Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 180 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2325 Week
» 16582 Month
» 244466 Year
» 1466031 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

08 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 08/1954 13012 73C   Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day RO 9/1954  
Sat 11/02/1961 D3071,
D3074
50A,
50B
  Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 18/02/1961 D3042,
13271,
D3471
70B,
73C,
73C
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 D3052,
13174,
13292,
D3578,
D3843
1A,
1A,
5B,
8A,
26A
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 D3042,
13271,
D3471
70B,
73C,
73C
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sun 26/02/1961 D3129 41B   Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.    
Sat 11/11/1961 13228,
13317
51A,
52B
  Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 12/11/1961 D3032,
13115,
13353,
13355,
13362
81A,
84F,
87F,
87F,
CED
  Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 26/11/1961 13292 5B   Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 26/11/1961 D3460,
D3462
73C,
73C
  Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sat 02/12/1961 13325 41A   Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962  
Fri 15/12/1961 D3169 2A   Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 04/03/1962 D3035,
13354,
13356,
D3360,
13366,
D3397,
D3425,
D3437,
D4009
84B,
87F,
87F,
87F,
88L,
88L,
88L,
87A,
83E
  Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
   
Sun 04/03/1962 D3037,
D3977
84B,
84B
  Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
   
Sun 25/03/1962 D3071,
D3072,
D3229,
D3243,
D3874,
D3943
50A,
52A,
51A,
52B,
50A,
52B
  Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Crossing.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Crossing.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Fri 06/04/1962 D3067,
13068,
13168,
13178,
D3371,
D3585,
D3587,
D3859
2F,
2F,
21A,
1A,
24C,
17B,
17B,
16A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 08/04/1962 D3245 5B   Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter. SLS 5/1962  
Fri 08/06/1962 D3018,
D3019,
13167,
D3173,
13291,
13306
1A,
8C,
21A,
1A,
5B,
14A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Shunter test house.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop.
SLS 7/1962  
Sat 14/11/1964 D3251,
D3336,
D4029,
D4037
41A,
41A,
41A,
41A
  A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed
John Thickitt  
Sun 29/11/1964 D3027,
D3437,
D3743,
D3761,
D3803,
D3815,
D3820
2B,
87B,
87E,
81C,
82A,
86B,
86B
  Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop
RO 1/1965  
Sun 29/11/1964 D3025 2C   Swindon Works visit: Yard RO 1/1965  
Thu 29/04/1965 D3293,
D4038
41A,
41A
  An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station
John Thickitt - station visit  
Sun 21/08/1966 D3769 9A   A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed John Thickitt  
Sun 23/10/1966 D3010,
D3014
70D,
70D
  Salisbury depot: On shed
Salisbury depot: On shed
RO 12/1966  
Fri 14/07/1967 D3552,
D3920,
D3922,
D3925,
D3933,
D3934
61A,
66D,
67A,
67A,
61A,
61A
  Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed
Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed - Shunter at work
Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed - Shunter at work
Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed - Shunter at work
Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed
Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Fri 14/07/1967 D3553 61A   At Craiginches RO 9/1969  
Fri 14/07/1967 D3540 62B   At Arbroath RO 9/1969  
Fri 14/07/1967 D3343 62B   At Montrose RO 9/1969  
Sun 17/09/1967 D3378,
D3458,
D3876,
D3937
55D,
55D,
55E,
55D
  A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed
A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed
A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed
A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed
John Thickitt  
Sun 05/11/1967 D3728,
D3729,
D3730,
D3731,
D3733,
D3884,
D3885,
D3887,
D3891
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H,
64H
  Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point.
RCTS 1/1968  
Sat 13/04/1968 D3135,
D3349,
D3350,
D3386,
D3922,
D4097
65F,
66C,
66C,
66C,
67A,
63B
  Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
RCTS 6/1968  
Fri 26/04/1968 D3182 51L   On Haymarket depot RCTS 6/1968  
Tue 27/08/1968 D3343,
D3347,
D3535,
D3558,
D3893
62B,
62B,
62B,
62B,
62B
  Dundee depot: Around the area - In yard near Tay Bridge station
Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed
Dundee depot: Around the area - In yard near Tay Bridge station
Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed
Dundee depot: Around the area - In yard near Tay Bridge station
RO 12/1968  
Tue 27/08/1968 D3541,
D3542,
D3543,
D3544,
D3545,
D4097
63A,
63A,
63A,
63A,
63A,
63A
  Perth depot: Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot
Perth depot: Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot
Perth depot: Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot
Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed
Perth depot: Around the area - Station pilot
Perth depot: Around the area - Station pilot
RO 12/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D3735 60E   Pilot at Elgin RO 11/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D4095 60A   In goods yard at Keith Junction RO 11/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D3550,
D3551
61B,
61B
  Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Works shunter
Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Works shunter
