Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 164 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7171 Week
» 13305 Month
» 241189 Year
» 1462754 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "3F" Class 0-6-0T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
7260 47260 07/1924 07/1960 36 36.02
7261 47261 07/1924 30/06/1962 37.92 38.28
7262 47262 07/1924 09/11/1960 36.33 36.61
7263 47263 07/1924 11/1961 37.33 37.36
7264 47264 07/1924 27/04/1963 38.75 38.94
7265 47265 07/1924 03/09/1960 36.17 36.28
7266 47266 07/1924 10/09/1966 42.17 42.62
7267 47267 07/1924 23/11/1963 39.33 39.53
7268 47268 07/1924 08/1961 37.08 37.44
7269 47269 07/1924 08/09/1962 38.17 38.44
7270 47270 08/1924 08/09/1962 38.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 38.77
7271 47271 08/1924 29/12/1960 36.33 36.61
7272 47272 08/1924 18/06/1966 41.83 42.36
7273 47273 08/1924 12/1966 42.33 42.78
7274 47274 08/1924 12/12/1959 35.33
7275 47275 08/1924 31/03/1962 37.58 37.69
7276 47276 08/1924 12/03/1966 41.58 41.94
7277 47277 08/1924 05/1961 36.75 37.02
7278 47278 08/1924 15/06/1963 38.83 39.11
7279 47279 08/1924 31/12/1966 42.33 Prs Preserved
7280 47280 08/1924 02/04/1966 41.67 41.94
7281 47281 08/1924 16/03/1963 38.58 39.44
7282 47282 09/1924 04/12/1960 36.25 36.77
7283 47283 09/1924 13/04/1963 38.58 38.61
7284 47284 09/1924 19/09/1964 40 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 40.45
7285 47285 09/1924 21/08/1965 40.92 41.28
7286 47286 09/1924 21/08/1965 40.92 41.19
7287 47287 10/1924 26/10/1963 39 39.53
7288 47288 10/1924 21/11/1964 40.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 03/1965 40.44
7289 47289 10/1924 07/10/1967 43 43.40
7290 47290 10/1924 23/06/1962 37.67 38.28
7291 47291 10/1924 12/12/1959 35.17 37.11
7292 47292 10/1924 29/12/1962 38.17 38.77
7293 47293 10/1924 31/12/1966 42.17 43.40
7294 47294 10/1924 12/10/1963 39 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 39.53
7295 47295 10/1924 10/04/1965 40.5 40.78
7296 47296 10/1924 12/12/1959 Bescot 35.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1960 35.36
7297 47297 10/1924 06/06/1964 39.67 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 09/1964 39.95
7298 47298 10/1924 31/12/1966 42.17 Prs Preserved
7299 47299 11/1924 25/11/1959 35
7300 47300 12/1924 10/08/1963 38.67 39.36
7301 47301 12/1924 12/12/1959 35 36.61
7302 47302 01/1925 08/09/1962 37.67 38.11
7303 47303 01/1925 09/1960 35.67 35.69
7304 47304 01/1925 23/06/1962 37.42 38.19
7305 47305 02/1925 27/02/1965 40 43.19
7306 47306 02/1925 19/12/1964 39.83 39.94
7307 47307 03/1925 09/1966 41.5 41.78
7308 47308 1925 10/08/1964 39.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964
7309 47309 03/1925 07/11/1959 34.67
7310 47310 12/1928 07/04/1962 Stafford 33.33 33.44
7311 47311 01/1929 04/12/1960 Stratford 31.92 32.44
7312 47312 01/1929 01/03/1961 Stratford 32.17 32.27
7313 47313 01/1929 10/06/1967 Westhouses 38.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 38.86
7314 47314 01/1929 12/1966 Lostock Hall 37.92 38.27
7315 47315 02/1929 08/1959 Willesden 30.5
7316 47316 02/1929 12/11/1962 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 33.75 33.68
