. It hit a 148ft long transporter vehicle that was moving a 120 ton electrical transformer for storage at Hixon airfield while travelling at 75mph. The locomotive and first 5 carriages were destroyed and it is perhaps fortunate that only eleven people were killed as the carnage was great. A detailed report can be found at Wikipedia and the Government report is viewable here. http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Hixon_rail_crash  
Sun 27/07/1969 E3003 LMW   Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop RO 9/1969  
Sun 27/07/1969 E3005 LMW   Crewe Works visit: Sidings (Arrivals) RO 9/1969  
Sun 30/01/1972 E3013,
E3018,
E3096,
E3096
??,
??,
??,
??
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Electric Traction shop.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Electric Traction shop.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Electric Traction shop.
RO 4/1972  
Sun 11/06/1972 E3003 ACL   On Crewe Works - Fresh from overhaul