Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 165 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7172 Week
» 13306 Month
» 241190 Year
» 1462755 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

81 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (Type B) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
AL1/A 3001   81001 04/11/1959 9A
LMW
GW
W
Longsight
London Midland - Western Lines
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
04/11/1959
29/10/1960
29/03/1975
29/07/1984
29/07/1984
AL1/A 3002     29/01/1960 9A
LMW
W
Longsight
London Midland - Western Lines
Withdrawn
29/01/1960
29/10/1960
02/11/1968
02/11/1968
AL1/A 3003   81002 27/02/1960 9A
LMW
GW
W
Longsight
London Midland - Western Lines
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
29/10/1960
29/03/1975
01/10/1990
01/10/1990
AL1/A 3004   81003 30/03/1960 LMW
GW
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/10/1960
29/03/1975
30/03/1988
30/03/1988
AL1/A 3005   81004 04/05/1960 LMW
GW
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/10/1960
29/03/1975
30/04/1990
30/04/1990
AL1/A 3006   81005 08/07/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
20/02/1989
20/02/1989
AL1/A 3007   81006 21/07/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
03/10/1988
03/10/1988
AL1/A 3008   81007 23/09/1960 GS
CE
GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Crewe Electric
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
12/05/1973
12/01/1974
29/03/1975
14/12/1989
14/12/1989
AL1/A 3009     07/10/1960 W Withdrawn 24/08/1968 24/08/1968
AL1/A 3010   81008 22/10/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
30/03/1988
30/03/1988
AL1/A 3011   81009 11/11/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
17/12/1990
17/12/1990
AL1/A 3012   81010 18/11/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
23/05/1990
23/05/1990
AL1/A 3013   81011 02/12/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
05/04/1989
05/04/1989
AL1/A 3014   81012 16/12/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
22/07/1991
22/07/1991
AL1/A 3015   81013 30/12/1960 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
01/11/1989
01/11/1989
AL1/A 3016   81014 08/03/1961 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
30/03/1988
30/03/1988
AL1/A 3017   81015 05/05/1961 GS
CE
GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Crewe Electric
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
11/05/1974
29/03/1975
17/12/1984
17/12/1984
AL1/A 3018   81016 23/03/1961 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
11/07/1983
11/07/1983
AL1/A 3019     30/03/1961 W Withdrawn 18/07/1971 18/07/1971
AL1/A 3020   81017 27/04/1961 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
15/07/1991
15/07/1991
AL1/A 3021   81018 13/06/1961 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
20/01/1986
20/01/1986
AL1/A 3022   81019 14/09/1961 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
03/01/1989
03/01/1989
AL1/A 3023   81020 05/02/1962 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
09/09/1987
09/09/1987
AL1/A 3096 3301 81021 04/1962 GS
GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
01/07/1972
29/03/1975
28/04/1987
28/04/1987
AL1/A 3097 (3302) 81022 01/04/1962 GW
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Withdrawn
29/03/1975
10/07/1987
10/07/1987