7317 47317 06/1926 16/04/1966 39.83 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 07/1966 40.11
7318 47318 06/1926 15/10/1966 40.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1967 40.61
7319 47319 06/1926 09/1962 36.25 36.36
7320 47320 06/1926 09/05/1964 37.92 38.53
7321 47321 06/1926 11/1965 39.42 39.70
7322 47322 06/1926 20/07/1963 37.08 37.28
7323 47323 06/1926 12/03/1960 33.75 34.53
7324 47324 06/1926 31/12/1966 40.5 Prs Preserved
7325 47325 06/1926 11/09/1965 39.25 39.94
7326 47326 07/1926 24/12/1966 40.42 41.20
7327 47327 07/1926 24/12/1966 40.42 Prs Preserved
7328 47328 07/1926 18/06/1962 35.92 36.36
7329 47329 07/1926 05/1959 32.83 32.94
7330 47330 07/1926 07/08/1965 39.08 39.53
7331 47331 07/1926 23/04/1959 32.75 32.85
7332 47332 07/1926 05/05/1962 35.83 36.11
7333 47333 07/1926 28/11/1964 38.33 38.53
7334 47334 07/1926 26/09/1961 35.17 35.61
7335 47335 07/1926 09/12/1960 34.42 34.53
7336 47336 07/1926 06/1966 39.92 40.11
7337 47337 08/1926 12/12/1959 33.33 35.02
7338 47338 08/1926 09/10/1965 39.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 39.45
7339 47339 08/1926 12/12/1959 33.33 34.36
7340 47340 08/1926 24/03/1962 35.58 35.77
7341 47341 08/1926 16/07/1966 39.92 40.28
7342 47342 08/1926 12/05/1962 35.75 36.69
7343 47343 08/1926 05/09/1964 38.08 38.19
7344 47344 08/1926 05/09/1964 38.08 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 04/1965 38.69
7345 47345 09/1926 09/1964 38 38.28
7346 47346 09/1926 19/12/1959 33.25 33.52
7347 47347 07/1926 05/11/1960 34.33 34.94
7348 47348 07/1926 08/09/1962 36.17 36.44
7349 47349 07/1926 08/1964 38.08 38.28
7350 47350 07/1926 18/12/1965 39.42 39.62
7351 47351 07/1926 18/06/1962 35.92 36.28
7352 47352 07/1926 12/03/1960 33.67 35.28
7353 47353 07/1926 17/02/1962 35.58 35.69
7354 47354 07/1926 17/10/1964 38.25 38.53
7355 47355 07/1926 09/1964 38.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964 38.45
7356 47356 07/1926 01/09/1962 36.17 36.44
7357 47357 07/1926 24/12/1966 40.42 Prs Preserved
7358 47358 07/1926 08/12/1962 36.42 36.94
7359 47359 07/1926 17/07/1965 39 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 39.28
7360 47360 07/1926 20/07/1963 37 37.53
7361 47361 07/1926 01/05/1965 38.83 39.11
7362 47362 08/1926 06/11/1965 39.25 39.45
7363 47363 08/1926 19/12/1959 33.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1961 34.61
7364 47364 07/1926 19/12/1959 33.42 36.11
7365 47365 07/1926 19/12/1964 38.42 38.78
7366 47366 07/1926 28/04/1962 35.75 36.02
7367 47367 08/1926 12/1966 40.33 40.69
7368 47368 08/1926 28/02/1964 37.5 38.03
7369 47369 09/1926 11/02/1961 34.42 34.44
7370 47370 09/1926 10/10/1959 33.08 35.27
7371 47371 09/1926 09/1965 39 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 39.36
7372 47372 09/1926 05/09/1964 38 38.03
7373 47373 09/1926 24/12/1966 40.25 41.03
7374 47374 09/1926 12/03/1960 33.5 34.77
7375 47375 09/1926 08/08/1964 37.92 38.11
7376 47376 09/1926 29/12/1962 36.25 36.52
7377 47377 09/1926 15/10/1966 40.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 40.52
7378 47378 10/1926 20/11/1965 39.08 39.36
