29/01/1960 |
To Service |
3002 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
27/02/1960 |
To Service |
3003 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/03/1960 |
To Service |
3004 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
04/05/1960 |
To Service |
3005 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/07/1960 |
To Service |
3006 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
21/07/1960 |
To Service |
3007 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
23/09/1960 |
To Service |
3008 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
07/10/1960 |
To Service |
3009 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
22/10/1960 |
To Service |
3010 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3001 |
9A |
Longsight |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3002 |
9A |
Longsight |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3003 |
9A |
Longsight |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3004 |
|
|
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3005 |
|
|
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3006 |
|
|
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
3007 |
|
|
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
11/11/1960 |
To Service |
3011 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
18/11/1960 |
To Service |
3012 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
02/12/1960 |
To Service |
3013 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
16/12/1960 |
To Service |
3014 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
30/12/1960 |
To Service |
3015 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
08/03/1961 |
To Service |
3016 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
23/03/1961 |
To Service |
3018 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
30/03/1961 |
To Service |
3019 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
27/04/1961 |
To Service |
3020 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
05/05/1961 |
To Service |
3017 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
13/06/1961 |
To Service |
3021 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
14/09/1961 |
To Service |
3022 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
05/02/1962 |
To Service |
3023 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
04/10/1963 |
To Service |
3301 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
27/01/1964 |
To Service |
3097 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
24/08/1968 |
Condemned |
3009 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/11/1968 |
Condemned |
3002 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
COND |
|
18/07/1971 |
Condemned |
3019 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1972 |
Reallocation |
3301 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
3008 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
3008 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
26/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
81015 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
11/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
81015 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81001 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81002 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81003 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81004 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81005 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81006 |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81007 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81008 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81009 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81010 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81011 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81012 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81013 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81014 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81015 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81016 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81017 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81018 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81019 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
3023 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81021 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
29/03/1975 |
Reallocation |
81022 |
|
|
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
11/07/1983 |
Condemned |
81016 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1984 |
Condemned |
81001 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1984 |
Condemned |
81015 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1986 |
Condemned |
81018 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
28/04/1987 |
Condemned |
81021 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1987 |
Condemned |
81022 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1987 |
Condemned |
81020 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1988 |
Condemned |
81003 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1988 |
Condemned |
81008 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1988 |
Condemned |
81014 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1988 |
Condemned |
81006 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1989 |
Condemned |
81019 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1989 |
Condemned |
81005 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
05/04/1989 |
Condemned |
81011 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1989 |
Condemned |
81013 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1989 |
Condemned |
81007 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
30/04/1990 |
Condemned |
81004 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
23/05/1990 |
Condemned |
81010 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1990 |
Condemned |
81002 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1990 |
Condemned |
81009 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1991 |
Condemned |
81017 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1991 |
Condemned |
81012 |
GW |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|