Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 294 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 7527 Month
» 235411 Year
» 1456976 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "3F" Class 0-6-0T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Mon 02/08/1954 47668 1B   Bow Works visit: Around the works. - In the shops. RO 9/1954  
Sat 25/02/1961 47289,
47293,
47295,
47325,
47353,
47375,
47404,
47441,
47444,
47461,
47473,
47475,
47483,
47499,
47515,
47543,
47565,
47643,
47653
8A,
8G,
12B,
17A,
6B,
6A,
8A,
17A,
8F,
17C,
24L,
5C,
24J,
2E,
12A,
15C,
6C,
17B,
5C
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 47403,
47405,
47592,
47608,
47661
Wdn,
Wdn,
99C,
5B,
5E
  Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
SLS 1/1962  
Sat 09/12/1961 47402,
47429
99H,
99H
  Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter.
SLS 1/1962  
Fri 15/12/1961 47307,
47322,
47365,
47399,
47435,
47444,
47464,
47535,
47550,
47649,
47664
1C,
24J,
26F,
5E,
14A,
8F,
17B,
18C,
27A,
5C,
5B
  Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
SLS 1/1962  
Fri 16/03/1962 47295,
47336,
47427,
47441,
47444,
47515,
47601,
47627,
47643,
47667,
47674
12B,
8A,
16A,
17A,
8F,
12A,
5B,
6C,
17B,
12A,
6C
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Fri 06/04/1962 47310,
47321,
47340,
47353,
47516,
47534,
47601,
47643,
47667
5C,
6J,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
17A,
Wdn,
17B,
12A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Spike Island" (Gasworks) -
Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Spike Island" (Gasworks) -
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 08/04/1962 47547,
47592,
47618,
47661
26A,
99C,
99C,
99C
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - On Crewe South shed waiting
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 47402,
47429,
47550
99H,
99H,
99H
  Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 07/05/1966 47325 Wdn   At Dock Street Goods yard, Newport: Dumped - Awaiting entry to Buttigieg's scrapyard RO 8/1966  
Sat 07/05/1966 47499 Wdn   Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966