7379 47379 10/1926 18/11/1963 37.08 37.36
7380 47380 10/1926 02/05/1964 37.58 37.61
7381 47381 10/1926 22/09/1962 35.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 36.52
7382 47382 10/1926 19/12/1959 33.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1960 33.52
7383 47383 10/1926 07/10/1967 41 Prs Preserved
7384 47384 10/1926 08/10/1966 40 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 40.36
7385 47385 10/1926 04/1964 37.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 38.03
7386 47386 10/1926 27/04/1963 36.5 36.77
7387 47387 11/1926 19/12/1959 33.08 34.94
7388 47388 11/1926 17/12/1966 40.08 40.44
7389 47389 11/1926 07/1966 39.67 39.94
7390 47390 11/1926 05/09/1964 37.83 38.19
7391 47391 11/1926 10/1966 39.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 40.52
7392 47392 11/1926 04/08/1962 35.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963 36.94
7393 47393 11/1926 12/02/1966 39.25 39.52
7394 47394 11/1926 19/12/1959 33.08 33.94
7395 47395 11/1926 17/04/1965 38.42 38.86
7396 47396 11/1926 15/10/1966 39.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1967 40.61
7397 47397 11/1926 09/1966 39.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 40.28
7398 47398 11/1926 06/05/1961 34.5 34.52
7399 47399 11/1926 07/08/1965 38.75 39.19
7400 47400 11/1926 07/08/1965 38.75 39.19
7401 47401 11/1926 12/11/1960 34 34.44
7402 47402 12/1926 29/12/1962 36 36.36
7403 47403 12/1926 26/09/1961 34.75 35.11
7404 47404 12/1926 24/02/1962 35.17 35.27
7405 47405 12/1926 30/09/1961 34.75 35.11
7406 47406 12/1926 24/12/1966 40 Prs Preserved
7407 47407 12/1926 19/12/1959 33 33.27
7408 47408 12/1926 20/11/1965 38.92 39.20
7409 47409 12/1926 19/12/1959 33 34.02
7410 47410 12/1926 09/1966 39.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 40.36
7411 47411 12/1926 19/12/1959 33 33.27
7412 47412 12/1926 10/1963 36.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 37.36
7413 47413 12/1926 05/1963 36.42 36.52
7414 47414 12/1926 05/05/1962 35.42 35.69
7415 47415 12/1926 16/04/1966 39.33 39.44
7416 47416 12/1926 07/1966 39.58 39.86
7417 47417 12/1926 12/11/1962 35.92 36.52
7418 47418 12/1926 09/06/1961 34.5 34.61
7419 47419 12/1926 23/12/1963 37 37.27
7420 47420 12/1926 30/09/1961 34.75 35.11
7421 47421 12/1926 26/09/1961 34.75 34.86
7422 47422 12/1926 08/1962 35.67 35.69
7423 47423 12/1926 07/1965 38.58 38.95
7424 47424 12/1926 23/05/1962 35.42 35.69
7425 47425 12/1926 19/05/1962 35.42 35.69
7426 47426 12/1926 09/1962 35.75 35.78
7427 47427 10/1926 10/09/1966 39.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 41.40
7428 47428 10/1926 09/10/1965 39 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 39.28
7429 47429 10/1926 04/12/1965 39.17 39.36
7430 47430 10/1926 04/01/1964 37.25 38.11
7431 47431 10/1926 13/10/1962 36 36.19
7432 47432 10/1926 21/08/1965 38.83 39.36
7433 47433 10/1926 08/09/1962 35.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1962 36.11
7434 47434 11/1926 05/1964 37.5 37.61
7435 47435 11/1926 15/10/1966 39.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 06/1967 40.61
7436 47436 04/1927 20/12/1960 33.67 33.69