RO 11/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D3551,
D3553,
D3930,
D3931,
D3932,
D3933,
D3934,
D3935
61B,
61B,
61B,
61B,
61B,
61B,
61B,
61B
  Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed
Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station
Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station
Aberdeen: Around the area - In yard, south of Ferryhill shed
Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station
Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed
Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station
Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station
RO 11/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D3346 62B   Montrose pilot RO 11/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D3540 62B   Arbroath pilot RO 11/1968  
Sat 19/10/1968 D3408,
D3556,
D3924,
D4096
65A,
65F,
67A,
60A
  Glasgow Works visit: In Works - In blue
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works - Being painted blue
RO 12/1968  
Sun 27/10/1968 D3471 5A   Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968  
Sun 15/06/1969 D3297,
D3396,
D3898,
D3923,
D3925
67A,
67A,
67A,
67A,
67A
  Corkerhill depot: On shed
Corkerhill depot: On shed
Corkerhill depot: On shed
Corkerhill depot: On shed
Corkerhill depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Sat 21/06/1969 D3705 34G   Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969  
Sun 29/06/1969 D3600,
D3601,
D3605,
D3754,
D3761,
D3762,
D3954,
D3961,
D3962,
D3963,
D3965,
D3972,
D3999,
D4000
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A,
81A
  Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
Old Oak Common depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Sun 29/06/1969 D3716,
D3725,
D4040
34G,
34G,
34G
  Finsbury Park depot: On shed
Finsbury Park depot: On shed
Finsbury Park depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D3990 85B   Gloucester depot: On shed RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D3414 67C   Barassie Wagon Works RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D3413,
D3927
67C,
67C
  Ardrossan depot: On shed at Ardrossan
Ardrossan depot: On shed at Ardrossan
RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D3907 66A   Gourock Station: Stabled RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D3133,
D3135,
D3136,
D3182,
D3213,
D3529,
D3539,
D3556,
D3902
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F,
65F
  Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
Grangemouth depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Sun 13/07/1969 D3011,
D3349,
D3395,
D3906,
D3908,
D3909,
D3912,
D3921
70D,
8J,
65E,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A,
66A
  Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
RO 10/1969  
Sun 13/07/1969 D4135 14B   On Bedford depot RO 9/1969  
Tue 15/07/1969 D3551,
D3555,
D3896
60A,
60A,
60A
  Inverness shed and environs: On shed
Inverness shed and environs: On shed - Yard shunter
Inverness shed and environs: On shed - Station pilot
RO 9/1969  
Tue 15/07/1969 D3735 60E   At Elgin RO 9/1969  
Tue 15/07/1969 D3660 60A   At Keith RO 9/1969  
Thu 17/07/1969 D3382,
D3560,
D3931
66C,
62A,
61B
  Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
Glasgow Works visit: In Works
RO 9/1969  
Thu 17/07/1969 D3204,
D3284,
D3384
66C,
66C,
66C
  Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
Motherwell depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Tue 22/07/1969 D4010,
D4158,
D4159
84A,
84A,
84A
  Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot.
Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot.
Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot.
RO 10/1969  
Wed 23/07/1969 D4160 83A   Exeter St Davids station and depot: Exeter St Davids station pilot. RO 10/1969  
Wed 23/07/1969 D4017 83A   Exeter St Davids station and depot: Exeter St Davids goods pilot. RO 10/1969  
Sat 26/07/1969 D3008,
D3019,
D3353,
D3359,
D4143
8J,
8J,
8J,
8C,
5A
  Allerton shed: Open Day
Allerton shed: Open Day
Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited
Allerton shed: Open Day
Allerton shed: Open Day
RO 9/1969  
Sun 03/08/1969 D3382,
D3543,
D3931
66C,
63A,
61B
  Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works
RO 10/1969  
Fri 20/08/1971 D3882 66A   Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed. Keith Long  
Mon 27/12/1971 D3028,
D3035,
D3105,
D3217,
D3245,
D3247,
D3290,
D3510,
D3583,
D3585,
D3763,
D3870,
D3984,
D4143
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A,
5A
  Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
RO 517  
Tue 28/12/1971 D3103,
D3104,
D3176,
D3343,
D3425,
D3605,
D3833
8H,
5A,
8H,
8J,
8H,
8H,
8H
  Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot
RO 517  
Sun 09/01/1972 D3042,
D3218,
D3224,
D3515,
D3810,
D3811,
D3818,
D3820,
D3822,
D3829
73C,
75C,
73F,
86A,
86B,
82A,
86B,
73C,
75C,
87A
  Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop
RO 3/1972  
Sun 09/01/1972 D3183,
D3358,
D3607,
D3991,
D4023,
D4119,
D4124,
D4163,
D4165
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C,
82C
  Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
Swindon Works visit: Stabling Point
RO 3/1972  
Sun 06/02/1972 D3021,
D3026,
D3037,
D3039,
D3044,
D3058,
D3340,
D3362,
D3402,
D3404,
D3505,
D3514,
D3777,
D3852
16A,
16A,
16A,
16A,
16A,
16A,
16A,
91M,
16A,
91M,
91M,
91M,
16A,
16A
  Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed
RO 4/1972  
Sun 06/02/1972 D3004,
D3068,
D3174,
D3175,
D3305,
D3518,
D3768,
D3792,
D3925,
D3933,
D3978
6J,
5A,
6J,
6J,
14A,
14A,
12A,
16C,
2F,
15A,
2F
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings.
RO 4/1972  
Sat 30/08/1975 08074 Wdn   Derby Works