7437 47437 04/1927 13/08/1966 39.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 40.03
7438 47438 04/1927 26/09/1961 34.42 34.53
7439 47439 05/1927 09/1965 38.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 38.86
7440 47440 05/1927 19/12/1959 32.58 34.36
7441 47441 05/1927 21/12/1963 36.58 36.95
7442 47442 05/1927 06/03/1965 37.83 38.19
7443 47443 05/1927 09/12/1960 33.58 33.70
7444 47444 05/1927 26/11/1966 39.5 39.95
7445 47445 05/1927 02/04/1966 38.92 Prs Preserved
7446 47446 06/1927 20/12/1960 33.5 33.61
7447 47447 06/1927 17/12/1966 39.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1967 39.94
7448 47448 06/1927 26/09/1961 34.25 34.44
7449 47449 07/1927 30/03/1963 35.67 35.86
7450 47450 07/1927 02/04/1966 38.75 39.20
7451 47451 07/1927 09/1965 38.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 38.45
7452 47452 10/1926 27/03/1965 38.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 38.78
7453 47453 10/1926 23/04/1966 39.5 39.86
7454 47454 10/1926 17/07/1965 38.75 39.19
7455 47455 10/1926 23/05/1962 35.58 35.69
7457 47457 11/1926 09/1962 35.83 35.94
7458 47458 11/1926 10/08/1963 36.75 36.86
7459 47459 12/1926 26/01/1963 36.08 36.36
7460 47460 12/1926 18/05/1963 36.42 36.44
7461 47461 04/1927 12/09/1964 37.42 37.70
7462 47462 04/1927 26/09/1961 34.42 34.53
7463 47463 04/1927 12/1960 33.67 33.69
7464 47464 05/1927 25/09/1965 38.33 38.61
7465 47465 05/1927 01/06/1963 36.08 36.11
7466 47466 06/1927 08/09/1962 35.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963 36.36
7467 47467 01/1928 26/09/1964 36.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 36.94
7468 47468 01/1928 23/01/1965 37 37.36
7469 47469 01/1928 11/01/1964 36 36.02
7470 47470 01/1928 23/06/1962 34.42 34.94
7471 47471 01/1928 31/12/1966 38.92 39.69
7472 47472 12/1927 26/11/1966 38.92 39.36
7473 47473 12/1927 17/02/1962 34.17 34.19
7474 47474 12/1927 01/09/1962 34.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1963 35.61
7475 47475 12/1927 24/02/1962 34.17 34.27
7476 47476 12/1927 09/05/1964 36.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 37.27
7477 47477 12/1927 19/12/1959 32 33.61
7478 47478 01/1928 11/04/1964 36.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1964 36.52
7479 47479 01/1928 04/08/1962 34.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 35.27
7480 47480 01/1928 09/1965 37.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 38.03
7481 47481 01/1928 30/03/1963 35.17 35.52
7482 47482 01/1928 22/10/1966 38.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 39.11
7483 47483 01/1928 03/03/1962 34.17 34.19
7484 47484 01/1928 02/1961 33.08 33.27
7485 47485 01/1928 09/01/1965 37 37.36
7486 47486 01/1928 12/03/1960 32.17 32.44
7487 47487 01/1928 21/08/1965 37.58 37.94
7488 47488 01/1928 01/12/1962 34.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1963 35.69
7489 47489 01/1928 19/12/1959 31.92 32.02
7490 47490 02/1928 13/07/1963 35.42 35.44
7491 47491 02/1928 15/12/1962 34.83 35.02
7492 47492 02/1928 08/1964 36.5 36.94
7493 47493 02/1928 31/12/1966 38.83 Prs Preserved
7494 47494 02/1928 22/10/1966 38.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 39.03
7495 47495 02/1928 25/09/1965 37.58 37.94
7496 47496 02/1928 30/11/1963 35.75 35.85
7497 47497 04/1928 22/09/1962 34.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 35.10
7498 47498 04/1928 12/03/1960 31.92 32.27
7499 47499 04/1928 28/08/1965 37.33 37.53
7500 47500 04/1928 07/1965 37.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1965 37.53
7501 47501 04/1928 26/09/1964 36.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1965 36.86
7502 47502 04/1928 10/08/1963 35.33 35.69
7503 47503 04/1928 14/03/1964 35.92 36.19
7504 47504 04/1928 21/04/1962 34 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1962 34.27
7505 47505 04/1928 07/08/1965 37.33 37.78
7506 47506 04/1928 12/03/1966 37.92 38.19
7507 47507 04/1928 09/1966 38.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 38.69
7508 47508 04/1928 30/09/1961 33.42 33.86
7509 47509 04/1928 09/12/1960 32.67 32.78
7510 47510 05/1928 11/11/1960 32.5 32.69
7511 47511 05/1928 18/04/1964 35.92 36.02
7512 47512 05/1928 08/05/1965 37 37.36
7513 47513 05/1928 09/05/1961 33 33.11
7514 47514 05/1928 19/05/1962 34 34.61
7515 47515 05/1928 11/07/1964 36.17 36.70
7516 47516 05/1928 10/02/1962 33.75 33.85
7517 47517 02/1928 27/06/1964 36.33 36.69
7518 47518 02/1928 26/10/1963 35.67 36.52
7519 47519 02/1928 09/1965 37.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 37.86
7520 47520 02/1928 27/11/1965 37.75 38.03
7521 47521 02/1928 08/10/1966 38.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 39.03
7522 47522 02/1928 04/08/1962 34.5 35.02
7523 47523 02/1928 12/11/1960 32.75 32.77
7524 47524 03/1928 26/09/1964 36.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 37.02
7525 47525 03/1928 19/03/1960 32 32.36
7526 47526 03/1928 01/12/1962 34.75 34.78
7527 47527 03/1928 19/03/1960 32 33.27
7528 47528 03/1928 19/03/1960 32 33.69
7529 47529 03/1928 21/10/1961 33.58 33.78
7530 47530 03/1928 08/10/1966 38.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 38.95
7531 47531 03/1928 04/02/1967 38.92 39.02
7532 47532 04/1928 30/03/1963 34.92 35.27
7533 47533 04/1928 26/11/1966 38.58 39.02
7534 47534 04/1928 25/03/1967 38.92 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 09/1967 39.44
7535 47535 04/1928 22/01/1966 37.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1966 38.11
7536 47536 04/1928 11/06/1962 34.17 34.61
7537 47537 04/1928 09/1960 32.42 32.44
7536 47538 04/1928 10/06/1959 31.17 31.27
7539 47539 04/1928 09/02/1963 34.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 37.78
7540 47540 04/1928 15/04/1961 33 33.10
7541 47541 04/1928 16/06/1960 32.17 32.27
7542 47542 11/1927 06/1962 34.58 34.61
7543 47543 12/1927 11/1965 37.92 38.11
7544 47544 12/1927 03/12/1965 38 38.27
7545 47545 12/1927 02/08/1962 34.67 34.69
7546 47546 12/1927 07/07/1962 34.58 34.94
7547 47547 12/1927 07/12/1963 36 36.19
7548 47548 12/1927 15/08/1962 34.67 34.69
7549 47549 12/1927 08/1964 36.67 37.36
7550 47550 01/1928 14/03/1964 36.17 37.52
7551 47551 01/1928 23/02/1963 35.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 35.27
7552 47552 01/1928 12/11/1962 34.83 36.52
7554 47554 02/1928 09/1962 34.58 34.69
7555 47555 02/1928 18/06/1962 34.33 34.52
7556 47556 02/1928 10/12/1962 34.83 35.94
7557 47557 03/1928 28/02/1964 35.92 36.11
7558 47558 03/1928 21/03/1964 36 36.11
7559 47559 03/1928 06/05/1961 33.17 33.19
7560 47560 03/1928 16/07/1960 32.33 32.44
7561 47561 04/1928 20/08/1960 32.33 32.44
7562 47562 04/1928 01/12/1962 34.67 34.86
7563 47563 04/1928 19/03/1960 31.92 31.94
7564 47564 04/1928 20/03/1965 36.92 Prs Preserved
7565 47565 05/1928 02/04/1966 37.92 38.36
7566 47566 05/1928 10/1966 38.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 38.86
7567 47567 09/1928 11/1960 32.17 32.27
7568 47568 10/1928 12/1960 32.17 32.27
7569 47569 10/1928 12/1960 32.17 32.19
7570 47570 10/1928 30/09/1961 32.92 33.27
7571 47571 10/1928 13/05/1961 32.58 32.69
7572 47572 10/1928 14/05/1962 33.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1963 34.69
7573 47573 10/1928 23/12/1960 32.17 32.36
7574 47574 10/1928 15/12/1962 34.17 34.36
7575 47575 10/1928 19/03/1960 31.42 32.69
7576 47576 10/1928 24/09/1960 31.92 32.02
7577 47577 10/1928 27/03/1965 36.42 36.86
7578 47578 10/1928 27/03/1965 36.42 36.61
7579 47579 11/1928 04/07/1964 35.67 35.77
7580 47580 11/1928 26/09/1961 32.83 33.27
7581 47581 11/1928 08/02/1963 34.25 34.85
7582 47582 11/1928 08/08/1963 34.75 35.44
7583 47583 11/1928 23/03/1963 34.33 34.52
7584 47584 12/1928 08/1964 35.67 36.44
7585 47585 12/1928 19/03/1960 31.25 33.35
7586 47586 12/1928 19/03/1960 31.25 32.94
7587 47587 01/1929 07/11/1964 35.83 36.19
7588 47588 01/1929 13/10/1962 33.75 33.85
7589 47589 01/1929 23/12/1963 34.92 35.19
7590 47590 02/1929 12/11/1966 37.75 38.27
7591 47591 02/1929 19/03/1960 31.08 33.35
7592 47592 08/1928 05/03/1966 37.58 38.28
7593 47593 08/1928 01/09/1962 34.08 34.44
7594 47594 09/1928 11/07/1964 35.83 36.11
7595 47595 09/1928 19/03/1960 31.5 32.02
7596 47596 09/1928 03/07/1965 36.83 37.11
7597 47597 10/1928 11/1965 37.08 37.28
7598 47598 11/1928 23/07/1966 37.67 38.94
7599 47599 11/1928 24/12/1966 38.08 38.86
7600 47600 11/1928 08/1960 31.75 32.77
7601 47601 11/1928 17/03/1962 33.33 33.44
7602 47602 09/1928 08/01/1966 37.33 37.61
7603 47603 09/1928 12/11/1966 38.17 38.61
7604 47604 09/1928 04/08/1962 33.92 34.36
7605 47605 10/1928 13/05/1961 32.58 32.77
7606 47606 10/1928 19/06/1965 36.67 37.11
7607 47607 10/1928 30/01/1961 32.25 32.52
7608 47608 10/1928 01/12/1962 34.17 34.19
7609 47609 10/1928 25/01/1964 35.25 35.44
7610 47610 10/1928 04/08/1962 33.83 34.36
7611 47611 10/1928 14/05/1966 37.58 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 08/1966 37.86
7612 47612 10/1928 24/12/1966 38.17 39.19
7614 47614 11/1928 24/07/1965 36.67 36.94
7615 47615 11/1928 08/10/1966 37.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 38.28
7616 47616 11/1928 09/01/1965 36.17 36.44
7618 47618 11/1928 10/1963 34.92 34.94
7619 47619 11/1928 17/03/1961 32.33 32.52
7620 47620 11/1928 09/1961 32.83 32.85
7621 47621 11/1928 12/05/1962 33.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1963 34.60
7622 47622 11/1928 11/07/1964 35.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 35.94
7623 47623 11/1928 13/04/1964 35.42 35.44
7624 47624 11/1928 09/1961 32.83 32.85
7625 47625 11/1928 09/05/1961 32.5 32.60
7626 47626 11/1928 05/1961 32.5 32.60
7627 47627 11/1928 09/04/1966 37.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 37.61
7628 47628 12/1928 08/1964 35.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 36.11
7629 47629 12/1928 07/10/1967 38.83 39.19
7630 47630 12/1928 02/08/1962 33.67 33.77
7631 47631 12/1928 06/1966 37.5 38.19
7632 47632 12/1928 26/09/1961 32.75 33.19
7633 47633 12/1928 08/09/1962 33.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 34.44
7634 47634 12/1928 26/09/1961 32.75 32.85
7635 47635 12/1928 12/1960 32 32.11
7636 47636 12/1928 09/03/1960 31.25 31.27
7637 47637 12/1928 05/1961 32.42 32.44
7638 47638 12/1928 06/07/1963 34.58 35.19
7639 47639 12/1928 19/03/1960 31.25 32.94
7640 47640 12/1928 09/1964 35.75 36.11
7641 47641 01/1929 31/12/1966 37.92 39.15
7642 47642 01/1929 19/05/1962 33.33 33.85
7643 47643 01/1929 10/1966 37.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 38.44
7644 47644 01/1929 24/11/1962 33.83 33.94
7645 47645 02/1929 24/04/1965 36.17 36.52
7646 47646 02/1929 07/08/1965 36.5 36.85
7647 47647 02/1929 08/05/1965 36.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 36.61
7648 47648 02/1929 18/04/1964 35.17 35.35
7649 47649 02/1929 08/10/1966 37.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 38.02
7650 47650 02/1929 19/03/1960 31.08 32.43
7651 47651 02/1929 07/12/1963 34.83 34.94
7652 47652 03/1929 07/1960 31.33 31.44
7653 47653 03/1929 24/10/1964 35.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 35.95
7654 47654 03/1929 23/02/1963 33.92 34.53
7655 47655 03/1929 13/11/1965 36.67 37.02
7656 47656 03/1929 25/12/1965 36.75 37.11
7657 47657 03/1929 19/10/1963 34.58 35.11
7658 47658 03/1929 08/10/1966 37.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 37.95
7659 47659 03/1929 26/11/1966 37.67 38.11
7660 47660 03/1929 01/01/1966 36.83 37.11
7661 47661 03/1929 08/10/1966 37.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1967 37.95
7662 47662 03/1929 29/01/1966 36.83 37.11
7664 47664 04/1929 23/01/1965 35.75 36.02
7665 47665 04/1929 17/07/1965 36.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 36.53
7666 47666 04/1929 09/1965 36.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 36.78
7667 47667 04/1931 12/11/1966 35.58 35.94
7668 47668 05/1931 08/10/1966 35.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 35.94
7669 47669 05/1931 20/02/1965 33.75 34.02
7670 47670 06/1931 22/10/1960 29.33 29.52
7671 47671 06/1931 12/11/1966 35.42 35.86
7672 47672 06/1931 19/03/1960 28.75 29.77
7673 47673 07/1931 12/11/1966 35.33 35.94
7674 47674 07/1931 17/12/1966 35.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1967 35.86
7675 47675 08/1931 04/1966 34.67 35.61
7676 47676 08/1931 14/08/1965 34 34.28
7677 47677 08/1931 06/11/1965 34.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 34.77
7678 47678 09/1931 20/01/1962 30.33 30.44
7679 47679 09/1931 10/08/1963 31.92 32.10
7680 47680 10/1931 17/07/1965 33.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 34.02
7681 47681 10/1931 07/08/1965 33.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 34.19